Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1959003

EP1959003 - Soot dispersants and lubricating oil compositions containing same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  30.11.2018
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  16.09.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  29.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.11.2018(Expected) grantpublished on 02.01.2019  [2019/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Infineum International Limited
PO Box 1 Milton Hill Business and Technology Centre Abingdon
Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB
[2008/34]
Inventor(s)01 / Bera, Tushar kanti c/o Infineum USA L.P.
1900 E. Linden Avenue, PO Box 710, Building 1
Linden, NJ 07036 / US
02 / Emert, Jacob c/o Infineum USA L.P.
1900 E. Linden Avenue, PO Box 710, Building 1
Linden, NJ 07036 / US
03 / Hua, Jun c/o Infineum USA L.P.
1900 E. Linden Avenue, PO Box 710, Building 1
Linden, NJ 07036 / US
 [2008/34]
Representative(s)Hart, Richard Joseph , et al
Infineum UK Ltd.
Law Department
Milton Hill
P.O. Box 1
Abingdon, Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB
[2019/01]
Former [2008/34]Goddard, Frances Anna , et al
Milton Hill
Abingdon, Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB
Application number, filing date08101019.128.01.2008
[2008/34]
Priority number, dateUS2007067266008.02.2007         Original published format: US 672660
[2008/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1959003
Date:20.08.2008
Language:EN
[2008/34]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1959003
Date:01.10.2008
[2008/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1959003
Date:02.01.2019
Language:EN
[2019/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.08.2008
ClassificationInternational:C10M129/16, C10M129/95, C10M135/30, C10M141/06, C10M141/08, C10M145/20, C10M145/24, C10M151/04, C10M159/12, C10M161/00, C10M177/00, C07C43/20, C07C67/08, C07C69/34, C08F283/00, C08G61/02, // C10N30/04, C10N40/26, C10N70/00
[2008/36]
Former International [2008/34]C10M129/16, C10M129/95, C10M145/20, C10M145/24, C10M135/30, C10M141/06, C10M141/08, C10M141/10, C10M151/04, C10M161/00, C07C43/20, C07C67/08, C07C69/34, C08G61/02, C08F283/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2019/01]
Former [2008/34]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Rußdipergiermittel und Schmierölzusammensetzungen damit[2008/34]
English:Soot dispersants and lubricating oil compositions containing same[2008/34]
French:Agents de dispersion de suie et compositions d'huile de lubrification les contenant[2008/34]
Examination procedure28.01.2008Examination requested  [2008/34]
07.11.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.06.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
05.08.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.08.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.03.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.09.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.03.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.09.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.11.2018Fee for grant paid
22.11.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.11.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.11.2008
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
05.08.2009Request for further processing filed
05.08.2009Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
26.08.2009Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
06.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
09.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
08.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
08.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
08.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
08.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
09.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
08.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[X]US2006189492  (BERA TUSHAR K [US], et al) [X] 1,10-12,19,20,26-32 * paragraphs [0013] - [0016] - [0019] - [0021] - [0025] , [0124]; example -; claim - *;
 [X]US2978423  (ROBERT TIRTIAUX, et al) [X] 1,26 * example -; table - *;
 [E]EP1889896  (INFINEUM INT LTD [GB]) [E] 1-3,10-17,19-27,30,31 * claim - *;
 [X]US6248142  (CAPROTTI RINALDO [GB]) [X] 1 * example 1 *;
 [X]WO0116205  (GEORGIA PACIFIC RESINS [US]) [X] 1,10,19 * pages 6-11; example -; table - *;
 [X]US5770750  (HUTCHINGS DAVID A [US], et al) [X] 1,10,19 * column 33, line 20 - column 36, line 18; example -; claim - *;
 [X]US6166151  (HARIHARAN RAJAN [US], et al) [X] 1,10,19 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO8607354  (REANAL FINOMVEGYSZERGYAR [HU]) [X] 20 * examples 2,3 *;
 [X]US3737465  (KARLL R, et al) [X] 1,10,19,26 * column 1, lines 60-72 * * column 2, line 59 - column 3, line 5 *;
 [X]  - E. J. JUN ET AL., "Unique blue shift due to formation of static pyrene excimer: highly selective fluorescent chemosensor for Cu2+", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (20060518), vol. 47, no. 27, pages 4577 - 4580, XP002489303 [X] 1,10,19 * Scheme 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tetlet.2006.04.143
ExaminationEP1884556
 US4396518
by applicantUS1815022
 US4708809
 US6495496
 US6750183
 US2006189492
 US5498809
 US5663130
 US5705577
 US5814715
 US6022929
 US6030930
 US4952739
 US3087936
 US3172892
 US3215707
 US3231587
 US3272746
 US3275554
 US3381022
 US3442808
 US3565804
 US3912764
 US4110349
 US4234435
 GB1440219
 US4857217
 US4956107
 US4963275
 US5229022
 US4102798
 US4113639
 US4116876
 GB989409
 US5053152
 EP0208560
 US3632511
 US3254025
 US4839071
 US4839072
 US4579675
 US3185704
 US4663064
 US4612132
 US5334321
 US5356552
 US5716912
 US5849676
 US5861363
 US5328622
 US5026495
 US5085788
 US5259906
 US5407591
 US4686054
 US4867890
 US4764572
 US3231635
 US3700633
 US5194530
 US5299464
 US3316177
 US3326804
 US4068056
    - P. KOVACIC ET AL., J. Polymer Science: Polymer Chem., (1983), vol. 21, page 457
    - M.G. STEVENS ET AL., "Catalytic Benzene Coupling on Caesium/Nanoporous Carbon Catalysts", CHEMICAL COMMUNICATIONS, (1988), pages 2679 - 2680