Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2025486

EP2025486 - Method and device for laterally cutting a porous concrete block [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.04.2011
Database last updated on 20.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES
published on 13.11.2013  [2013/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Xella Baustoffe GmbH
Franz-Haniel-Platz 6-8
47119 Duisburg / DE
[2009/08]
Inventor(s)01 / Schreuders, Willem Johannes
Kastanjelaan 2/D
9751, KE Staphorst / NL
 [2009/08]
Representative(s)Solf, Alexander
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Dr. Solf & Zapf
Candidplatz 15
81543 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/08]Solf, Alexander
Patentanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf Candidplatz 15
81543 München / DE
Application number, filing date08104475.219.06.2008
[2009/08]
Priority number, dateDE2007103477725.07.2007         Original published format: DE102007034777
[2009/08]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2025486
Date:18.02.2009
Language:DE
[2009/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2025486
Date:26.05.2010
Language:DE
[2010/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:B28B11/14, B26D1/553
[2009/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/08]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Querschneiden eines Porenbetonblocks[2009/08]
English:Method and device for laterally cutting a porous concrete block[2009/08]
French:Procédé et dispositif de coupe transversale d'un bloc de béton poreux[2009/08]
Examination procedure19.06.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
03.02.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.07.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.08.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.12.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.03.2010Fee for grant paid
29.03.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.03.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/18]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipDK26.05.2010
EE26.05.2010
FI26.05.2010
HR26.05.2010
IE26.05.2010
LT26.05.2010
LV26.05.2010
MT26.05.2010
RO26.05.2010
SE26.05.2010
SI26.05.2010
SK26.05.2010
TR26.05.2010
CY09.06.2010
LU19.06.2010
BE30.06.2010
MC30.06.2010
BG26.08.2010
NO26.08.2010
GR27.08.2010
ES06.09.2010
IS26.09.2010
PT26.10.2010
HU27.11.2010
[2013/46]
Former [2013/42]DK26.05.2010
EE26.05.2010
FI26.05.2010
HR26.05.2010
IE26.05.2010
LT26.05.2010
LV26.05.2010
MT26.05.2010
RO26.05.2010
SE26.05.2010
SI26.05.2010
SK26.05.2010
TR26.05.2010
CY09.06.2010
LU19.06.2010
BE30.06.2010
MC30.06.2010
BG26.08.2010
NO26.08.2010
GR27.08.2010
IS26.09.2010
PT26.10.2010
HU27.11.2010
Former [2012/47]BG26.05.2010
DK26.05.2010
EE26.05.2010
FI26.05.2010
HR26.05.2010
IE26.05.2010
LT26.05.2010
LV26.05.2010
MT26.05.2010
RO26.05.2010
SE26.05.2010
SI26.05.2010
SK26.05.2010
TR26.05.2010
CY09.06.2010
LU19.06.2010
BE30.06.2010
MC30.06.2010
NO26.08.2010
GR27.08.2010
IS26.09.2010
PT26.10.2010
HU27.11.2010
Former [2012/43]BG26.05.2010
DK26.05.2010
EE26.05.2010
FI26.05.2010
HR26.05.2010
IE26.05.2010
LT26.05.2010
LV26.05.2010
MT26.05.2010
RO26.05.2010
SE26.05.2010
SI26.05.2010
SK26.05.2010
CY09.06.2010
LU19.06.2010
BE30.06.2010
MC30.06.2010
NO26.08.2010
GR27.08.2010
IS26.09.2010
PT26.10.2010
HU27.11.2010
Former [2012/42]BG26.05.2010
DK26.05.2010
EE26.05.2010
FI26.05.2010
HR26.05.2010
IE26.05.2010
LT26.05.2010
LV26.05.2010
MT26.05.2010
RO26.05.2010
SE26.05.2010
SI26.05.2010
SK26.05.2010
CY09.06.2010
BE30.06.2010
MC30.06.2010
NO26.08.2010
GR27.08.2010
IS26.09.2010
PT26.10.2010
HU27.11.2010
Former [2012/41]BG26.05.2010
DK26.05.2010
EE26.05.2010
FI26.05.2010
HR26.05.2010
IE26.05.2010
LT26.05.2010
LV26.05.2010
MT26.05.2010
RO26.05.2010
SE26.05.2010
SI26.05.2010
SK26.05.2010
CY09.06.2010
BE30.06.2010
MC30.06.2010
NO26.08.2010
GR27.08.2010
IS26.09.2010
PT26.10.2010
Former [2011/27]DK26.05.2010
EE26.05.2010
FI26.05.2010
HR26.05.2010
IE26.05.2010
LT26.05.2010
LV26.05.2010
MT26.05.2010
RO26.05.2010
SE26.05.2010
SI26.05.2010
SK26.05.2010
CY09.06.2010
BE30.06.2010
MC30.06.2010
NO26.08.2010
GR27.08.2010
IS26.09.2010
Former [2011/25]DK26.05.2010
EE26.05.2010
FI26.05.2010
HR26.05.2010
IE26.05.2010
LT26.05.2010
LV26.05.2010
MT26.05.2010
RO26.05.2010
SE26.05.2010
SI26.05.2010
SK26.05.2010
CY09.06.2010
MC30.06.2010
NO26.08.2010
GR27.08.2010
IS26.09.2010
Documents cited:Search[YD]DE19515757  (YTONG AG [DE]) [YD] 1-5,7-10,13-20 * columns 2-3; figure 1 *;
 [Y]WO2007058534  (AIRCRETE TECHNOLOGY B V [NL], et al) [Y] 1-5,7-10,13-20 * pages 1-4; figure - *;
 [A]DE3039005  (WILLY AG MASCHF [CH]) [A] 1 * pages 7-9; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]DE2724826  (YTONG AG) [A] 1 * pages 22-29; figure - *;
 [A]JPH07285118  (NAKAMURA YOSHIKAZU, et al) [A] 1 * abstract *
by applicantWO2007058534