Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2020350

EP2020350 - System for capturing optical signals with a rain sensor and method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.08.2013
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2013No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.10.2013  [2013/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[2009/06]
Inventor(s)01 / Steinmetz, Martin
Geisinger Weg 20 B
70439, Stuttgart / DE
02 / Wolf, Frank
Konrad-Kappler-Str. 1
77815, Buehl / DE
 [2009/06]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2012/43]
Application number, filing date08104104.827.05.2008
[2009/06]
Priority number, dateDE2007103460625.07.2007         Original published format: DE102007034606
[2009/06]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2020350
Date:04.02.2009
Language:DE
[2009/06]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2020350
Date:26.05.2010
[2010/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2020350
Date:24.10.2012
Language:DE
[2012/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.04.2010
ClassificationInternational:B60S1/08, G01N21/45
[2009/06]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   HU [2011/05]
Former [2009/06]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:System zum Erfassen optischer Signale mit einem Regensensor und Verfahren[2009/06]
English:System for capturing optical signals with a rain sensor and method[2009/06]
French:Système d'enregistrement de signaux optiques à l'aide d'un capteur de pluie et procédé[2009/06]
Examination procedure26.11.2010Examination requested  [2011/01]
27.11.2010Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
20.01.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time
20.01.2011Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
22.03.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.07.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.09.2012Fee for grant paid
05.09.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.07.2012
Opposition(s)25.07.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/40]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
22.03.2011Request for further processing filed
22.03.2011Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
06.04.2011Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
31.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XDA]DE19740364  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [XD] 1-3 * column 1, line 8 - column 4, line 6; figure 1 * * column 5, line 34 - column 6, line 24 * [A] 13;
 [X]DE29924958U  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-3 * column 10 - column 12 * * column 23 - column 29; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]WO2006015905  (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1,13 * page 7, line 6 - page 1, line 8; figures 1-3 *
by applicantDE19740364