blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1970836 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1970836



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 285
08.02.2008 Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language Search / examination 12
08.02.2008 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4
08.02.2008 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
08.02.2008 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
08.02.2008 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
15.02.2008 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
15.02.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
15.02.2008 Drawings Search / examination 2
15.02.2008 Description Search / examination 7
15.02.2008 Claims Search / examination 2
15.02.2008 Abstract Search / examination 1
15.02.2008 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
20.08.2008 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
22.08.2008 Invitation to file priority document Search / examination 1
15.09.2008 Priority document Search / examination 13
15.09.2008 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
22.01.2010 European search report Search / examination 2
22.01.2010 European search opinion Search / examination 3
22.01.2010 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
01.03.2010 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
18.08.2010 Written request for examination Search / examination 1
18.08.2010 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
18.08.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
17.09.2010 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
13.01.2011 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
18.01.2011 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
23.03.2011 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 2
23.03.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
23.03.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
23.03.2011 Claims Search / examination 3
23.03.2011 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 2
23.03.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
23.03.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
30.03.2011 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
30.03.2011 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
30.03.2011 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Search / examination 1
14.12.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
14.12.2011 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
14.12.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
23.12.2011 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
30.12.2011 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
29.02.2012 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 9
29.02.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
29.02.2012 Claims Search / examination 3
29.02.2012 Claims Search / examination 3
29.02.2012 Claims Search / examination 3
29.02.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
29.02.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
29.02.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
29.02.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
15.03.2012 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
16.03.2012 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
19.03.2012 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 1
19.03.2012 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
20.03.2012 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
22.03.2012 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
12.04.2012 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
12.04.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
12.04.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
12.04.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
12.04.2012 Means of redress Search / examination 2
12.04.2012 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 7
12.04.2012 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
12.04.2012 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
12.04.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
12.04.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
20.04.2012 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
26.04.2012 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
15.05.2012 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
19.06.2012 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
19.06.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
19.06.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
21.08.2012 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 10
21.08.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
21.08.2012 Claims Appeal 3
21.08.2012 Claims Appeal 3
21.08.2012 Claims Appeal 3
21.08.2012 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
21.08.2012 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
21.08.2012 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
21.08.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
05.09.2012 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
04.10.2012 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
20.02.2013 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
14.05.2013 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 2
17.05.2013 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
24.05.2013 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
31.05.2013 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
19.02.2015 Miscellaneous requests concerning client data Search / examination 1
11.07.2017 F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
13.10.2017 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
18.10.2017 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 7
18.10.2017 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 3
23.10.2017 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
15.11.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
22.12.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
22.12.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
22.12.2017 Claims Appeal 3
22.12.2017 Claims Appeal 3
22.12.2017 Claims Appeal 3
22.12.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
22.12.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
22.12.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
22.12.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
12.01.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
12.01.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
12.01.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
12.02.2018 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Appeal 2
12.02.2018 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
12.02.2018 Claims Appeal 3
12.02.2018 Claims Appeal 3
12.02.2018 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
10.04.2018 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
10.04.2018 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 20
16.04.2018 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
16.04.2018 Closing of application Search / examination 2
25.04.2018 Refund of fees Search / examination 1