EP2023229 - Operating unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.02.2018 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.03.2018 [2018/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2015/13] |
Former [2009/07] | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Götz, Bernhard Siedlerstrasse 42 75059, Zaisenhausen / DE | 02 /
Kesel, Dirk Fliederstr. 4 75015, Bretten / DE | [2009/07] | Application number, filing date | 08104771.4 | 16.07.2008 | [2009/07] | Priority number, date | DE20071035892 | 31.07.2007 Original published format: DE102007035892 | [2009/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2023229 | Date: | 11.02.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G05G9/04, G06F3/033 | [2009/07] | CPC: |
G05G9/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/07] | Title | German: | Bedieneinheit | [2009/07] | English: | Operating unit | [2009/07] | French: | Unité de commande | [2009/07] | Examination procedure | 11.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/38] | 09.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/10] | 11.10.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/10] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.09.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE4405962 (LOEWE OPTA GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4,7-12 * column 3 - column 6; figure - *; | [X]US2006290672 (LIU SEN-HSIANG [TW], et al) [X] 1-4,7-12 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0024]; figures 2A-2E *; | [X]EP1705553 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-6,9-12 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0020]; figure - *; | [X]DE102004048915 (ZIPPY TECH CORP [TW]) [X] 1-12 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0025]; figure - *; | [X]US2005264520 (WANG WEI-CHUAN [TW]) [X] 1-4,7-12 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0029]; figure - *; | [X]EP1501004 (ALPS ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,9,11,12 * abstract *; | [X]FR2851520 (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]) [X] 1,9 * abstract *; | [X]US3388609 (ANTON MILLER JAMES) [X] 1,9 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0855668 |