blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1953323

EP1953323 - Actuation assembly for moving doors or windows [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.06.2011
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip21.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 23.11.2011  [2011/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TOPP S.p.A.
Via Galvani, 59
36066 Sandrigo (Vicenza) / IT
[2008/32]
Inventor(s)01 / Cavalcante, Toni
Via XXV Aprile, 3
36031 DUEVILLE (VI) / IT
 [2008/32]
Representative(s)Modiano, Micaela Nadia
Modiano & Partners
Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2008/32]Modiano, Micaela Nadia
Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli 16
20123 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date08150028.203.01.2008
[2008/32]
Priority number, dateIT2007PD0002831.01.2007         Original published format: IT PD20070028
[2008/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1953323
Date:06.08.2008
Language:EN
[2008/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1953323
Date:18.08.2010
Language:EN
[2010/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.05.2008
ClassificationIPC:E05F15/12, E06B9/42
[2008/32]
CPC:
E05F15/619 (EP); E06B9/42 (EP); E05Y2201/10 (EP);
E05Y2201/656 (EP); E05Y2201/724 (EP); E05Y2900/132 (EP);
E05Y2900/148 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2009/16]
Former [2008/32]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Betätigungsanordnung zum Bewegen von Türen und Fenstern[2008/32]
English:Actuation assembly for moving doors or windows[2008/32]
French:Ensemble d'actionnement pour déplacer des portes ou des fenêtres[2008/32]
Examination procedure02.01.2009Examination requested  [2009/09]
07.02.2009Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
13.03.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
15.02.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.06.2010Fee for grant paid
16.06.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.05.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES29.11.2010
FR31.01.2011
[2011/47]
Former [2011/34]ES29.11.2010
Documents cited:Search[A]EP1081324  (GEZE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE20217840U  (WINKHAUS FA AUGUST [DE]) [A] 1-10 * figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0534413  (WINKHAUS FA AUGUST [DE]) [A] 1-10 * figure - *;
 [A]EP0520934  (RASMUSSEN KANN IND AS [DK]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *;
 [A]US2789263  (COHN JOSEPH J) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.