Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2065524 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2065524



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 296
03.06.2019 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
15.08.2018 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
03.08.2017 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
12.07.2017 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
12.05.2017 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
11.05.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
11.05.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
11.05.2017 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 8
29.03.2017 Refund of fees Appeal 1
13.03.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
13.03.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
13.03.2017 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
10.01.2017 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
05.01.2017 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
04.01.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
04.01.2017 Annex to a communication Search / examination 3
04.01.2017 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
04.01.2017 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
04.01.2017 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 9
04.01.2017 Means of redress Search / examination 2
08.12.2016 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
02.11.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
02.11.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
02.11.2016 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 1
22.07.2016 Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
22.07.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
22.07.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
22.07.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
22.07.2016 Text intended for grant Search / examination 10
22.12.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
22.12.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
22.12.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
22.12.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
22.12.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 5
22.12.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 5
22.12.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 5
22.12.2015 Claims Search / examination 3
22.12.2015 Claims Search / examination 3
22.12.2015 Claims Search / examination 3
22.12.2015 Description Search / examination 5
22.12.2015 Description Search / examination 5
22.12.2015 Description Search / examination 5
22.12.2015 Drawings Search / examination 2
22.12.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
22.12.2015 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 8
02.11.2015 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
27.10.2015 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
19.06.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 6
19.06.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
15.01.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
19.11.2013 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 1
26.10.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
26.10.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
26.10.2012 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 4
26.10.2012 Claims Search / examination 3
26.10.2012 Description Search / examination 4
26.10.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
26.10.2012 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
04.09.2012 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
30.08.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
30.08.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
30.08.2012 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
20.04.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 6
20.04.2012 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
08.12.2011 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
16.04.2010 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
09.04.2010 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
09.04.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
09.04.2010 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
09.04.2010 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 3
09.04.2010 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
08.04.2010 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
08.04.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
08.04.2010 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
08.04.2010 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 3
08.04.2010 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
24.03.2010 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
23.10.2009 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
21.09.2009 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
21.09.2009 European search opinion Search / examination 6
21.09.2009 European search report Search / examination 4
07.05.2009 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
10.12.2008 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
10.12.2008 Priority document Search / examination 14
10.12.2008 Priority document Search / examination 10
25.11.2008 Abstract Search / examination 1
25.11.2008 Claims Search / examination 3
25.11.2008 Description Search / examination 6
25.11.2008 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
25.11.2008 Drawings Search / examination 3
25.11.2008 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 9
24.11.2008 Abstract Search / examination 5
24.11.2008 Claims Search / examination 3
24.11.2008 Description Search / examination 6
24.11.2008 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
24.11.2008 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 9