blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP1970836

Designated contracting statesAT 
BE 
BG 
CH 
CY 
CZ 
DE 
DK 
EE 
ES 
FI 
FR 
GB 
GR 
HR 
HU 
IE 
IS 
IT 
LI 
LT 
LU 
LV 
MC 
MT 
NL 
NO 
PL 
PT 
RO 
SE 
SI 
SK 
TR 
Examination procedure24.01.2018Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
22.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
15.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
12.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
12.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
11.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
10.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
10.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
14.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
Appeal following examination19.06.2012APPEAL FILED
21.08.2012APPEAL STATEMENT OF GROUNDS FILED
24.01.2018APPEAL RESULT
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:17.09.2008 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:AL BA MK RS
 
Event date:17.09.2008 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:24.02.2010 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A3
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:24.02.2010 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:AL BA MK RS
 
Event date:06.10.2010 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20100818
 
Event date:20.10.2010 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20100917
 
Event date:27.10.2010 
Event description:DESIGNATION FEES PAID
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:27.10.2010 
Event description:PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES
EXTENSION STATE:MK
Payment DATE:20100818
 
Event date:04.05.2011 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:VASCO DATA SECURITY INTERNATIONAL GMBH
 
Event date:23.05.2018 
Event description:APPLICATION REFUSED
Effective DATE:20180124