EP2194190 - Expansion joint bridging device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2013 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mageba S.A. Solistrasse 68 8180 Bülach / CH | [2010/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Flietner, Mario Schorndorfer Strasse 52-4 73730 Esslingen / DE | [2010/23] | Representative(s) | Möhring, Friedrich Grättinger - Möhring - von Poschinger Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 16 55 82306 Starnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/30] | Möhring, Friedrich Grättinger - Möhring - von Poschinger Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Postfach 16 55 82306 Starnberg / DE | ||
Former [2010/23] | Möhring, Friedrich Grättinger - Möhring - von Poschinger Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Postfach 16 55 82306 Starnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 08021039.6 | 04.12.2008 | [2010/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2194190 | Date: | 09.06.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2194190 | Date: | 25.07.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | E01D19/06 | [2010/23] | CPC: |
E01D19/06 (EP);
E01D19/062 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/23] | Title | German: | Dehnfugen-Überbrückungsvorrichtung | [2010/23] | English: | Expansion joint bridging device | [2010/23] | French: | Dispositif pontant pour un joint de dilatation | [2010/23] | Examination procedure | 07.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/03] | 30.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.08.2011 | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.12.2008 | CY | 25.07.2012 | CZ | 25.07.2012 | DK | 25.07.2012 | EE | 25.07.2012 | FI | 25.07.2012 | HR | 25.07.2012 | IT | 25.07.2012 | LT | 25.07.2012 | LV | 25.07.2012 | MT | 25.07.2012 | NL | 25.07.2012 | PL | 25.07.2012 | RO | 25.07.2012 | SE | 25.07.2012 | SI | 25.07.2012 | SK | 25.07.2012 | TR | 25.07.2012 | BG | 25.10.2012 | NO | 25.10.2012 | GR | 26.10.2012 | ES | 05.11.2012 | IS | 25.11.2012 | PT | 26.11.2012 | GB | 04.12.2012 | IE | 04.12.2012 | LU | 04.12.2012 | BE | 31.12.2012 | CH | 31.12.2012 | LI | 31.12.2012 | MC | 31.12.2012 | FR | 02.01.2013 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
IT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
MT | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
RO | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
TR | 25.07.2012 | ||
BG | 25.10.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
ES | 05.11.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
GB | 04.12.2012 | ||
IE | 04.12.2012 | ||
LU | 04.12.2012 | ||
BE | 31.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
FR | 02.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
IT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
MT | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
RO | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
TR | 25.07.2012 | ||
BG | 25.10.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
ES | 05.11.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
GB | 04.12.2012 | ||
IE | 04.12.2012 | ||
BE | 31.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
FR | 02.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
IT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
MT | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
RO | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
BG | 25.10.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
ES | 05.11.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
GB | 04.12.2012 | ||
IE | 04.12.2012 | ||
BE | 31.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
FR | 02.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
IT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
RO | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
BG | 25.10.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
ES | 05.11.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
IE | 04.12.2012 | ||
BE | 31.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
FR | 02.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
IT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
RO | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
BG | 25.10.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
ES | 05.11.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
IE | 04.12.2012 | ||
BE | 31.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/47] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
IT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
RO | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
BG | 25.10.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
ES | 05.11.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
IE | 04.12.2012 | ||
BE | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/44] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
IT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
RO | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
BG | 25.10.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
ES | 05.11.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
BE | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
IT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
RO | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
BG | 25.10.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
ES | 05.11.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
IT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
RO | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
ES | 05.11.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
IT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
RO | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
ES | 05.11.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
ES | 05.11.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 25.07.2012 | |
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 25.07.2012 | |
NO | 25.10.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5228255 (HAHN ROBERT B [US]) [X] 1-7,11,18 * column 1, line 12 - line 26 * * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 1 * * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 24 * * column 4, line 50 - line 55; figure - *; | [Y]US4305680 (RAUCHFUSS JR ARTHUR A) [Y] 1-18 * figures 3,4 *; | [Y]EP0839967 (YAMAX KK [JP]) [Y] 1-18 * figure -; claims 1,2 * * column 7, line 3 - line 12 * * column 8, line 6 - line 25 *; | [A]EP1741846 (SIKA TECHNOLOGY AG [CH]) [A] 13,14,16,17 * abstract * * column 3, line 8 - line 11 * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0016]; figure - *; | [A]US2005171248 (LI YANMEI [US], et al) [A] 12,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0012]; figure - * | Examination | DE3739717 | by applicant | DE19705531 | EP1327026 | DE4433909 | DE4138347 | DE19803004 | DE19630328 | EP0821104 | EP1621674 | DE8816536U | DE3522864 | DE8010697U | US4305680 | EP0839967 |