blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2052702

EP2052702 - Body for spreading parts of the body and holding eliminations [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.05.2012
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip11.05.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.06.2012  [2012/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Schlote, Manfred F.
Freiligrathstrasse 19
40479 Düsseldorf / DE
[2009/18]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2009/18]
Representative(s)Herzog, Martin, et al
Herzog Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Immermannstraße 40
40210 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/07]Herzog, Martin, et al
Herzog Fiesser & Partner Immermannstraße 59
40210 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2009/18]Herzog, Martin
KNH Patentanwälte Kahlhöfer Neumann Herzog Fiesser Postfach 10 33 63
40024 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date08105629.322.10.2008
[2009/18]
Priority number, dateDE2007105075022.10.2007         Original published format: DE102007050750
[2009/18]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2052702
Date:29.04.2009
Language:DE
[2009/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.03.2009
ClassificationIPC:A61F13/00
[2009/18]
CPC:
A61F13/2051 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/18]
TitleGerman:Körper zum Spreizen von Körperabschnitten und Aufnehmen von Ausscheidungen[2009/18]
English:Body for spreading parts of the body and holding eliminations[2009/18]
French:Corps destinés à l'écartement de sections corporelles et à la réception de fuites corporelles[2009/18]
Examination procedure14.10.2009Examination requested  [2009/48]
09.11.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.05.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.09.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.06.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.07.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.12.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/24]
19.01.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2012/24]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.11.2009
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
29.06.2011Request for further processing filed
29.06.2011Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
19.04.2011Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.201104   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9806365  (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [X] 1-10 * page 4, line 8 - line 18 * * page 5, line 13 - line 16 * * figures 1-10 *;
 [X]US3683915  (VOSS JOSEPH A) [X] 1,2,6-8,10 * column 2, line 48 - line 50 * * column 3, line 14 - line 16 * * column 8, line 19 - line 23 *;
 [X]FR1488600  (VOELKEL) [X] 1-5,8-10 * page 2, column 1, line 36 - line 42 * * page 2, column 2, line 12 - line 14 *;
 [X]US2004167479  (WARREN RAPHAEL [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0049] , [0061] , [0076] * * figure 2 *;
 [Y]DE19711277  (FRITZ CHRISTOPH [DE]) [Y] 1-10 * claims 1,2,4,8 *;
 [Y]US4182335  (MATRULLO C JAMES [US]) [Y] 1-10 * column 4, line 37 - line 47 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.