Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2065524

EP2065524 - Drainage device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.11.2016
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.12.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dallmer GmbH & Co. KG
Wiebelsheidestrasse 25
59757 Arnsberg / DE
[2009/23]
Inventor(s)01 / Dallmer, Johannes
Binnerfeld 27
59757 Arnsberg / DE
 [2009/23]
Representative(s)Basfeld, Rainer , et al
Fritz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 1580
59705 Arnsberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/23]Basfeld, Rainer , et al
Fritz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Ostentor 9
59757 Arnsberg / DE
Application number, filing date08020387.024.11.2008
[2009/23]
Priority number, dateDE2007105802830.11.2007         Original published format: DE102007058028
DE2008104667110.09.2008         Original published format: DE102008046671
[2009/23]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2065524
Date:03.06.2009
Language:DE
[2009/23]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2065524
Date:21.10.2009
[2009/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.09.2009
ClassificationInternational:E03F5/04
[2016/31]
Former International [2009/23]E03F3/04, A47K3/40
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/23]
TitleGerman:Ablaufvorrichtung[2009/23]
English:Drainage device[2009/23]
French:Dispositif d'écoulement[2009/23]
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
08.04.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.04.2010Examination requested  [2010/22]
20.04.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.10.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.06.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.12.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.07.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.11.2016Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
04.01.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination13.03.2017Appeal received No.  T1677/17
11.05.2017Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)EP10002508.9  / EP2196587
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.04.2012
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
02.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
01.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
30.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
30.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
30.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
30.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
02.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 12
Documents cited:Search[X]DE102006007471  (BASIKA ENTWAESSERUNGSTECHNIK G [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-7,9,10,12-15 * page 4, paragraphs 22-25 * * page 5, paragraph 37 * * page 6, paragraph 48 * * page 7, paragraphs 54,55 * * page 11, paragraphs 87,88,90 * * page 12, paragraph 95; figures 4,6,7a,7b *;
 [X]EP1782721  (VIEGA GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-7,10,13,15 * column 6, paragraph 28 - column 7, paragraph 34 * * column 8, paragraph 44 - column 9, paragraph 46 * * column 10, paragraph 55; figures 1,2,7 *;
 [E]FR2928156  (DAVOUDI FARHOOMAN [FR]) [E] 1-3,5,7,9,13,15 * page 3, lines 89-94; figures 13,28-31 *
by applicantEP1782721
 DE102006007471