blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1970836
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP1970836Global Dossier 24.02.2010A3
EP1970836 17.09.2008A2
Priority number Date
NL2000536 14.03.2007
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
NL2000536C 16.09.2008C2
Priority number Date
NL2000536 14.03.2007
TypeType Divisional application