Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1982584

EP1982584 - Method of and implement for milking dairy animals [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.05.2013
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
19.10.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Maasland N.V.
Weverskade 110
3147 PA Maassluis / NL
[2008/43]
Inventor(s)01 / Borsen, Paul Clemens
Amersfoortseweg 36
3751 LK Bunschoten / NL
 [2008/43]
Representative(s)Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V.
Cornelis van der Lelylaan 1
3147 PB Maassluis / NL
[N/P]
Former [2008/43]Corten, Maurice Jean F.M. , et al
Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 110
3147 PA Maassluis / NL
Application number, filing date08075281.904.04.2008
[2008/43]
Priority number, dateNL2007103371218.04.2007         Original published format: NL 1033712
[2008/43]
Filing languageNL
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1982584
Date:22.10.2008
Language:EN
[2008/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1982584
Date:19.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.08.2008
ClassificationInternational:A01K1/12
[2008/43]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/43]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Einsatz zum Melken von Milchtieren[2008/43]
English:Method of and implement for milking dairy animals[2008/43]
French:Procédé et mise en oeuvre pour animaux à traite laitière[2008/43]
Examination procedure01.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/03]
21.01.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.05.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.07.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.11.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.02.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.07.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.12.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.05.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.11.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.02.2013Fee for grant paid
07.02.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.01.2009
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  19.03.2014  14.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
DeLaval International AB
P O Box 39
147 21 TUMBA / SE
Opponent's representative
Jennings, Michael John, et al
A.A. Thornton & Co.
10 Old Bailey
London EC4M 7NG / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2014/17]
Opponent(s)01  19.03.2014   
DeLaval International AB
P O Box 39
147 21 TUMBA / SE
Opponent's representative
Jennings, Michael John, et al
A.A. Thornton & Co.
235 High Holborn
London, WC1V 7LE / GB
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
29.04.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
27.10.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
18.03.2016Date of oral proceedings
22.04.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
22.04.2016Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition15.06.2016Appeal received No.  T1448/16
31.08.2016Statement of grounds filed
22.04.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.04.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
25.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
02.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
02.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU04.04.2008
AT19.06.2013
BE19.06.2013
CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
HR19.06.2013
IT19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
MC19.06.2013
MT19.06.2013
PL19.06.2013
RO19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
TR19.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
NO19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
IS19.10.2013
PT21.10.2013
IE04.04.2014
LU04.04.2014
CH30.04.2014
FR30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU04.04.2008
AT19.06.2013
BE19.06.2013
CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
HR19.06.2013
IT19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
MC19.06.2013
MT19.06.2013
PL19.06.2013
RO19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
NO19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
IS19.10.2013
PT21.10.2013
IE04.04.2014
LU04.04.2014
CH30.04.2014
FR30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
Former [2016/16]AT19.06.2013
BE19.06.2013
CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
HR19.06.2013
IT19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
MC19.06.2013
MT19.06.2013
PL19.06.2013
RO19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
NO19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
IS19.10.2013
PT21.10.2013
IE04.04.2014
LU04.04.2014
CH30.04.2014
FR30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
Former [2015/21]AT19.06.2013
BE19.06.2013
CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
HR19.06.2013
IT19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
MC19.06.2013
PL19.06.2013
RO19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
NO19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
IS19.10.2013
PT21.10.2013
IE04.04.2014
LU04.04.2014
CH30.04.2014
FR30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
Former [2015/14]AT19.06.2013
BE19.06.2013
CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
HR19.06.2013
IT19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
MC19.06.2013
PL19.06.2013
RO19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
NO19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
IS19.10.2013
PT21.10.2013
LU04.04.2014
CH30.04.2014
FR30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
Former [2015/08]AT19.06.2013
BE19.06.2013
CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
HR19.06.2013
IT19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
MC19.06.2013
PL19.06.2013
RO19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
NO19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
IS19.10.2013
PT21.10.2013
LU04.04.2014
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
Former [2015/01]AT19.06.2013
BE19.06.2013
CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
HR19.06.2013
IT19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
MC19.06.2013
PL19.06.2013
RO19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
NO19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
IS19.10.2013
PT21.10.2013
LU04.04.2014
Former [2014/52]AT19.06.2013
BE19.06.2013
CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
HR19.06.2013
IT19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
MC19.06.2013
PL19.06.2013
RO19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
NO19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
IS19.10.2013
PT21.10.2013
Former [2014/24]AT19.06.2013
BE19.06.2013
CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
HR19.06.2013
IT19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
PL19.06.2013
RO19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
NO19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
IS19.10.2013
PT21.10.2013
Former [2014/11]AT19.06.2013
BE19.06.2013
CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
HR19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
PL19.06.2013
RO19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
NO19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
IS19.10.2013
PT21.10.2013
Former [2014/10]AT19.06.2013
BE19.06.2013
CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
HR19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
NO19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
IS19.10.2013
PT21.10.2013
Former [2014/09]AT19.06.2013
BE19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
HR19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
NO19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
PT21.10.2013
Former [2014/08]BE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
HR19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
NO19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
PT21.10.2013
Former [2014/02]FI19.06.2013
HR19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
NO19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
Former [2013/51]FI19.06.2013
HR19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
NO19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
Former [2013/50]FI19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
NO19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
Former [2013/49]FI19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
NO19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
Former [2013/48]LT19.06.2013
NO19.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
Former [2013/47]LT19.06.2013
NO19.09.2013
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO2006098678  (DELAVAL HOLDING AB [SE], et al) [X] 1-11,13,14,16 * page 3, line 17 - page 5, line 11 * * page 5, line 20 - page 6, line 2 * * page 8, line 10 - page 9, line 8 * * page 9, line 28 - page 10, line 21 * * page 11, line 12 - page 12, line 8 * * page 12, line 15 - page 13, line 4 * * page 14, lines 20-24 * * figure 1 * [Y] 15;
 [Y]FR2608893  (LEROUX JEAN [FR]) [Y] 15 * page 2, lines 4-34 * * figure 1 *;
 [X]WO0117339  (DELAVAL HOLDING AB [SE], et al) [X] 1-4,6-8,10,11,16 * page 2, line 31 - page 5, line 10 * * page 6, lines 1-33 * * page 7, line 20 - page 9, line 18 * * page 10, line 13 - page 11, line 2 * * figure 1 *;
 [X]US5782199  (OOSTERLING PIETER ADRIAAN [NL]) [X] 1-8,10,12-14,16 * column 2, lines 18-41 * * column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 7 * * column 3, lines 21-36 * * column 3, line 60 - column 4, line 3 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]WO03086058  (DELAVAL HOLDING AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-16 * page 5, line 15 - page 7, line 4 * * page 8, line 11 - page 9, line 23 * * page 10, line 8 - page 14, line 13 * * figure 1; claim 1 *
by applicantWO2006098678
 WO0117339
 US5782199