Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2025844

EP2025844 - Outward positioning device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.10.2012
Database last updated on 15.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 17.09.2014  [2014/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEGENIA-AUBI KG
Industriestrasse 1-3
57234 Wilnsdorf / DE
[2009/08]
Inventor(s)01 / The inventor has agreed to waive his entitlement to designation.
02 / The inventor has agreed to waive his entitlement to designation.
 [2009/08]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2011/51]
Application number, filing date08104457.018.06.2008
[2009/08]
Priority number, dateDE20072011079U08.08.2007         Original published format: DE 202007011079 U
[2009/08]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2025844
Date:18.02.2009
Language:DE
[2009/08]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2025844
Date:04.08.2010
[2010/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2025844
Date:21.12.2011
Language:DE
[2011/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.07.2010
ClassificationInternational:E05C17/30
[2010/31]
Former International [2009/08]E05C17/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/08]
TitleGerman:Ausstellvorrichtung[2009/08]
English:Outward positioning device[2009/08]
French:Dispositif orientable[2009/08]
Examination procedure18.08.2010Examination requested  [2010/39]
30.05.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.08.2011Fee for grant paid
01.08.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.05.2011
Opposition(s)24.09.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
08.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU18.06.2008
CY21.12.2011
CZ21.12.2011
DK21.12.2011
EE21.12.2011
FI21.12.2011
GR21.12.2011
HR21.12.2011
IE21.12.2011
IT21.12.2011
LT21.12.2011
LV21.12.2011
MT21.12.2011
NL21.12.2011
RO21.12.2011
SE21.12.2011
SI21.12.2011
SK21.12.2011
TR21.12.2011
BG21.03.2012
NO21.03.2012
ES01.04.2012
IS21.04.2012
PT23.04.2012
GB18.06.2012
LU18.06.2012
BE30.06.2012
CH30.06.2012
LI30.06.2012
MC30.06.2012
FR02.07.2012
[2014/38]
Former [2014/34]HU18.06.2008
CY21.12.2011
CZ21.12.2011
DK21.12.2011
EE21.12.2011
FI21.12.2011
HR21.12.2011
IE21.12.2011
IT21.12.2011
LT21.12.2011
LV21.12.2011
MT21.12.2011
NL21.12.2011
RO21.12.2011
SE21.12.2011
SI21.12.2011
SK21.12.2011
TR21.12.2011
BG21.03.2012
NO21.03.2012
ES01.04.2012
IS21.04.2012
PT23.04.2012
GB18.06.2012
LU18.06.2012
BE30.06.2012
CH30.06.2012
LI30.06.2012
MC30.06.2012
FR02.07.2012
Former [2014/27]CY21.12.2011
CZ21.12.2011
DK21.12.2011
EE21.12.2011
FI21.12.2011
HR21.12.2011
IE21.12.2011
IT21.12.2011
LT21.12.2011
LV21.12.2011
MT21.12.2011
NL21.12.2011
RO21.12.2011
SE21.12.2011
SI21.12.2011
SK21.12.2011
TR21.12.2011
BG21.03.2012
NO21.03.2012
ES01.04.2012
IS21.04.2012
PT23.04.2012
GB18.06.2012
LU18.06.2012
BE30.06.2012
CH30.06.2012
LI30.06.2012
MC30.06.2012
FR02.07.2012
Former [2014/21]CY21.12.2011
CZ21.12.2011
DK21.12.2011
EE21.12.2011
FI21.12.2011
HR21.12.2011
IE21.12.2011
IT21.12.2011
LT21.12.2011
LV21.12.2011
MT21.12.2011
NL21.12.2011
RO21.12.2011
SE21.12.2011
SI21.12.2011
SK21.12.2011
TR21.12.2011
BG21.03.2012
NO21.03.2012
ES01.04.2012
IS21.04.2012
PT23.04.2012
GB18.06.2012
BE30.06.2012
CH30.06.2012
LI30.06.2012
MC30.06.2012
FR02.07.2012
Former [2013/46]CY21.12.2011
CZ21.12.2011
DK21.12.2011
EE21.12.2011
FI21.12.2011
HR21.12.2011
IE21.12.2011
IT21.12.2011
LT21.12.2011
LV21.12.2011
MT21.12.2011
NL21.12.2011
RO21.12.2011
SE21.12.2011
SI21.12.2011
SK21.12.2011
BG21.03.2012
NO21.03.2012
ES01.04.2012
IS21.04.2012
PT23.04.2012
GB18.06.2012
BE30.06.2012
CH30.06.2012
LI30.06.2012
MC30.06.2012
FR02.07.2012
Former [2013/35]CY21.12.2011
CZ21.12.2011
DK21.12.2011
EE21.12.2011
FI21.12.2011
HR21.12.2011
IE21.12.2011
IT21.12.2011
LT21.12.2011
LV21.12.2011
MT21.12.2011
NL21.12.2011
RO21.12.2011
SE21.12.2011
SI21.12.2011
SK21.12.2011
BG21.03.2012
NO21.03.2012
IS21.04.2012
PT23.04.2012
GB18.06.2012
BE30.06.2012
CH30.06.2012
LI30.06.2012
MC30.06.2012
FR02.07.2012
Former [2013/29]CY21.12.2011
CZ21.12.2011
DK21.12.2011
EE21.12.2011
FI21.12.2011
HR21.12.2011
IE21.12.2011
IT21.12.2011
LT21.12.2011
LV21.12.2011
NL21.12.2011
RO21.12.2011
SE21.12.2011
SI21.12.2011
SK21.12.2011
BG21.03.2012
NO21.03.2012
IS21.04.2012
PT23.04.2012
GB18.06.2012
BE30.06.2012
CH30.06.2012
LI30.06.2012
MC30.06.2012
FR02.07.2012
Former [2013/23]CY21.12.2011
CZ21.12.2011
DK21.12.2011
EE21.12.2011
HR21.12.2011
IE21.12.2011
IT21.12.2011
LT21.12.2011
LV21.12.2011
NL21.12.2011
RO21.12.2011
SE21.12.2011
SI21.12.2011
SK21.12.2011
BG21.03.2012
NO21.03.2012
IS21.04.2012
PT23.04.2012
GB18.06.2012
BE30.06.2012
CH30.06.2012
LI30.06.2012
MC30.06.2012
FR02.07.2012
Former [2013/21]CY21.12.2011
CZ21.12.2011
DK21.12.2011
EE21.12.2011
HR21.12.2011
IE21.12.2011
IT21.12.2011
LT21.12.2011
LV21.12.2011
NL21.12.2011
RO21.12.2011
SE21.12.2011
SI21.12.2011
SK21.12.2011
BG21.03.2012
NO21.03.2012
IS21.04.2012
PT23.04.2012
GB18.06.2012
BE30.06.2012
CH30.06.2012
LI30.06.2012
MC30.06.2012
Former [2013/20]CY21.12.2011
CZ21.12.2011
DK21.12.2011
EE21.12.2011
HR21.12.2011
IE21.12.2011
IT21.12.2011
LT21.12.2011
LV21.12.2011
NL21.12.2011
RO21.12.2011
SE21.12.2011
SI21.12.2011
SK21.12.2011
BG21.03.2012
NO21.03.2012
IS21.04.2012
PT23.04.2012
BE30.06.2012
CH30.06.2012
LI30.06.2012
MC30.06.2012
Former [2013/08]CY21.12.2011
CZ21.12.2011
DK21.12.2011
EE21.12.2011
HR21.12.2011
IE21.12.2011
IT21.12.2011
LT21.12.2011
LV21.12.2011
NL21.12.2011
RO21.12.2011
SE21.12.2011
SI21.12.2011
SK21.12.2011
BG21.03.2012
NO21.03.2012
IS21.04.2012
PT23.04.2012
MC30.06.2012
Former [2012/50]CY21.12.2011
CZ21.12.2011
DK21.12.2011
EE21.12.2011
HR21.12.2011
IE21.12.2011
IT21.12.2011
LT21.12.2011
LV21.12.2011
NL21.12.2011
RO21.12.2011
SE21.12.2011
SI21.12.2011
SK21.12.2011
BG21.03.2012
NO21.03.2012
IS21.04.2012
PT23.04.2012
Former [2012/49]CY21.12.2011
CZ21.12.2011
DK21.12.2011
EE21.12.2011
HR21.12.2011
IE21.12.2011
LT21.12.2011
LV21.12.2011
NL21.12.2011
RO21.12.2011
SE21.12.2011
SI21.12.2011
SK21.12.2011
BG21.03.2012
NO21.03.2012
IS21.04.2012
PT23.04.2012
Former [2012/37]CY21.12.2011
CZ21.12.2011
EE21.12.2011
HR21.12.2011
IE21.12.2011
LT21.12.2011
LV21.12.2011
NL21.12.2011
RO21.12.2011
SE21.12.2011
SI21.12.2011
SK21.12.2011
BG21.03.2012
NO21.03.2012
IS21.04.2012
PT23.04.2012
Former [2012/36]CY21.12.2011
CZ21.12.2011
EE21.12.2011
HR21.12.2011
IE21.12.2011
LT21.12.2011
LV21.12.2011
NL21.12.2011
RO21.12.2011
SE21.12.2011
SI21.12.2011
SK21.12.2011
BG21.03.2012
NO21.03.2012
IS21.04.2012
Former [2012/35]CY21.12.2011
CZ21.12.2011
EE21.12.2011
HR21.12.2011
IE21.12.2011
LT21.12.2011
LV21.12.2011
NL21.12.2011
SE21.12.2011
SI21.12.2011
BG21.03.2012
NO21.03.2012
IS21.04.2012
Former [2012/34]CY21.12.2011
CZ21.12.2011
HR21.12.2011
LT21.12.2011
LV21.12.2011
NL21.12.2011
SE21.12.2011
SI21.12.2011
NO21.03.2012
IS21.04.2012
Former [2012/28]CY21.12.2011
HR21.12.2011
LT21.12.2011
LV21.12.2011
NL21.12.2011
SE21.12.2011
SI21.12.2011
NO21.03.2012
Former [2012/27]HR21.12.2011
LT21.12.2011
LV21.12.2011
NL21.12.2011
SE21.12.2011
SI21.12.2011
NO21.03.2012
Former [2012/24]LT21.12.2011
LV21.12.2011
NL21.12.2011
SE21.12.2011
SI21.12.2011
NO21.03.2012
Former [2012/20]LT21.12.2011
NO21.03.2012
Documents cited:Search[A]FR2148720  (PELLERIN ENTREPRISE) [A] 1 * page 2, line 15 - page 3, line 20; figures 1-8 * * the whole document *;
 [AD]DE202006000292U  (SIEGENIA AUBI KG [DE]) [AD] 1-7 * the whole document *;
 [AD]DE3904210  (SIEGENIA FRANK KG [DE]) [AD] 1-7 * the whole document *;
 [AD]EP0285754  (SIEGENIA FRANK KG [DE]) [AD] 1 * the whole document *
by applicantDE202006000292U
 DE3904210
 EP0285754