blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1920764 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1920764



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 4982
19.11.2018 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
13.03.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.03.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.03.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.03.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.03.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.03.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.02.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
26.02.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.02.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.02.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.02.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
23.02.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.02.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.02.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.02.2018 Cover sheet for fax transmission Opposition 1
21.02.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.02.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
19.02.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
19.02.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
19.02.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
19.02.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
19.02.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
19.02.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
19.02.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
19.02.2018 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
19.02.2018 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 27
19.02.2018 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 8
19.02.2018 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
19.02.2018 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 2
19.02.2018 Means of redress Opposition 2
19.02.2018 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 24
24.10.2017 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.10.2017 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.10.2017 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.10.2017 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.10.2017 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.10.2017 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.10.2017 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.10.2017 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.10.2017 Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.10.2017 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 8
18.10.2017 Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.10.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
16.10.2017 Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings Opposition 2
09.10.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.10.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.10.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.10.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.10.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.10.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.10.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.10.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.10.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.10.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.10.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.10.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.10.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.10.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.10.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.10.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.10.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.10.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.10.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.10.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.10.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.10.2017 Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.10.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
02.10.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
02.10.2017 Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.10.2017 Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings Opposition 1
29.09.2017 Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.09.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
28.09.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
28.09.2017 Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.09.2017 Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings Opposition 1
21.09.2017 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
21.09.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.09.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.09.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.09.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.09.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.09.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.09.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.09.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.09.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.09.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.09.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.09.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.09.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.09.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.09.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.09.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.09.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.09.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.09.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.09.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.09.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.09.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.09.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.09.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.09.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
01.09.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
01.09.2017 Description Opposition 1
01.09.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
01.09.2017 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
01.09.2017 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
01.09.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
30.08.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
30.08.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
30.08.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
04.08.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.08.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.08.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.08.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.08.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.08.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.08.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.07.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
14.07.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
14.07.2017 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
07.07.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.07.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.07.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.07.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.07.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.07.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.07.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.06.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
30.06.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
30.06.2017 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
12.06.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.06.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.06.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.06.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.06.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.06.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.06.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.05.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
30.05.2017 Amended description with annotations Opposition 6
30.05.2017 Description Opposition 6
30.05.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
30.05.2017 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
19.04.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.04.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.04.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.04.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.04.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.04.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.04.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.04.2017 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
07.04.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.04.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.04.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.04.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.04.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.04.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.04.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.04.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.04.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
31.03.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
31.03.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
31.03.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
31.03.2017 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
28.03.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.03.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
27.03.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.03.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
24.03.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.03.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.03.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.03.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.03.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.03.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.03.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.03.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.03.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
21.03.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.03.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.03.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
15.03.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
15.03.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
15.03.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
15.03.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
15.03.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
15.03.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
15.03.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
15.03.2017 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
15.03.2017 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
15.03.2017 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
15.03.2017 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.03.2017 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.03.2017 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.03.2017 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.03.2017 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.03.2017 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.03.2017 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.03.2017 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.03.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.03.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.03.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.03.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.03.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
03.03.2017 Amended description with annotations Opposition 2
03.03.2017 Description Opposition 2
03.03.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
03.03.2017 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
06.02.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.02.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.02.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.02.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.02.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.02.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.02.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.01.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
25.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.01.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
25.01.2017 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
18.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.01.2017 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 4
13.01.2017 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
12.01.2017 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
08.12.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.12.2016 Brief communication in opposition procedure - time limit Opposition 1
08.12.2016 Brief communication in opposition procedure - time limit Opposition 1
08.12.2016 Brief communication in opposition procedure - time limit Opposition 1
08.12.2016 Brief communication in opposition procedure - time limit Opposition 1
08.12.2016 Brief communication in opposition procedure - time limit Opposition 1
08.12.2016 Brief communication in opposition procedure - time limit Opposition 1
08.12.2016 Brief communication in opposition procedure - time limit Opposition 1
22.11.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
22.11.2016 Amended description with annotations Opposition 3
22.11.2016 Description Opposition 3
22.11.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
22.11.2016 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.09.2016 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
14.09.2016 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
14.09.2016 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 2
29.08.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
12.08.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
12.08.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
11.08.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
06.08.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
05.08.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
04.08.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
03.08.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.08.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
30.07.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
30.07.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
30.07.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
29.07.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
28.07.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
28.07.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
28.07.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
28.07.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
28.07.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
27.07.2016 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 87
27.07.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 8
02.05.2016 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 8
02.05.2016 F3317 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Proprietor + Opponent) Appeal 10
02.05.2016 Outgoing annexe(s) - Board of Appeal Appeal 10
15.04.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 7
11.04.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
24.03.2016 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 8
22.03.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 7
22.03.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 7
21.03.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 7
19.03.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
18.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
18.03.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 7
18.03.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
18.03.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
18.03.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
17.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
17.03.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
17.03.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
16.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
16.03.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
16.03.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
08.03.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 7
04.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
04.03.2016 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 6
04.03.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
04.03.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
22.02.2016 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
22.02.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 7
17.02.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 7
12.02.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 7
11.02.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
10.02.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 7
08.02.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
08.02.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
08.02.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
08.02.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
08.02.2016 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 4
04.02.2016 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 4
04.02.2016 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
04.02.2016 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 15
04.02.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 15
30.01.2016 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 2
18.01.2016 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
18.01.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 7
14.01.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
14.01.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
14.01.2016 Authorisation of representative Appeal 1
14.01.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
14.01.2016 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 2
04.12.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 7
02.12.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
02.12.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
02.12.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
26.10.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
14.10.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
14.10.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 7
13.10.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
10.10.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
08.10.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 14
07.10.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
07.10.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
04.10.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
04.10.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
04.10.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
01.10.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
30.09.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
30.09.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
29.09.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
29.09.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
29.09.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
29.09.2015 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 16
24.09.2015 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
21.09.2015 F3056 Communication: Change of Board due to the technical nature of the appeal Appeal 8
15.09.2015 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
15.09.2015 F3313 Order: change of Board due to the technical aspects of the appeal Appeal 1
21.07.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 7
15.07.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
15.07.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
15.07.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
15.07.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
15.07.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
15.07.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
15.07.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
15.07.2015 Claims Appeal 2
15.07.2015 Claims Appeal 2
15.07.2015 Claims Appeal 2
15.07.2015 Claims Appeal 2
15.07.2015 Claims Appeal 2
15.07.2015 Claims Appeal 2
15.07.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
15.07.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 18
07.07.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 7
03.07.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 7
02.07.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 7
01.07.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
01.07.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
01.07.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
01.07.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
01.07.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
30.06.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
30.06.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 7
30.06.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 7
30.06.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
30.06.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
29.06.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 7
29.06.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
29.06.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
25.06.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
25.06.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
25.06.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
24.06.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
24.06.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 7
24.06.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
24.06.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
24.06.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
23.06.2015 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
18.06.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
18.06.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
18.06.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
17.06.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
17.06.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
17.06.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
16.06.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 7
16.06.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 7
10.06.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 7
10.06.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 7
08.06.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 3
08.06.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
08.06.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
08.06.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
08.06.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
08.06.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
08.06.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
08.06.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
08.06.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
08.06.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
08.06.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
08.06.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
08.06.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
08.06.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
08.06.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
08.06.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
08.06.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
08.06.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
08.06.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
08.06.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
08.06.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
08.06.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
08.06.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
08.06.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
08.06.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
08.06.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
08.06.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
08.06.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
08.06.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
08.06.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
08.06.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 6
08.06.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 8
08.06.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 7
08.06.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 11
08.06.2015 Claims Appeal 2
08.06.2015 Claims Appeal 1
08.06.2015 Claims Appeal 1
08.06.2015 Claims Appeal 1
08.06.2015 Claims Appeal 1
08.06.2015 Claims Appeal 1
08.06.2015 Claims Appeal 1
08.06.2015 Claims Appeal 1
08.06.2015 Claims Appeal 1
08.06.2015 Claims Appeal 1
08.06.2015 Claims Appeal 1
08.06.2015 Claims Appeal 1
08.06.2015 Claims Appeal 1
08.06.2015 Claims Appeal 1
08.06.2015 Claims Appeal 1
08.06.2015 Claims Appeal 1
08.06.2015 Claims Appeal 1
08.06.2015 Claims Appeal 1
08.06.2015 Claims Appeal 2
08.06.2015 Claims Appeal 1
08.06.2015 Claims Appeal 2
08.06.2015 Claims Appeal 1
08.06.2015 Claims Appeal 1
08.06.2015 Claims Appeal 2
08.06.2015 Claims Appeal 1
08.06.2015 Claims Appeal 1
08.06.2015 Claims Appeal 2
08.06.2015 Claims Appeal 1
08.06.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 3
08.06.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
08.06.2015 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
08.06.2015 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
08.06.2015 Reply to appeal Appeal 1
08.06.2015 Reply to appeal Appeal 12
08.06.2015 Reply to appeal Appeal 104
04.06.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
04.06.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
04.06.2015 Reply to appeal Appeal 10
03.06.2015 Reply to appeal Appeal 20
03.06.2015 Reply to appeal Appeal 20
02.06.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 7
27.05.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
27.05.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
27.05.2015 Reply to appeal Appeal 15
21.04.2015 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Appeal 1
07.04.2015 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 1
29.01.2015 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
28.01.2015 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
28.01.2015 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
28.01.2015 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
28.01.2015 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
28.01.2015 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
28.01.2015 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
28.01.2015 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
28.01.2015 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
26.01.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Appeal 1
23.01.2015 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
19.01.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
19.01.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
19.01.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
19.01.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
19.01.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
19.01.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
19.01.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
19.01.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
19.01.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
19.01.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 60
19.01.2015 Claims Appeal 1
19.01.2015 Claims Appeal 2
19.01.2015 Claims Appeal 1
19.01.2015 Claims Appeal 1
19.01.2015 Claims Appeal 1
19.01.2015 Claims Appeal 1
19.01.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
19.01.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
19.01.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
19.01.2015 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 17
19.01.2015 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 1
19.01.2015 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 15
19.01.2015 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 15
15.01.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
15.01.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 5
15.01.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
15.01.2015 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 36
14.01.2015 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 26
14.01.2015 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 26
09.01.2015 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 19
07.01.2015 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 19
13.11.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 8
12.11.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 8
12.11.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 8
10.11.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 8
07.11.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
07.11.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
07.11.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
07.11.2014 Letter concerning fees and payments Appeal 1
07.11.2014 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
07.11.2014 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
07.11.2014 Notice of appeal Appeal 3
07.11.2014 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
07.11.2014 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
07.11.2014 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
07.11.2014 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
06.11.2014 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 6
06.11.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
06.11.2014 Letter concerning fees and payments Appeal 1
06.11.2014 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
06.11.2014 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
05.11.2014 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
09.10.2014 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
30.09.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
26.09.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 8
25.09.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.09.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.09.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.09.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.09.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 8
18.09.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 8
18.09.2014 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 3
17.09.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.09.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.09.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.09.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.09.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.09.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
15.09.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.09.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.09.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.09.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.09.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
10.09.2014 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
09.09.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
09.09.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
09.09.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
09.09.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
09.09.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
09.09.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
09.09.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
09.09.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
09.09.2014 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
09.09.2014 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 25
09.09.2014 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 54
09.09.2014 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
09.09.2014 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 2
09.09.2014 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 11
08.09.2014 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
08.09.2014 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 14
08.09.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.09.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.09.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.09.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.09.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.09.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.09.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.09.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.09.2014 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 2
08.09.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
08.09.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
08.09.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 2
08.09.2014 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
05.09.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
05.09.2014 Letter concerning fees and payments Appeal 1
05.09.2014 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
05.09.2014 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
05.09.2014 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
04.09.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
04.09.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
04.09.2014 Letter concerning fees and payments Appeal 1
04.09.2014 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
04.09.2014 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
04.09.2014 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
11.08.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.08.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.08.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.08.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.08.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.08.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.08.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.08.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.08.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.08.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.08.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.08.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.08.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.08.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.08.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.08.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.07.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
31.07.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
31.07.2014 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
30.07.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
30.07.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
30.07.2014 Request for correction Opposition 3
29.07.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
29.07.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
29.07.2014 Request for correction Opposition 2
24.07.2014 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 14
24.07.2014 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 2
24.07.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
24.07.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
24.07.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 2
24.07.2014 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
27.06.2014 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.06.2014 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 5
27.06.2014 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 5
25.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.06.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
24.06.2014 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
24.06.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
24.06.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.06.2014 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 14
20.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.06.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
17.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.06.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
13.06.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
13.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.06.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
13.06.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
11.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.06.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
10.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
10.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
10.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
10.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
10.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
10.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
10.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
10.06.2014 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
10.06.2014 Communication of amended entries Opposition 3
10.06.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
10.06.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
10.06.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
06.06.2014 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
04.06.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
04.06.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
03.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.06.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
30.05.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
30.05.2014 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 5
30.05.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
30.05.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
30.05.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
28.05.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.05.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.05.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.05.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.05.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.05.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.05.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.05.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
23.05.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
23.05.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
07.05.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.05.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.05.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.05.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.05.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.05.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.05.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.05.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.05.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.05.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.05.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.05.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.05.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.05.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.05.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.05.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.05.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.05.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.05.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.05.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.05.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.05.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.04.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
28.04.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
26.04.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 10
26.04.2014 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
25.04.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 4
25.04.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
25.04.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
25.04.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
25.04.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
25.04.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
25.04.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
25.04.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
25.04.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
25.04.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
25.04.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
25.04.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
25.04.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
25.04.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
25.04.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
25.04.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
25.04.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
25.04.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
25.04.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
25.04.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
25.04.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
25.04.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
25.04.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
25.04.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
25.04.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
25.04.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
25.04.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
25.04.2014 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 5
25.04.2014 Claims Opposition 1
25.04.2014 Claims Opposition 1
25.04.2014 Claims Opposition 1
25.04.2014 Claims Opposition 1
25.04.2014 Claims Opposition 1
25.04.2014 Claims Opposition 2
25.04.2014 Claims Opposition 2
25.04.2014 Claims Opposition 1
25.04.2014 Claims Opposition 1
25.04.2014 Claims Opposition 1
25.04.2014 Claims Opposition 1
25.04.2014 Claims Opposition 1
25.04.2014 Claims Opposition 1
25.04.2014 Claims Opposition 2
25.04.2014 Claims Opposition 1
25.04.2014 Claims Opposition 1
25.04.2014 Claims Opposition 1
25.04.2014 Claims Opposition 1
25.04.2014 Claims Opposition 1
25.04.2014 Claims Opposition 1
25.04.2014 Claims Opposition 2
25.04.2014 Claims Opposition 1
25.04.2014 Claims Opposition 2
25.04.2014 Claims Opposition 2
25.04.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
25.04.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 4
25.04.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
25.04.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 18
25.04.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 14
25.04.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 48
25.04.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
25.04.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
25.04.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
25.04.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
25.04.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
25.04.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
25.04.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
25.04.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
25.04.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
25.04.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
25.04.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
25.04.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
25.04.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 21
25.04.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
25.04.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
25.04.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
25.04.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
25.04.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 32
25.04.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
25.04.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 28
25.04.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
25.04.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 26
25.04.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
25.04.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
25.04.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
25.04.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
25.04.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 26
25.04.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
25.04.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
25.04.2014 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
25.04.2014 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 2
24.04.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
24.04.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
24.04.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.04.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.04.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.04.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 5
24.04.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.04.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.04.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
24.04.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
24.04.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 10
24.04.2014 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.04.2014 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.04.2014 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.04.2014 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.04.2014 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.04.2014 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.04.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.04.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
03.04.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.04.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.04.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.04.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.04.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.04.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.04.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.04.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.04.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.04.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.04.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.04.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.04.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.04.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.03.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
28.03.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.03.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.03.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.03.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.03.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.03.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.03.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.03.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 4
28.03.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 33
28.03.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
28.03.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
28.03.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
28.03.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
28.03.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
28.03.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
28.03.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 53
28.03.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
28.03.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
28.03.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
28.03.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
28.03.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
28.03.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
28.03.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
28.03.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
28.03.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
28.03.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
28.03.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
28.03.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 31
25.03.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 19
25.03.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 19
20.03.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.03.2014 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
12.03.2014 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.03.2014 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.03.2014 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
04.03.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.02.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.02.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.02.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.02.2014 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
10.02.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.02.2014 Authorisation of representative Opposition 2
10.02.2014 Request concerning the applicant/representative Opposition 1
07.02.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.02.2014 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 3
06.02.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.02.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.02.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
06.02.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
06.02.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
06.02.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
06.02.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
06.02.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
06.02.2014 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
06.02.2014 Communication of amended entries Opposition 1
05.02.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.02.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.02.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.02.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
03.02.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
03.02.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
03.02.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
31.01.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
31.01.2014 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
31.01.2014 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
30.01.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.01.2014 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 22
29.01.2014 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
29.01.2014 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
29.01.2014 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
29.01.2014 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
29.01.2014 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
29.01.2014 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
29.01.2014 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
29.01.2014 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
29.01.2014 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
29.01.2014 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.01.2014 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
10.01.2014 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 2
04.11.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.11.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.11.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.11.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.11.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.11.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.11.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.10.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
28.10.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
28.10.2013 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
28.10.2013 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
28.10.2013 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
28.10.2013 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
28.10.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 29
28.10.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 36
28.10.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
28.10.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
28.10.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
28.10.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
28.10.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
28.10.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 24
28.10.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
28.10.2013 Claims Opposition 2
28.10.2013 Claims Opposition 2
28.10.2013 Claims Opposition 1
28.10.2013 Claims Opposition 1
28.10.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
28.10.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
28.10.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
28.10.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
28.10.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 30
28.10.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
28.10.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
28.10.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
28.10.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
28.10.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
28.10.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
28.10.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
28.10.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 56
28.10.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 27
28.10.2013 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 1
28.10.2013 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 46
02.09.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
02.09.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
02.09.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
02.09.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
02.09.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
02.09.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
02.09.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
02.09.2013 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
28.08.2013 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
22.08.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
22.08.2013 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
22.08.2013 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
17.04.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.04.2013 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
17.04.2013 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
17.04.2013 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
17.04.2013 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
17.04.2013 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
17.04.2013 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
17.04.2013 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
17.04.2013 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
05.04.2013 Letter which had not been notified Opposition 14
05.04.2013 Letter which had not been notified Opposition 1
25.03.2013 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
25.03.2013 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
25.03.2013 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
25.03.2013 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
25.03.2013 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
25.03.2013 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
25.03.2013 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
25.03.2013 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
28.02.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
28.02.2013 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
26.02.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.02.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.02.2013 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
25.02.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.02.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.02.2013 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
22.02.2013 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
22.02.2013 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
21.02.2013 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
21.02.2013 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
21.02.2013 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
20.02.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
20.02.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
20.02.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
19.02.2013 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 4
19.02.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
19.02.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
19.02.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
19.02.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
19.02.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
19.02.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 15
19.02.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
19.02.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 40
19.02.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
19.02.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
19.02.2013 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
18.02.2013 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
18.02.2013 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 46
18.02.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
18.02.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
18.02.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
18.02.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
18.02.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
18.02.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
18.02.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
18.02.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
18.02.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 16
18.02.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
18.02.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
18.02.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
18.02.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 26
18.02.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
18.02.2013 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
15.02.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
15.02.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
15.02.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 47
15.02.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 53
15.02.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 27
15.02.2013 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
15.02.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
15.02.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
15.02.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
15.02.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
15.02.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
15.02.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
15.02.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
15.02.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
15.02.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
15.02.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
15.02.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
15.02.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
15.02.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
15.02.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
15.02.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
15.02.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
15.02.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
15.02.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
15.02.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
15.02.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
15.02.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
15.02.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
15.02.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
15.02.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
15.02.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 10
15.02.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
15.02.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
15.02.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
15.02.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
15.02.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 15
15.02.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 17
15.02.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 17
15.02.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 15
15.02.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 29
15.02.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
15.02.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 21
15.02.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
15.02.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 21
15.02.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
15.02.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
15.02.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
15.02.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
15.02.2013 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
15.02.2013 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
15.02.2013 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
15.02.2013 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
14.02.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
14.02.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
14.02.2013 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
14.02.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
14.02.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
14.02.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
14.02.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
14.02.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
14.02.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.02.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 15
14.02.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
14.02.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 12
14.02.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
14.02.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
14.02.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 36
14.02.2013 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
13.02.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 10
13.02.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
13.02.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 4
13.02.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
13.02.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
13.02.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
13.02.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
13.02.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
13.02.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
13.02.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
13.02.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
13.02.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
13.02.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
13.02.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 16
13.02.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 16
13.02.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
13.02.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
13.02.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 30
13.02.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 32
13.02.2013 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
13.02.2013 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
13.02.2013 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
26.06.2012 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
21.05.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
21.05.2012 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 3
21.05.2012 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 4
21.05.2012 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 3
21.05.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
21.05.2012 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 1
19.04.2012 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
29.03.2012 Approval of request for amendments/corrections Search / examination 1
26.03.2012 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 1
26.03.2012 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations Search / examination 3
12.03.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
12.03.2012 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
12.03.2012 Claims Search / examination 2
12.03.2012 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
12.03.2012 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
12.03.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
12.03.2012 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 2
12.03.2012 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 Search / examination 1
13.02.2012 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
13.02.2012 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
13.02.2012 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
13.02.2012 Text intended for grant Search / examination 47
02.02.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
02.02.2012 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
02.02.2012 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
22.12.2011 Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations Search / examination 1
22.12.2011 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 1
19.12.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
19.12.2011 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 3
19.12.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
19.12.2011 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
15.12.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
15.12.2011 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 15
15.12.2011 Description Search / examination 15
15.12.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
15.12.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
28.11.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
28.11.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
28.11.2011 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
28.11.2011 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
28.11.2011 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
25.09.2009 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
27.08.2009 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
15.05.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
15.05.2009 Annex Search / examination 14
15.05.2009 Annex Search / examination 5
15.05.2009 Annex Search / examination 20
15.05.2009 Annex Search / examination 12
15.05.2009 Claims Search / examination 2
15.05.2009 Claims Search / examination 2
15.05.2009 Description Search / examination 2
15.05.2009 Description Search / examination 2
15.05.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
15.05.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
05.05.2009 Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations Search / examination 1
05.05.2009 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 1
29.04.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
29.04.2009 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 14
29.04.2009 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 4
29.04.2009 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 49
29.04.2009 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 17
29.04.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
29.04.2009 Observations by third parties Search / examination 3
05.03.2009 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
02.03.2009 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
14.11.2008 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 2
14.11.2008 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
05.11.2008 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
01.10.2008 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
19.05.2008 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
08.05.2008 Refund order search fee Search / examination 1
16.04.2008 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
15.04.2008 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
03.04.2008 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
18.03.2008 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
18.03.2008 European search opinion Search / examination 2
18.03.2008 European search report Search / examination 2
25.01.2008 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
15.01.2008 Abstract Search / examination 1
15.01.2008 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
15.01.2008 Claims Search / examination 2
15.01.2008 Description Search / examination 41
15.01.2008 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
15.01.2008 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
15.01.2008 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
15.01.2008 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
15.01.2008 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
15.01.2008 Drawings Search / examination 3
15.01.2008 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 3
27.08.1994 Priority document Search / examination 27