blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2031948

EP2031948 - Determination of the lifetime of a component [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  03.07.2015
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip14.08.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 16.09.2015  [2015/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vacon Oyj
Runsorintie 7
65380 Vaasa / FI
[2009/10]
Inventor(s)01 / Miettinen, Osmo
Renginkatu 6
65370 Vaasa / FI
 [2009/10]
Representative(s)Heinänen Oy Patent Agency
Äyritie 8 D
01510 Vantaa / FI
[N/P]
Former [2012/37]Järveläinen, Pertti Tauno Juhani, et al
Heinänen Oy Patent Agency Airport Plaza Äyritie 8 D
01510 Vantaa / FI
Former [2009/10]Järveläinen, Pertti Tauno Juhani, et al
Heinänen Oy Patent Agency Airport Plaza Ayritie 8 D
01510 Vantaa / FI
Application number, filing date08075723.025.08.2008
[2009/10]
Priority number, dateFI2007000560031.08.2007         Original published format: FI 20075600
[2009/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2031948
Date:04.03.2009
Language:EN
[2009/10]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2031948
Date:16.06.2010
[2010/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2031948
Date:12.09.2012
Language:EN
[2012/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.05.2010
ClassificationIPC:H05K7/20
[2009/10]
CPC:
G01R31/00 (FI); H02H7/10 (FI); H02H7/20 (FI);
H05K7/20945 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/10]
TitleGerman:Bestimmung der Lebenszeit einer Komponente[2009/10]
English:Determination of the lifetime of a component[2009/10]
French:Détermination de la durée de vie d'un composant[2009/10]
Examination procedure25.08.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.08.2010Examination requested  [2010/41]
16.04.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.07.2012Fee for grant paid
13.07.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.04.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  14.05.2013  05.06.2013  ADMISSIBLE
SEW-EURODRIVE GmbH & Co. KG
Ernst Blickle Str. 42
76646 Bruchsal / DE
Opponent's representative
Tüngler, Eberhard
Sew-Eurodrive
Ernst-Blickle-Straße 42
76646 Bruchsal / DE
 02  12.06.2013  21.06.2013  ADMISSIBLE
ABB Oy
Strömbergintie 1
00380 Helsinki / FI
Opponent's representative
Kolster Oy Ab
(Salmisaarenaukio 1)
P.O. Box 204
00181 Helsinki / FI
 [N/P]
Former [2013/50]
Opponent(s)01  14.05.2013  05.06.2013  ADMISSIBLE
SEW-EURODRIVE GmbH & Co. KG
Ernst Blickle Str. 42
76646 Bruchsal / DE
Opponent's representative
Tüngler, Eberhard
Sew-Eurodrive Ernst-Blickle-Straße 42
D-76646 Bruchsal / DE
 02  12.06.2013  21.06.2013  ADMISSIBLE
ABB Oy
Strömbergintie 1
00380 Helsinki / FI
Opponent's representative
Kolster Oy Ab
Iso Roobertinkatu 23
PO Box 148
00121 Helsinki / FI
Former [2013/44]
Opponent(s)01  14.05.2013  05.06.2013  ADMISSIBLE
SEW-EURODRIVE GmbH & Co. KG
Ernst Blickle Str. 42
76646 Bruchsal / DE
 02  12.06.2013  21.06.2013  ADMISSIBLE
ABB Oy
Strömbergintie 1
00380 Helsinki / FI
Opponent's representative
Kolster Oy Ab
Iso Roobertinkatu 23
PO Box 148
00121 Helsinki / FI
Former [2013/29]
Opponent(s)01  14.05.2013  05.06.2013  ADMISSIBLE
SEW-EURODRIVE GmbH & Co. KG
Ernst Blickle Str. 42
76646 Bruchsal / DE
 02  12.06.2013   
ABB Oy
Strömbergintie 1
00380 Helsinki / FI
Opponent's representative
Parta, Ari Petri
Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 P.O. Box 148
00121 Helsinki / FI
Former [2013/26]
Opponent(s)01  14.05.2013   
SEW-EURODRIVE GmbH & Co. KG
Ernst Blickle Str. 42
76646 Bruchsal / DE
23.07.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
23.03.2015Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
02.04.2015Legal effect of revocation of patent [2015/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
09.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
06.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU25.08.2008
AT12.09.2012
BE12.09.2012
CY12.09.2012
CZ12.09.2012
EE12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
HR12.09.2012
IT12.09.2012
LT12.09.2012
LV12.09.2012
MC12.09.2012
MT12.09.2012
NL12.09.2012
PL12.09.2012
RO12.09.2012
SE12.09.2012
SI12.09.2012
SK12.09.2012
TR12.09.2012
BG12.12.2012
NO12.12.2012
GR13.12.2012
ES23.12.2012
IS12.01.2013
PT14.01.2013
IE25.08.2013
LU25.08.2013
GB25.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
DK31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
FR01.09.2014
DE03.03.2015
[2015/38]
Former [2015/36]HU25.08.2008
AT12.09.2012
BE12.09.2012
CY12.09.2012
CZ12.09.2012
EE12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
HR12.09.2012
IT12.09.2012
LT12.09.2012
LV12.09.2012
MC12.09.2012
MT12.09.2012
NL12.09.2012
PL12.09.2012
RO12.09.2012
SE12.09.2012
SI12.09.2012
SK12.09.2012
TR12.09.2012
BG12.12.2012
NO12.12.2012
GR13.12.2012
ES23.12.2012
IS12.01.2013
PT14.01.2013
IE25.08.2013
LU25.08.2013
GB25.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
DK31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
DE03.03.2015
Former [2015/34]HU25.08.2008
AT12.09.2012
BE12.09.2012
CY12.09.2012
CZ12.09.2012
EE12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
HR12.09.2012
IT12.09.2012
LT12.09.2012
LV12.09.2012
MC12.09.2012
MT12.09.2012
NL12.09.2012
PL12.09.2012
RO12.09.2012
SE12.09.2012
SI12.09.2012
SK12.09.2012
TR12.09.2012
BG12.12.2012
NO12.12.2012
GR13.12.2012
ES23.12.2012
IS12.01.2013
PT14.01.2013
IE25.08.2013
LU25.08.2013
CH31.08.2014
DK31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
DE03.03.2015
Former [2015/32]AT12.09.2012
BE12.09.2012
CY12.09.2012
CZ12.09.2012
EE12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
HR12.09.2012
IT12.09.2012
LT12.09.2012
LV12.09.2012
MC12.09.2012
MT12.09.2012
NL12.09.2012
PL12.09.2012
RO12.09.2012
SE12.09.2012
SI12.09.2012
SK12.09.2012
TR12.09.2012
BG12.12.2012
NO12.12.2012
GR13.12.2012
ES23.12.2012
IS12.01.2013
PT14.01.2013
IE25.08.2013
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
Former [2015/20]AT12.09.2012
BE12.09.2012
CY12.09.2012
CZ12.09.2012
EE12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
HR12.09.2012
IT12.09.2012
LT12.09.2012
LV12.09.2012
MC12.09.2012
NL12.09.2012
PL12.09.2012
RO12.09.2012
SE12.09.2012
SI12.09.2012
SK12.09.2012
BG12.12.2012
NO12.12.2012
GR13.12.2012
ES23.12.2012
IS12.01.2013
PT14.01.2013
IE25.08.2013
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
Former [2014/33]AT12.09.2012
BE12.09.2012
CY12.09.2012
CZ12.09.2012
EE12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
HR12.09.2012
IT12.09.2012
LT12.09.2012
LV12.09.2012
MC12.09.2012
NL12.09.2012
PL12.09.2012
RO12.09.2012
SE12.09.2012
SI12.09.2012
SK12.09.2012
BG12.12.2012
NO12.12.2012
GR13.12.2012
ES23.12.2012
IS12.01.2013
PT14.01.2013
IE25.08.2013
Former [2014/20]AT12.09.2012
BE12.09.2012
CY12.09.2012
CZ12.09.2012
EE12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
HR12.09.2012
IT12.09.2012
LT12.09.2012
LV12.09.2012
MC12.09.2012
NL12.09.2012
PL12.09.2012
RO12.09.2012
SE12.09.2012
SI12.09.2012
SK12.09.2012
BG12.12.2012
NO12.12.2012
GR13.12.2012
ES23.12.2012
IS12.01.2013
PT14.01.2013
Former [2013/37]AT12.09.2012
BE12.09.2012
CY12.09.2012
CZ12.09.2012
EE12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
HR12.09.2012
IT12.09.2012
LT12.09.2012
LV12.09.2012
NL12.09.2012
PL12.09.2012
RO12.09.2012
SE12.09.2012
SI12.09.2012
SK12.09.2012
BG12.12.2012
NO12.12.2012
GR13.12.2012
ES23.12.2012
IS12.01.2013
PT14.01.2013
Former [2013/34]AT12.09.2012
BE12.09.2012
CY12.09.2012
CZ12.09.2012
EE12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
HR12.09.2012
LT12.09.2012
LV12.09.2012
NL12.09.2012
PL12.09.2012
RO12.09.2012
SE12.09.2012
SI12.09.2012
SK12.09.2012
BG12.12.2012
NO12.12.2012
GR13.12.2012
ES23.12.2012
IS12.01.2013
PT14.01.2013
Former [2013/31]AT12.09.2012
BE12.09.2012
CY12.09.2012
CZ12.09.2012
EE12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
HR12.09.2012
LT12.09.2012
LV12.09.2012
NL12.09.2012
PL12.09.2012
RO12.09.2012
SE12.09.2012
SI12.09.2012
SK12.09.2012
NO12.12.2012
GR13.12.2012
ES23.12.2012
IS12.01.2013
PT14.01.2013
Former [2013/28]BE12.09.2012
CY12.09.2012
CZ12.09.2012
EE12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
HR12.09.2012
LT12.09.2012
LV12.09.2012
NL12.09.2012
PL12.09.2012
RO12.09.2012
SE12.09.2012
SI12.09.2012
SK12.09.2012
NO12.12.2012
GR13.12.2012
ES23.12.2012
IS12.01.2013
PT14.01.2013
Former [2013/23]BE12.09.2012
CY12.09.2012
CZ12.09.2012
EE12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
HR12.09.2012
LT12.09.2012
LV12.09.2012
NL12.09.2012
PL12.09.2012
RO12.09.2012
SE12.09.2012
SI12.09.2012
SK12.09.2012
NO12.12.2012
GR13.12.2012
ES23.12.2012
IS12.01.2013
Former [2013/22]BE12.09.2012
CY12.09.2012
CZ12.09.2012
EE12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
HR12.09.2012
LT12.09.2012
LV12.09.2012
NL12.09.2012
SE12.09.2012
SI12.09.2012
NO12.12.2012
GR13.12.2012
ES23.12.2012
IS12.01.2013
Former [2013/20]BE12.09.2012
CY12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
HR12.09.2012
LT12.09.2012
LV12.09.2012
SE12.09.2012
SI12.09.2012
NO12.12.2012
GR13.12.2012
Former [2013/12]CY12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
HR12.09.2012
LT12.09.2012
LV12.09.2012
SE12.09.2012
SI12.09.2012
NO12.12.2012
GR13.12.2012
Former [2013/11]CY12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
HR12.09.2012
LT12.09.2012
LV12.09.2012
SI12.09.2012
NO12.12.2012
GR13.12.2012
Former [2013/10]CY12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
HR12.09.2012
LT12.09.2012
NO12.12.2012
Former [2013/09]FI12.09.2012
LT12.09.2012
NO12.12.2012
Former [2013/08]LT12.09.2012
NO12.12.2012
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH03203395  (NEMIC LAMBDA KK) [A] 1,9 * abstract *;
 [A]EP1338874  (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO [JP]) [A] 1,9 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2007153443  (LYONS ALAN M [IE], et al) [A] 1,9 * the whole document *
by applicantJPH03203395
 EP1338874
 US2007153443
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.