Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2018968

EP2018968 - Flushing controller incorporated in ink-jet recording apparatus, and flushing control method for the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.01.2010
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.01.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.02.2010  [2010/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Seiko Epson Corporation
4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome, Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 163-0811 / JP
[2009/05]
Inventor(s)01 / Kanaya, Munehide
c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5 Owa 3-chome
Suwa-shi Nagano-ken 392-8502 / JP
 [2009/05]
Representative(s)Cloughley, Peter Andrew , et al
Miller Sturt Kenyon
9 John Street
London WC1N 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/05]Cloughley, Peter Andrew , et al
Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street
London WC1N 2ES / GB
Application number, filing date08075794.118.11.1999
[2009/05]
Priority number, dateJP1998033801427.11.1998         Original published format: JP 33801498
[2009/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2018968
Date:28.01.2009
Language:EN
[2009/05]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2018968
Date:04.02.2009
[2009/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:B41J2/165
[2009/05]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2009/05]
TitleGerman:Spülkontrollgerät in einer Tintenstrahlaufzeichnungsvorrichtung und Spülverfahren dafür[2009/05]
English:Flushing controller incorporated in ink-jet recording apparatus, and flushing control method for the same[2009/05]
French:Contrôleur de position de rinçage incorporé dans l'appareil d'enregistrement à jet d'encre et procédé de rinçage utilisé pour celui-ci[2009/05]
Examination procedure05.08.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/06]
10.09.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2010/06]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP99309177.6  / EP1004445
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
29.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
29.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
29.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
29.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
29.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
29.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
29.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200911   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0842779  (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [A] 1-9 * column 2, line 43 - column 6, line 54; figure - *;
 [A]EP0585923  (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-9 * column 24, line 37 - column 26, line 51; figure 15 * * column 48, line 41 - column 49, line 23 *;
 [A]EP0822086  (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-9 * column 7, line 57 - column 8, line 31; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]EP0724965  (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-9 * column 8, line 36 - column 10, line 31; figures 1,2 * * column 12, line 21 - column 14, line 37 *