Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2050445

EP2050445 - Pharmaceutical composition of phenofibrate with high bioavailability and method for preparing same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  24.05.2013
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.08.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
24.08.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BGP Products Operations GmbH
Hegenheimermattweg 127
4123 Allschwil / CH
[2016/30]
Former [2013/24]For all designated states
Laboratoires Fournier SAS
42 Rue Rouget De Lisle
92150 Suresnes / FR
Former [2009/17]For all designated states
Laboratoires Fournier S.A.
28 Boulevard Clémenceau
21000 Dijon / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Stamm, André
33A rue des Olives
67870 Griesheim / FR
02 / Seth, Pawan
10 Meryton
Irvine, CA 92612 / US
 [2009/17]
Representative(s)August Debouzy
6-8, avenue de Messine
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2013/15]August & Debouzy avocats
6-8 avenue de Messine
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2009/17]Hirsch & Associés
58, avenue Marceau
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date08021428.116.01.1998
[2009/17]
Priority number, dateFR1997000047917.01.1997         Original published format: FR 9700479
[2009/17]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2050445
Date:22.04.2009
Language:FR
[2009/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2050445
Date:09.09.2009
[2009/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2050445
Date:26.06.2013
Language:FR
[2013/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.08.2009
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/215, A61K9/16, A61K9/20, A61K9/50, A61K9/10
[2009/17]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2009/17]
TitleGerman:Pharmazeutische Fenofibrat-Zusammensetzung, die eine hohe Bioverfügbarkeit aufweist, und ihr Herstellungsverfahren[2009/17]
English:Pharmaceutical composition of phenofibrate with high bioavailability and method for preparing same[2009/17]
French:Composition pharmaceutique de fénofibrate présentant une biodisponibilité élevée et son procédé de préparation[2009/17]
Examination procedure09.03.2010Examination requested  [2010/15]
22.03.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.01.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.08.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.04.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
16.05.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.04.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.04.2013Observations by third parties
24.04.2013Observations by third parties
06.05.2013Fee for grant paid
06.05.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP02018029.5  / EP1273294
EP04011004.1  / EP1468681
EP98900125.0  / EP0952829
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19980900125) is  07.06.2001
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  24.03.2014  01.04.2014  WITHDRAWN
DOC Generici S.r.l.
Via Turati, 40
20121 Milan / IT
Opponent's representative
Bottero, Carlo
Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A.
Via Borgonuovo, 10
20121 Milano / IT
 02  26.03.2014  31.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Prof. Hörnchen, Ulrich
Steinenkreuz 28
53773 Hennef / DE
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB, et al
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2014/19]
Opponent(s)01  24.03.2014  01.04.2014  WITHDRAWN
DOC Generici S.r.l.
Via Turati, 40
20121 Milan / IT
Opponent's representative
Bottero, Carlo
Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A.
Via Borgonuovo, 10
20121 Milano / IT
 02  26.03.2014  31.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Prof. Hörnchen, Ulrich
Steinenkreuz 28
53773 Hennef / DE
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner, et al
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Former [2014/18]
Opponent(s)01  24.03.2014   
DOC Generici S.r.l.
Via Turati, 40
20121 Milan / IT
Opponent's representative
Bottero, Carlo
Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A.
Via Borgonuovo, 10
20121 Milano / IT
 02  26.03.2014   
Prof. Hörnchen, Ulrich
Steinenkreuz 28
53773 Hennef / DE
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner, et al
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
06.05.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
17.11.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
18.12.2015Date of oral proceedings
26.01.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
24.06.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
Appeal following opposition31.08.2016Appeal received No.  T1917/16
05.11.2016Statement of grounds filed
16.08.2016Appeal received No.  T1917/16
24.10.2016Statement of grounds filed
20.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
16.05.2012Request for further processing filed
16.05.2012Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
01.06.2012Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
19.01.2011Request for further processing filed
19.01.2011Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
31.01.2011Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
14.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
14.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
14.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
14.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
14.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
14.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
14.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
14.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
14.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 12
01.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 13
31.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 14
31.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 15
12.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 16
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB15.01.2018
IE16.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
PT24.01.2018
[2018/38]
Former [2018/27]GB15.01.2018
IE16.01.2018
PT24.01.2018
Former [2018/23]GB15.01.2018
IE16.01.2018
Former [2018/21]GB15.01.2018
Former [2014/09]deleted
Former [2014/03]IT16.01.2013
Documents cited:Search[L]  - ETHYPHARM, "Réalisation d'une composition à base de fénofibrate micronisé et de polymère hydrophile selon l'inseignement du brevet EP 0 952 829", -, (20060427), pages 1 - 5, XP002534852 [L] 1-14 * the whole document *
 [L]  - ETHYPHARM, "Rapport d'essais - Opposition au brevet français 97 00479 (Stamm, Laboratoires Fournier)", -, (200609), XP002534853 [L] 1-14 * the whole document *
 [L]  - ANONYMOUS, "Mémoire relatif à l'opposition du brevet EP0952829", -, (20060502), XP002534854 [L] 1-14 * the whole document *
by applicantEP0330532
 EP0519144
 WO9601621
    - KUCHIKI ET AL., "Stable Solid Dispersion System Against Humidity", YAKUZAIGAKU, (1984), vol. 44, no. 1, pages 31 - 37
    - Die Tablette, pages 211 - 212
otherEP1273294
 EP0952829
 EP0761208