Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2026095

EP2026095 - Method and device for recognising the state of a distance sensor attached to a motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.10.2011
Database last updated on 15.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.10.2011No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 16.11.2011  [2011/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[2009/08]
Inventor(s)01 / Garcia Bordes, Maria-Eugenia
Fraser Place Central - Seoul (1211)
Jung-Gu, Seoul 100-130 / KR
 [2010/49]
Former [2009/08]01 / Garcia Bordes, Maria-Eugenia
Fraser Place Central - Seoul (1211)
100-130 Jung-Gu, Seoul / KR
Application number, filing date08104526.224.06.2008
[2009/08]
Priority number, dateDE2007103721307.08.2007         Original published format: DE102007037213
[2009/08]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2026095
Date:18.02.2009
Language:DE
[2009/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2026095
Date:08.12.2010
Language:DE
[2010/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.09.2008
ClassificationInternational:G01S7/40, G01S13/93
[2009/08]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   SE [2009/43]
Former [2009/08]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Zustandserkennung eines an einem Kraftfahrzeug angeordneten Abstandssensors[2009/08]
English:Method and device for recognising the state of a distance sensor attached to a motor vehicle[2009/08]
French:Procédé et dispositif de reconnaissance de l'état d'un capteur de distance agencé sur un véhicule automobile[2009/08]
Examination procedure18.08.2009Examination requested  [2009/39]
19.08.2009Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
11.09.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.09.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR
24.02.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.09.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.10.2010Fee for grant paid
25.10.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.09.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipSE08.12.2010
[2011/34]
Documents cited:Search[AD]WO0122113  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [AD] 1-11 * page 14, line 4 - page 16, line 7 *;
 [A]DE19963001  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 3 * column 7, lines 32-57 *;
 [A]DE19948252  (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *
by applicantDE19945250