Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1970836

EP1970836 - Method and system for providing an electronic signature [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  20.04.2018
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.04.2018Refusal of applicationpublished on 23.05.2018  [2018/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vasco Data Security International GmbH
World-Wide Business Center Balz-Zimmermannstrasse 7
8152 Glattbrugg / CH
[2011/18]
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
DigiNotar B.V.
Vondellaan 8
1942 LJ Beverwijk / NL
Inventor(s)01 / De Bos, Anthonie
Dorpsstraat 175
2421 AZ, Nieuwkoop / NL
02 / Batenburg, Theodorus Herrebertus Gerardus Maria
Prinsengracht 150hs
1015 EB, Amsterdam / NL
 [2008/38]
Representative(s)Beck, Michaël Andries T. , et al
IPLodge bvba
Technologielaan 9
3001 Heverlee / BE
[N/P]
Former [2013/26]Beck, Michaël Andries T. , et al
IPLodge
Bondgenotenlaan 93/5
3000 Leuven / BE
Former [2011/18]D'Halleweyn, Nele Veerle Trees Gertrudis , et al
Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1
2517 GK The Hague / NL
Former [2008/38]van Looijengoed, Ferry Antoin Theodorus , et al
De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180
1062 XK Amsterdam / NL
Application number, filing date08101403.708.02.2008
[2008/38]
Priority number, dateNL2007200053614.03.2007         Original published format: NL 2000536
[2008/38]
Filing languageNL
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1970836
Date:17.09.2008
Language:EN
[2008/38]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1970836
Date:24.02.2010
[2010/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.01.2010
ClassificationInternational:G06F21/24
[2008/38]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/38]
Extension statesMK18.08.2010
TitleGerman:Verfahren und System zur Bereitstellung von einer digitalen Signatur[2008/38]
English:Method and system for providing an electronic signature[2008/38]
French:Méthode et système fournissant une signature numérique[2008/38]
Examination procedure18.08.2010Examination requested  [2010/40]
17.09.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.03.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.03.2012Date of oral proceedings
12.04.2012Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/21]
12.04.2012Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
24.01.2018Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/21]
Appeal following examination19.06.2012Appeal received No.  T2101/12
21.08.2012Statement of grounds filed
24.01.2018Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
24.01.2018Date of oral proceedings
12.02.2018Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)EP18153107.0
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.09.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
22.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
15.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
12.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
12.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
11.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
10.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
10.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
14.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[XY]US6307955  (ZANK ANTHONY E [US], et al) [X] 1-5,8-9,11-12 * abstract * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0054] * [Y] 6-7,10;
 [Y]US2006161779  (GEOFFREY MOHAMMED A [SA]) [Y] 10 * column 9, line 3 - line 6 *;
 [Y]WO03015370  (CRYPTOMATHIC AS [DK], et al) [Y] 6 * abstract *;
 [A]US5647017  (SMITHIES CHRISTOPHER PAUL KENN [GB], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * column 2 - column 4 *;
 [YA]US2003012374  (WU JIAN KANG [SG], et al) [Y] 7 * abstract * * figure 5 * [A] 1-6,8-11;
 [A]US6085322  (ROMNEY GORDON [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *