Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2197167

EP2197167 - Device and method for short range communication [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.05.2018
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.06.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.02.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 13.11.2019  [2019/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vodafone Holding GmbH
Mannesmannufer 2
40213 Düsseldorf / DE
[2010/24]
Inventor(s)01 / Hoeksel, Sebastiaan
Gronsvelderweg 146
6229 VN Maastricht / NL
02 / Koraichi Naijib
Kruisstraat 38
6333 CT Schimmert / NL
03 / Waters Patrick H.
Lindum Chapel Lane
SP5 2HN Redlynch Salisbury / GB
 [2010/24]
Representative(s)Jostarndt Patentanwalts-AG
Philipsstrasse 8
52068 Aachen / DE
[2017/28]
Former [2010/24]Jostarndt, Hans-Dieter
Jostarndt Patentanwalts-AG Brüsseler Ring 51
52074 Aachen / DE
Application number, filing date08021612.012.12.2008
[2010/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2197167
Date:16.06.2010
Language:EN
[2010/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2197167
Date:12.07.2017
Language:EN
[2017/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.10.2009
ClassificationInternational:G06K7/10, G06K7/00, H04L29/06, H04B7/00
[2017/09]
Former International [2010/24]H04L29/06
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2017/28]
Former [2010/24]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung und Verfahren für Kurzstreckenkommunikation[2010/24]
English:Device and method for short range communication[2010/24]
French:Dispositif et procédé pour communication à courte distance[2010/24]
Examination procedure13.12.2010Examination requested  [2011/03]
27.12.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.03.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.09.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.03.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.11.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
23.01.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.02.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.05.2017Fee for grant paid
29.05.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
29.05.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.12.2010
Opposition(s)13.04.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
23.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
19.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
27.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
22.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
22.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
23.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU12.12.2008
AT12.07.2017
CY12.07.2017
CZ12.07.2017
DK12.07.2017
EE12.07.2017
ES12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
HR12.07.2017
IT12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
LV12.07.2017
MC12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
PL12.07.2017
RO12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
SI12.07.2017
SK12.07.2017
BG12.10.2017
NO12.10.2017
GR13.10.2017
IS12.11.2017
IE12.12.2017
LU12.12.2017
MT12.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
[2019/46]
Former [2019/31]HU12.12.2008
AT12.07.2017
CZ12.07.2017
DK12.07.2017
EE12.07.2017
ES12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
HR12.07.2017
IT12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
LV12.07.2017
MC12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
PL12.07.2017
RO12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
SI12.07.2017
SK12.07.2017
BG12.10.2017
NO12.10.2017
GR13.10.2017
IS12.11.2017
IE12.12.2017
LU12.12.2017
MT12.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
Former [2019/30]AT12.07.2017
CZ12.07.2017
DK12.07.2017
EE12.07.2017
ES12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
HR12.07.2017
IT12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
LV12.07.2017
MC12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
PL12.07.2017
RO12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
SI12.07.2017
SK12.07.2017
BG12.10.2017
NO12.10.2017
GR13.10.2017
IS12.11.2017
IE12.12.2017
LU12.12.2017
MT12.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
Former [2018/52]AT12.07.2017
CZ12.07.2017
DK12.07.2017
EE12.07.2017
ES12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
HR12.07.2017
IT12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
LV12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
PL12.07.2017
RO12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
SI12.07.2017
SK12.07.2017
BG12.10.2017
NO12.10.2017
GR13.10.2017
IS12.11.2017
IE12.12.2017
LU12.12.2017
MT12.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
Former [2018/50]AT12.07.2017
CZ12.07.2017
DK12.07.2017
EE12.07.2017
ES12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
HR12.07.2017
IT12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
LV12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
PL12.07.2017
RO12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
SI12.07.2017
SK12.07.2017
BG12.10.2017
NO12.10.2017
GR13.10.2017
IS12.11.2017
IE12.12.2017
LU12.12.2017
MT12.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
Former [2018/45]AT12.07.2017
CZ12.07.2017
DK12.07.2017
EE12.07.2017
ES12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
HR12.07.2017
IT12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
LV12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
PL12.07.2017
RO12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
SI12.07.2017
SK12.07.2017
BG12.10.2017
NO12.10.2017
GR13.10.2017
IS12.11.2017
IE12.12.2017
LU12.12.2017
MT12.12.2017
Former [2018/43]AT12.07.2017
CZ12.07.2017
DK12.07.2017
EE12.07.2017
ES12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
HR12.07.2017
IT12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
LV12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
PL12.07.2017
RO12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
SI12.07.2017
SK12.07.2017
BG12.10.2017
NO12.10.2017
GR13.10.2017
IS12.11.2017
LU12.12.2017
MT12.12.2017
Former [2018/39]AT12.07.2017
CZ12.07.2017
DK12.07.2017
EE12.07.2017
ES12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
HR12.07.2017
IT12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
LV12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
PL12.07.2017
RO12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
SI12.07.2017
SK12.07.2017
BG12.10.2017
NO12.10.2017
GR13.10.2017
IS12.11.2017
Former [2018/25]AT12.07.2017
CZ12.07.2017
DK12.07.2017
EE12.07.2017
ES12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
HR12.07.2017
IT12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
LV12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
PL12.07.2017
RO12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
SK12.07.2017
BG12.10.2017
NO12.10.2017
GR13.10.2017
IS12.11.2017
Former [2018/23]AT12.07.2017
CZ12.07.2017
DK12.07.2017
EE12.07.2017
ES12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
HR12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
LV12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
PL12.07.2017
RO12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
SK12.07.2017
BG12.10.2017
NO12.10.2017
GR13.10.2017
IS12.11.2017
Former [2018/21]AT12.07.2017
CZ12.07.2017
DK12.07.2017
ES12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
HR12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
LV12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
PL12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
BG12.10.2017
NO12.10.2017
GR13.10.2017
IS12.11.2017
Former [2018/12]AT12.07.2017
ES12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
HR12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
LV12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
PL12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
BG12.10.2017
NO12.10.2017
GR13.10.2017
IS12.11.2017
Former [2018/11]AT12.07.2017
ES12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
HR12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
PL12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
BG12.10.2017
NO12.10.2017
GR13.10.2017
IS12.11.2017
Former [2018/10]AT12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
HR12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
NO12.10.2017
Former [2018/09]FI12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
NO12.10.2017
Former [2018/08]FI12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
NO12.10.2017
Former [2018/07]LT12.07.2017
NO12.10.2017
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO2008107437  (BOUYGUES TELECOM SA [FR], et al) [X] 1-10,13-15 * page 1, line 1 - page 4, line 15; figure 1 * * page 8, line 4 - line 11 * [Y] 11,12;
 [A]US2006165060  (DUA ROBIN [US]) [A] 1-15 * page 1, paragraph 1 - page 3, paragraph 26 *
 [Y]  - "NFC-Dongle. Add-on Package", SCM MICROSYSTEMS, (20080618), URL: http://www.scmmicro.com/scl3710/download/Dat_SCL3710_add-on.pdf, (20090817), XP002541672 [Y] 11,12 * the whole document *
by applicantWO2008107437