EP2149565 - Sulfoximine substituted chinazoline derivatives as immune modulators for the treatment of inflammatory and allergic diseases [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.02.2011 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer Schering Pharma Aktiengesellschaft Müllerstrasse 170-178 13353 Berlin / DE | [2010/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nguyen, Duy, Dr. Heinrich-Heine-Str. 27 10179 Berlin / DE | 02 /
Buchmann, Bernd, Dr. Erdmannstr. 44 16540 Hohen Neuendorf / DE | 03 /
Kosemund, Dirk, Dr. Frierich-Engels-Strasse 58 07745 Jena / DE | 04 /
Von Bonin, Arne, Dr. Rosa-Luxemburg-Strasse 6a 16548 Glienicke-Nordbahn / DE | [2010/05] | Representative(s) | Bergmann, Martina Müllerstrasse 178 13353 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/05] | Bergmann, Martina Müllerstrasse 178 13353 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 08075664.6 | 24.07.2008 | [2010/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2149565 | Date: | 03.02.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07D239/94, A61K31/517, A61P37/02, A61P37/08 | [2010/05] | CPC: |
C07D239/94 (EP,US);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2010/40] |
Former [2010/05] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Sulfonsubstituierte Chinazolinderivate als Immunmodulatoren zur Behandlung von enzündlichen und allergischen Erkrankungen | [2010/05] | English: | Sulfoximine substituted chinazoline derivatives as immune modulators for the treatment of inflammatory and allergic diseases | [2010/05] | French: | Dérivés de chinazoline substitués par du sulfonamide en tant que modulateurs d'immunité pour le traitement de inflammations et allergies | [2010/05] | Examination procedure | 04.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/13] | 21.09.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/13] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2010 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0047212 (ASTRAZENECA UK LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-14,16-18 * page 2, line 19 * * page 128 - page 130; examples 50-52 * * page 150; example 83 * * page 156; example 106 * * page 211 - page 212; examples 185-188 * * page 271; example 263 *; | [X]WO0121596 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al) [X] 1-14,16-18 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 41; table 8; compound 213 *; | [A]WO2005007672 (COLEY PHARM GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-18 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 70 - page 71; table 3; compound - * * page 73 - page 75; table 4; compound - * * page 106 - page 111; examples 8,10,11 * * page 119 - page 129; examples 19-28 ** claims 31-35,113,125,128,133,138 * | by applicant | WO9317682 | WO2004058752 | US2005222175 | WO2006076246 | - GEMÄß Y. HANG ET AL., ORG. LETT., (2004), vol. 6, pages 4775 - 4778 | - HOUBEN-WEYL, Methods of Molecular Transformations, THIEME VERLAG, (2004), vol. 16, pages 573 - 749 | - 0. MITSUNOBU, SYNTHESIS, (1981), pages 1 - 27 |