Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1970836 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1970836



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 285
25.04.2018 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
16.04.2018 Closing of application Search / examination 2
16.04.2018 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
10.04.2018 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 20
10.04.2018 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
12.02.2018 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
12.02.2018 Claims Appeal 3
12.02.2018 Claims Appeal 3
12.02.2018 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
12.02.2018 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Appeal 2
12.01.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
12.01.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
12.01.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
22.12.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
22.12.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
22.12.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
22.12.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
22.12.2017 Claims Appeal 3
22.12.2017 Claims Appeal 3
22.12.2017 Claims Appeal 3
22.12.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
22.12.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
15.11.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
23.10.2017 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
18.10.2017 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 3
18.10.2017 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 7
13.10.2017 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
11.07.2017 F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
19.02.2015 Miscellaneous requests concerning client data Search / examination 1
31.05.2013 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
24.05.2013 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
17.05.2013 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
14.05.2013 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 2
20.02.2013 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
04.10.2012 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
05.09.2012 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
21.08.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
21.08.2012 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
21.08.2012 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
21.08.2012 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
21.08.2012 Claims Appeal 3
21.08.2012 Claims Appeal 3
21.08.2012 Claims Appeal 3
21.08.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
21.08.2012 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 10
19.06.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
19.06.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
19.06.2012 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
15.05.2012 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
26.04.2012 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
20.04.2012 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
12.04.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
12.04.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
12.04.2012 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
12.04.2012 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
12.04.2012 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 7
12.04.2012 Means of redress Search / examination 2
12.04.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
12.04.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
12.04.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
12.04.2012 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
22.03.2012 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
20.03.2012 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
19.03.2012 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
19.03.2012 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 1
16.03.2012 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
15.03.2012 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
29.02.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
29.02.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
29.02.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
29.02.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
29.02.2012 Claims Search / examination 3
29.02.2012 Claims Search / examination 3
29.02.2012 Claims Search / examination 3
29.02.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
29.02.2012 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 9
30.12.2011 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
23.12.2011 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
14.12.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
14.12.2011 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
14.12.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
30.03.2011 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Search / examination 1
30.03.2011 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
30.03.2011 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
23.03.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
23.03.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
23.03.2011 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 2
23.03.2011 Claims Search / examination 3
23.03.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
23.03.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
23.03.2011 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 2
18.01.2011 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
13.01.2011 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
17.09.2010 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
18.08.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
18.08.2010 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
18.08.2010 Written request for examination Search / examination 1
01.03.2010 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
22.01.2010 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
22.01.2010 European search opinion Search / examination 3
22.01.2010 European search report Search / examination 2
15.09.2008 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
15.09.2008 Priority document Search / examination 13
22.08.2008 Invitation to file priority document Search / examination 1
20.08.2008 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
15.02.2008 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
15.02.2008 Abstract Search / examination 1
15.02.2008 Claims Search / examination 2
15.02.2008 Description Search / examination 7
15.02.2008 Drawings Search / examination 2
15.02.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
15.02.2008 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
08.02.2008 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
08.02.2008 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
08.02.2008 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
08.02.2008 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4
08.02.2008 Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language Search / examination 12