Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2022314

EP2022314 - Transfer device for a chuff cutter [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.12.2017
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  20.01.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip21.09.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 24.10.2018  [2018/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CLAAS Saulgau GmbH
Zeppelinstrasse 2
88348 Bad Saulgau / DE
[2017/07]
Former [2016/48]For all designated states
CLAAS Selbstfahrende Erntemaschinen GmbH
Mühlenwinkel 1
33428 Harsewinkel / DE
Former [2009/07]For all designated states
CLAAS Selbstfahrende Erntemaschinen GmbH
Münsterstrasse 33
33428 Harsewinkel / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Tilly, Thomas
Petermannweg 14
48231 Warendorf / DE
02 / Isfort, Heinrich
Rödder 22
48249 Dülmen / DE
03 / Landwehr, Karl-Heinz
Schopmeyerstr. 10
49170 Hagen / DE
 [2009/07]
Application number, filing date08103932.313.05.2008
[2009/07]
Priority number, dateDE2007103771009.08.2007         Original published format: DE102007037710
[2009/07]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2022314
Date:11.02.2009
Language:DE
[2009/07]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2022314
Date:21.03.2012
Language:DE
[2012/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2022314
Date:22.02.2017
Language:DE
[2017/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.02.2012
ClassificationInternational:A01D43/08
[2009/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2017/08]
Former [2009/07]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Überladeeinrichtung für einen Feldhäcksler[2009/07]
English:Transfer device for a chuff cutter[2009/07]
French:Dispositif de transbordement pour une ramasseuse-hacheuse[2009/07]
Examination procedure17.09.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.09.2012Examination requested  [2012/44]
30.05.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.06.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.08.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.12.2016Fee for grant paid
06.12.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.12.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.05.2016
Opposition(s)23.11.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2018/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
31.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
31.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
02.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
01.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
31.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCZ22.02.2017
DK22.02.2017
EE22.02.2017
ES22.02.2017
FI22.02.2017
HR22.02.2017
IT22.02.2017
LT22.02.2017
LV22.02.2017
MC22.02.2017
MT22.02.2017
NL22.02.2017
PL22.02.2017
RO22.02.2017
SE22.02.2017
SI22.02.2017
SK22.02.2017
AT13.05.2017
IE13.05.2017
LU13.05.2017
BG22.05.2017
GB22.05.2017
NO22.05.2017
GR23.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
FR31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
PT22.06.2017
[2018/43]
Former [2018/40]CZ22.02.2017
DK22.02.2017
EE22.02.2017
ES22.02.2017
FI22.02.2017
HR22.02.2017
IT22.02.2017
LT22.02.2017
LV22.02.2017
MC22.02.2017
NL22.02.2017
PL22.02.2017
RO22.02.2017
SE22.02.2017
SI22.02.2017
SK22.02.2017
AT13.05.2017
IE13.05.2017
LU13.05.2017
BG22.05.2017
GB22.05.2017
NO22.05.2017
GR23.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
FR31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
PT22.06.2017
Former [2018/29]CZ22.02.2017
DK22.02.2017
EE22.02.2017
ES22.02.2017
FI22.02.2017
HR22.02.2017
IT22.02.2017
LT22.02.2017
LV22.02.2017
MC22.02.2017
NL22.02.2017
PL22.02.2017
RO22.02.2017
SE22.02.2017
SI22.02.2017
SK22.02.2017
IE13.05.2017
LU13.05.2017
BG22.05.2017
GB22.05.2017
NO22.05.2017
GR23.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
FR31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
PT22.06.2017
Former [2018/23]CZ22.02.2017
DK22.02.2017
EE22.02.2017
ES22.02.2017
FI22.02.2017
HR22.02.2017
IT22.02.2017
LT22.02.2017
LV22.02.2017
MC22.02.2017
NL22.02.2017
PL22.02.2017
RO22.02.2017
SE22.02.2017
SI22.02.2017
SK22.02.2017
IE13.05.2017
LU13.05.2017
BG22.05.2017
GB22.05.2017
NO22.05.2017
GR23.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
PT22.06.2017
Former [2018/21]CZ22.02.2017
DK22.02.2017
EE22.02.2017
ES22.02.2017
FI22.02.2017
HR22.02.2017
IT22.02.2017
LT22.02.2017
LV22.02.2017
MC22.02.2017
NL22.02.2017
PL22.02.2017
RO22.02.2017
SE22.02.2017
SI22.02.2017
SK22.02.2017
LU13.05.2017
BG22.05.2017
GB22.05.2017
NO22.05.2017
GR23.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
PT22.06.2017
Former [2018/17]CZ22.02.2017
DK22.02.2017
EE22.02.2017
ES22.02.2017
FI22.02.2017
HR22.02.2017
IT22.02.2017
LT22.02.2017
LV22.02.2017
MC22.02.2017
NL22.02.2017
PL22.02.2017
RO22.02.2017
SE22.02.2017
SI22.02.2017
SK22.02.2017
LU13.05.2017
BG22.05.2017
NO22.05.2017
GR23.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
PT22.06.2017
Former [2018/13]CZ22.02.2017
DK22.02.2017
EE22.02.2017
ES22.02.2017
FI22.02.2017
HR22.02.2017
IT22.02.2017
LT22.02.2017
LV22.02.2017
MC22.02.2017
NL22.02.2017
PL22.02.2017
RO22.02.2017
SE22.02.2017
SI22.02.2017
SK22.02.2017
BG22.05.2017
NO22.05.2017
GR23.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
LU31.05.2017
PT22.06.2017
Former [2018/06]CZ22.02.2017
DK22.02.2017
EE22.02.2017
ES22.02.2017
FI22.02.2017
HR22.02.2017
IT22.02.2017
LT22.02.2017
LV22.02.2017
MC22.02.2017
NL22.02.2017
PL22.02.2017
RO22.02.2017
SE22.02.2017
SK22.02.2017
BG22.05.2017
NO22.05.2017
GR23.05.2017
LU31.05.2017
PT22.06.2017
Former [2017/50]CZ22.02.2017
DK22.02.2017
EE22.02.2017
ES22.02.2017
FI22.02.2017
HR22.02.2017
IT22.02.2017
LT22.02.2017
LV22.02.2017
NL22.02.2017
PL22.02.2017
RO22.02.2017
SE22.02.2017
SK22.02.2017
BG22.05.2017
NO22.05.2017
GR23.05.2017
LU31.05.2017
PT22.06.2017
Former [2017/49]CZ22.02.2017
EE22.02.2017
ES22.02.2017
FI22.02.2017
HR22.02.2017
IT22.02.2017
LT22.02.2017
LV22.02.2017
NL22.02.2017
RO22.02.2017
SE22.02.2017
SK22.02.2017
BG22.05.2017
NO22.05.2017
GR23.05.2017
LU31.05.2017
PT22.06.2017
Former [2017/48]CZ22.02.2017
ES22.02.2017
FI22.02.2017
HR22.02.2017
LT22.02.2017
LV22.02.2017
NL22.02.2017
SE22.02.2017
BG22.05.2017
NO22.05.2017
GR23.05.2017
LU31.05.2017
PT22.06.2017
Former [2017/41]ES22.02.2017
FI22.02.2017
HR22.02.2017
LT22.02.2017
LV22.02.2017
NL22.02.2017
SE22.02.2017
BG22.05.2017
NO22.05.2017
GR23.05.2017
LU31.05.2017
PT22.06.2017
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP1344446  (DEERE & CO [US]) [X] 1-3,6-7,9 * paragraphs [0018] - [0021]; figures 1,2 * [Y] 1,3-5;
 [Y]DE19641211  (CLAAS OHG [DE]) [Y] 1,3-5 * column 2, line 34 - column 4, line 37; figures 1-6 *;
 [X]FR1502148  (MAYMONT, PAUL) [X] 1-2,4 * column 1, line 1 - column 3, line 2; figures 1-5 *;
 [A]DE2133203  (FEGU BOSCH KG) [A] 1 * the whole document *
by applicantDE1165333
 DE10335583
 DE102005016950