Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2031147

EP2031147 - Floor covering consisting of laminated hard floor panels [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2009/10]Hard floor panels, floor coverings consisting of hard floor panels, methods of assembling hard floor panels and method for manufacturing such floor panels
[2016/22]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.06.2018
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip15.06.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 18.07.2018  [2018/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Unilin Beheer B.V.
Beneluxstraat 1
5061 KD Oisterwijk / NL
[2015/11]
Former [2009/10]For all designated states
Unilin Beheer B.V.
Besloten Vennootschap, Hoogeveenenweg 28
2913 LV Nieuwerkerk aan de IJssel / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Moriau, Stefan, S., G.
Nerviëslei 29
2900 Schoten / BE
02 / Cappelle, Mark, G., M.
Cardijnlaan 8
8840 Staden / BE
03 / Thiers, Bernard, P., J.
Nestor de Tièrestraat 128
9700 Eine / BE
 [2009/10]
Representative(s)Schacht, Benny Marcel Corneel
Mohawk International Services, BVBA
Patent department
Ooigemstraat 3
8710 Wielsbeke / BE
[N/P]
Former [2009/10]Donné, Eddy
Bureau M.F.J. Bockstael nv Arenbergstraat 13
2000 Antwerpen / BE
Application number, filing date08021267.307.06.1997
[2009/10]
Priority number, dateBE1996000052711.06.1996         Original published format: BE 9600527
BE1997000034415.04.1997         Original published format: BE 9700344
[2009/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2031147
Date:04.03.2009
Language:EN
[2009/10]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2031147
Date:14.10.2009
[2009/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.09.2009
ClassificationInternational:E04F15/04, E04F15/02, E04F15/10
[2016/21]
Former International [2009/10]E04F15/02, F16B5/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2009/10]
TitleGerman:Bodenbelag aus laminierten Hartbodenplatten[2016/22]
English:Floor covering consisting of laminated hard floor panels[2016/22]
French:Revêtement de sol constitué de panneaux de sol durs laminés[2016/22]
Former [2009/10]Hartbodenplatten, Bodenbeläge aus Hartbodenplatten, Verlegeverfahren für solche Hartbodenplatten und Herstellungsverfahren für solche Hartbodenplatten
Former [2009/10]Hard floor panels, floor coverings consisting of hard floor panels, methods of assembling hard floor panels and method for manufacturing such floor panels
Former [2009/10]Panneaux de sol durs, revêtements de sol constitués de panneaux de sol durs, procédés d'assemblage de tels panneaux de sol et procédé de fabrication de tels panneaux de sol
Examination procedure09.04.2010Examination requested  [2010/21]
12.05.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.11.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.05.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.11.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.06.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.12.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.07.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.01.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.10.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.02.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/29]
13.03.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2018/29]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP00201515.4  / EP1024234
EP02076363.7  / EP1223267
EP05076551.0  / EP1589161
EP97928169.8  / EP0843763
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19970928169) is  29.03.1999
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
08.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
08.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
08.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
08.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
08.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
08.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
08.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
08.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
02.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 12
20.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 13
25.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 14
17.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 15
23.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 16
21.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 17
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 18
30.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 19
27.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 20
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
08.12.200803   M06   Fee paid on   08.06.2009
08.12.200804   M06   Fee paid on   08.06.2009
08.12.200805   M06   Fee paid on   08.06.2009
08.12.200806   M06   Fee paid on   08.06.2009
08.12.200807   M06   Fee paid on   08.06.2009
08.12.200808   M06   Fee paid on   08.06.2009
08.12.200809   M06   Fee paid on   08.06.2009
08.12.200810   M06   Fee paid on   08.06.2009
08.12.200811   M06   Fee paid on   08.06.2009
Documents cited:Search[XY]JPH07300979  (DAIKEN TRADE & INDUSTRY) [X] 3,15 * the whole document * [Y] 1,4,14;
 [X]JPH08109734  (NAT HOUSE IND) [X] 1,15 * the whole document *;
 [X]JPH03169967  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [X] 1,15 * the whole document *;
 [Y]WO9505274  (CHRISTIANS WALDEMAR [DE]) [Y] 14 * page 6, paragraph 2 * * figure 6 *;
 [X]WO9426999  (VALINGE ALUMINIUM AB [SE], et al) [X] 1,15 * page 12, line 23 - line 24 * * figure - *;
 [Y]US4426820  (TERBRACK HEINZ [DE], et al) [Y] 1,4 * figures 11-26 *;
 [A]GB1027709  (JUNCKERS SAVVAERK AS) [A] 1,3 * the whole document *
 [A]  - FIBO-TRESPO, "Fibo-Trespo Alloc. Der Laminatboden, der ohne Leim verlegt wird", 19950101, (19950101), pages 1 - 31, XP007909062 [A] 1 * the whole document *
by applicantWO9426999
 WO9313280
 WO9401628
 WO9627719
 WO9627721
 GB424057
 GB2117813
 GB2256023
 DE3544845