blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1970836


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
20.04.2018 Refusal of application published on  23.05.2018  [2018/21]
17.02.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
11.02.2018 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
09.02.2018 New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure
26.01.2018 Change - divisional application(s) published on  28.02.2018  [2018/09]
13.10.2017 Change: Date of oral proceedings
13.10.2017 Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
14.02.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.02.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.02.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.02.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
24.05.2013 Change - representative published on  26.06.2013  [2013/26]
20.03.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.09.2012 Change: Appeal number
22.08.2012 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of appeal
22.06.2012 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
22.06.2012 New entry: Appeal number
11.04.2012 New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused
08.04.2012 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
21.02.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
07.12.2011 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
01.04.2011 Change - applicant published on  04.05.2011  [2011/18]
01.04.2011 Change - representative published on  04.05.2011  [2011/18]
25.03.2011 New entry: Reply to examination report
01.03.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.01.2011 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
24.09.2010 Definitive list of designations published on  27.10.2010  [2010/43]
17.09.2010 First examination report
10.09.2010 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
03.09.2010 Request for examination filed published on  06.10.2010  [2010/40]
24.08.2010 New entry: Fee payment for extension state
04.03.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.01.2010 Publication of search report published on  24.02.2010  [2010/08]
15.08.2008 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  17.09.2008  [2008/38]