Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2191735

EP2191735 - Smoke-free cigarette [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.02.2012
Database last updated on 28.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 06.11.2013  [2013/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Olig AG
Klusenstrasse 17
6043 Adligenswil / CH
[2010/22]
Inventor(s)01 / Köller, Marcel
Klusenstrasse 17
6043 Adligenswil / CH
 [2010/22]
Representative(s)Herrmann, Uwe , et al
Lorenz Seidler Gossel
Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte
Partnerschaft mbB
Widenmayerstrasse 23
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/22]Herrmann, Uwe , et al
Lorenz - Seidler - Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date08020736.828.11.2008
[2010/22]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2191735
Date:02.06.2010
Language:DE
[2010/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2191735
Date:13.04.2011
Language:DE
[2011/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.02.2009
ClassificationInternational:A24F47/00
[2010/22]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/22]
TitleGerman:Rauchfreie Zigarette[2010/22]
English:Smoke-free cigarette[2010/22]
French:Cigarette sans fumée[2010/22]
Examination procedure06.05.2009Examination requested  [2010/22]
09.06.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.07.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.11.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.02.2011Fee for grant paid
28.02.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.01.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY13.04.2011
CZ13.04.2011
DK13.04.2011
EE13.04.2011
FI13.04.2011
HR13.04.2011
HU13.04.2011
IE13.04.2011
IT13.04.2011
LT13.04.2011
LV13.04.2011
MT13.04.2011
NL13.04.2011
PL13.04.2011
RO13.04.2011
SE13.04.2011
SI13.04.2011
SK13.04.2011
TR13.04.2011
BG13.07.2011
NO13.07.2011
GR14.07.2011
ES24.07.2011
IS13.08.2011
PT16.08.2011
LU28.11.2011
BE30.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
[2013/45]
Former [2013/44]CY13.04.2011
CZ13.04.2011
DK13.04.2011
EE13.04.2011
FI13.04.2011
HR13.04.2011
IE13.04.2011
IT13.04.2011
LT13.04.2011
LV13.04.2011
MT13.04.2011
NL13.04.2011
PL13.04.2011
RO13.04.2011
SE13.04.2011
SI13.04.2011
SK13.04.2011
TR13.04.2011
BG13.07.2011
NO13.07.2011
GR14.07.2011
ES24.07.2011
IS13.08.2011
PT16.08.2011
LU28.11.2011
BE30.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
Former [2013/29]CY13.04.2011
CZ13.04.2011
DK13.04.2011
EE13.04.2011
FI13.04.2011
HR13.04.2011
IE13.04.2011
IT13.04.2011
LT13.04.2011
LV13.04.2011
MT13.04.2011
NL13.04.2011
PL13.04.2011
RO13.04.2011
SE13.04.2011
SI13.04.2011
SK13.04.2011
BG13.07.2011
NO13.07.2011
GR14.07.2011
ES24.07.2011
IS13.08.2011
PT16.08.2011
LU28.11.2011
BE30.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
Former [2013/25]CY13.04.2011
CZ13.04.2011
DK13.04.2011
EE13.04.2011
FI13.04.2011
HR13.04.2011
IE13.04.2011
IT13.04.2011
LT13.04.2011
LV13.04.2011
MT13.04.2011
NL13.04.2011
PL13.04.2011
RO13.04.2011
SE13.04.2011
SI13.04.2011
SK13.04.2011
NO13.07.2011
GR14.07.2011
ES24.07.2011
IS13.08.2011
PT16.08.2011
LU28.11.2011
BE30.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
Former [2013/14]CY13.04.2011
CZ13.04.2011
DK13.04.2011
EE13.04.2011
FI13.04.2011
HR13.04.2011
IE13.04.2011
IT13.04.2011
LT13.04.2011
LV13.04.2011
MT13.04.2011
NL13.04.2011
PL13.04.2011
RO13.04.2011
SE13.04.2011
SI13.04.2011
SK13.04.2011
NO13.07.2011
GR14.07.2011
ES24.07.2011
IS13.08.2011
PT16.08.2011
BE30.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
Former [2012/37]CY13.04.2011
CZ13.04.2011
DK13.04.2011
EE13.04.2011
FI13.04.2011
HR13.04.2011
IE13.04.2011
IT13.04.2011
LT13.04.2011
LV13.04.2011
NL13.04.2011
PL13.04.2011
RO13.04.2011
SE13.04.2011
SI13.04.2011
SK13.04.2011
NO13.07.2011
GR14.07.2011
ES24.07.2011
IS13.08.2011
PT16.08.2011
BE30.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
Former [2012/29]CY13.04.2011
CZ13.04.2011
DK13.04.2011
EE13.04.2011
FI13.04.2011
HR13.04.2011
IE13.04.2011
IT13.04.2011
LT13.04.2011
LV13.04.2011
NL13.04.2011
PL13.04.2011
RO13.04.2011
SE13.04.2011
SI13.04.2011
SK13.04.2011
NO13.07.2011
GR14.07.2011
ES24.07.2011
IS13.08.2011
PT16.08.2011
MC30.11.2011
Former [2012/24]CY13.04.2011
CZ13.04.2011
DK13.04.2011
EE13.04.2011
FI13.04.2011
HR13.04.2011
IE13.04.2011
IT13.04.2011
LT13.04.2011
LV13.04.2011
NL13.04.2011
PL13.04.2011
RO13.04.2011
SE13.04.2011
SI13.04.2011
SK13.04.2011
NO13.07.2011
GR14.07.2011
ES24.07.2011
IS13.08.2011
PT16.08.2011
Former [2012/12]CY13.04.2011
CZ13.04.2011
DK13.04.2011
EE13.04.2011
FI13.04.2011
HR13.04.2011
IE13.04.2011
LT13.04.2011
LV13.04.2011
NL13.04.2011
PL13.04.2011
RO13.04.2011
SE13.04.2011
SI13.04.2011
SK13.04.2011
NO13.07.2011
GR14.07.2011
ES24.07.2011
IS13.08.2011
PT16.08.2011
Former [2012/02]CY13.04.2011
FI13.04.2011
HR13.04.2011
LT13.04.2011
LV13.04.2011
NL13.04.2011
SE13.04.2011
SI13.04.2011
NO13.07.2011
GR14.07.2011
ES24.07.2011
IS13.08.2011
PT16.08.2011
Former [2011/50]CY13.04.2011
FI13.04.2011
HR13.04.2011
LT13.04.2011
LV13.04.2011
SE13.04.2011
SI13.04.2011
NO13.07.2011
GR14.07.2011
ES24.07.2011
IS13.08.2011
PT16.08.2011
Former [2011/49]CY13.04.2011
FI13.04.2011
HR13.04.2011
LT13.04.2011
SE13.04.2011
NO13.07.2011
GR14.07.2011
ES24.07.2011
PT16.08.2011
Former [2011/48]LT13.04.2011
SE13.04.2011
NO13.07.2011
PT16.08.2011
Former [2011/47]LT13.04.2011
NO13.07.2011
PT16.08.2011
Documents cited:Search[DX]WO2004098324  (NICSTIC AG [CH], et al) [DX] 1-4,14,15 * page 2 - page 4; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]DE10064288  (YANG YONG SUNG [KR]) [A] 1,14 * column 3, line 6 - line 38; figures 1-4 *;
 [X]US2003209240  (HALE RON L [US], et al) [X] 1,15 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0021]; figures 1-5; example 1 *;
 [X]US2005016549  (BANERJEE CHANDRA KUMAR [US], et al) [X] 1,2,14,15 * figure 15; example 5 *;
 [A]GB1033674  (BATTELLE MEMORIAL INSTITUTE) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2005236006  (COWAN ANDERSON [US]) [A] * the whole document *;
 [A]US5146934  (DEEVI SEETHARAMA C [US], et al) [A] * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2006053521  (WERNER JOHANNES [DE]) [A] 14 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2003111088  (FOX BARBARA S [US]) [A] * the whole document *
by applicantWO2007054167
 DE202006001663U
 DE102006047146
 DE102006004484
 DE69012823T
 WO2004098324
 US2005016549