blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2017874

EP2017874 - Travelling wave tube configuration [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.07.2013
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip19.07.2013No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.08.2013  [2013/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Thales Air Systems & Electron Devices GmbH
Söflinger Strasse 100
89077 Ulm / DE
[2012/40]
Former [2009/04]For all designated states
Thales Electron Devices GmbH
Söflinger Strasse 100
89077 Ulm / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Dürr, Wolfgang
Hagener Weg 12
89179 Beimerstetten / DE
 [2009/04]
Representative(s)Baur & Weber Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Rosengasse 13
89073 Ulm / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/10]Baur & Weber Patentanwälte
Rosengasse 13
89073 Ulm / DE
Former [2012/37]Weber, Gerhard
Rosengasse 13
89073 Ulm / DE
Former [2009/04]Weber, Gerhard
Rosengasse 13
89073 Ulm / DE
Application number, filing date08104696.310.07.2008
[2009/04]
Priority number, dateDE2007103382318.07.2007         Original published format: DE102007033823
[2009/04]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2017874
Date:21.01.2009
Language:DE
[2009/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2017874
Date:24.02.2010
[2010/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2017874
Date:12.09.2012
Language:DE
[2012/37]
Type: B8 Corrected title page of specification 
No.:EP2017874
Date:24.10.2012
[2012/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.01.2010
ClassificationIPC:H01J23/42, H01J25/34
[2009/04]
CPC:
H01J23/42 (EP); H01J25/34 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2010/48]
Former [2010/43](deleted) 
Former [2009/04]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Wanderfeldröhrenanordnung[2009/04]
English:Travelling wave tube configuration[2009/04]
French:Configuration de tube à ondes progressives[2009/04]
Examination procedure07.09.2010Examination requested  [2010/41]
05.11.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.05.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.01.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.05.2012Fee for grant paid
21.05.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.11.2010
Opposition(s)13.06.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/34]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees
IT, GB, FR, DE
07.09.2010Request for further processing filed
07.09.2010Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
05.11.2010Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee
07.09.2010Request for further processing filed
07.09.2010Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
05.11.2010Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
01.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
31.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.201003   M06   Fee paid on   31.01.2011
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP1675150  (E2V TECH UK LTD [GB]) [X] 1-2,4-5,9 * paragraph [0020]; figure 3 * [I] 3,6-8;
 [A]EP1017124  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 6 * abstract *
by applicantEP1675150
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.