Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1915943

EP1915943 - Central venous catheter with heat exchange properties [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  21.09.2012
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.07.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Zoll Circulation, Inc.
650 Almanor Avenue
Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US
[2009/41]
Former [2008/18]For all designated states
Alsius Corporation
Suite 150, 15770 Laguna Canyon Road Irvine
California 92618 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Evans, Scott M.
1252 County Hills Drive
Santa Ana, CA 92705 / US
02 / Luo, Xia
5869 W. 74th
Los Angeles, CA 90045 / US
03 / Pecor, Robert
9 Woodcrest Lane
Aliso Viejo, CA 92656 / US
04 / Walker, Blair
24742 San Doval Lane
Mission Viejo, CA 92691 / US
05 / Shimada, Lynn M.
7906 E. Deerfield Lane
Orange, CA 92869 / US
06 / Worthen, William J.
37 Oakbrook
Coto de Caza, CA 92679 / US
 [2008/18]
Representative(s)Potter Clarkson
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/49]Catesby, Olivia Joanne , et al
Tomkins & Co 5 Dartmouth Road
Dublin 6 / IE
Former [2008/18]Catesby, Olivia Joanne , et al
Tomkins & Co 5 Dartmouth Road
IRL-Dublin 6 / IE
Application number, filing date08151320.216.08.2000
[2008/18]
Priority number, dateUS1999037652418.08.1999         Original published format: US 376524
[2008/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1915943
Date:30.04.2008
Language:EN
[2008/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1915943
Date:24.10.2012
Language:EN
[2012/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.03.2008
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/00, A61M25/00, A61F7/12
[2008/18]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2008/18]
TitleGerman:Zentralvenöser Katheter mit Wärmetauscheigenschaften[2008/18]
English:Central venous catheter with heat exchange properties[2008/18]
French:Cathéter veineux central doté de propriétés d'échange de chaleur[2008/18]
Examination procedure12.02.2008Examination requested  [2008/18]
26.09.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.06.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.12.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.05.2012Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.06.2012
30.05.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.06.2012Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
14.09.2012Fee for grant paid
14.09.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP00968972.0  / EP1204368
Divisional application(s)EP10172563.8  / EP2255725
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20000968972) is  28.08.2006
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  23.07.2013  26.07.2013  ADMISSIBLE
/
Opponent's representative
Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB
Widenmayerstrasse 47
80538 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2013/35]
Opponent(s)01  23.07.2013   
/
Opponent's representative
Meissner, Bolte & Partner
Anwaltssozietät GbR
Widenmayerstrasse 47-50
80538 München / DE
11.09.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
19.03.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
17.09.2015Date of oral proceedings
05.11.2015Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
05.11.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition11.01.2016Appeal received No.  T0070/16
15.03.2016Statement of grounds filed
15.01.2016Appeal received No.  T0070/16
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
12.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
12.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
12.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
12.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
12.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
11.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
05.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 11
02.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 12
26.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 13
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY24.10.2012
MC24.10.2012
GR25.01.2013
LU16.08.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2014/20]CY24.10.2012
MC24.10.2012
GR25.01.2013
Former [2013/24]CY24.10.2012
GR25.01.2013
Former [2013/23]CY24.10.2012
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO9725011  (THERMOCORPS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-4,8,9 * page 10, line 10 - page 12, line 18; figures 1,2,6 * [Y] 5-7;
 [A]US5788647  (EGGERS PHILIP E [US]) [A] 1 * column 18, line 31 - column 19, line 25; figures 1,6 * * claims 1-3 *;
 [Y]US5509897  (TWARDOWSKI ZBYLUT J [US], et al) [Y] 5-7 * column 8, line 53 - column 9, line 14; figures 7,8 *;
 [X]US5733319  (NEILSON BRUCE H [US], et al) [X] 10,11 * column 3, line 26 - column 4, line 6; figure 2 *;
 [X]WO9304727  (AMERICAN MED SYST [US]) [X] 10,11 * abstract *
by applicantUS6338727
 US6146411
 US6019783
 US4578063
 US5693032
 US5192274
 US3677250
 US3995623