Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1947590

EP1947590 - Apparatus and method of input and finger print recognition on a handheld electronic device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.07.2017
Database last updated on 15.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 13.11.2019  [2019/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BlackBerry Limited
2200 University Avenue East
Waterloo, ON N2K 0A7 / CA
[2013/48]
Former [2013/36]For all designated states
BlackBerry Limited
295 Phillip Street
Waterloo ON N2L 3W8 / CA
Former [2008/30]For all designated states
Research In Motion Limited
295 Phillip Street
Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / Fyke, Steven H.
617 Fairview Road
Fort Erie, Ontario L2A 4S8 / CA
 [2008/30]
Representative(s)Fennell, Gareth Charles
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/35]Fennell, Gareth Charles
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Former [2012/16]Fennell, Gareth Charles
Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Former [2009/39]Patel, Binesh , et al
Barker Brettell LLP 10-12 Priests Bridge London
SW15 5JE / GB
Former [2008/30]Fennell, Gareth Charles
Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date08152699.821.05.2004
[2008/30]
Priority number, dateGB2003001179421.05.2003         Original published format: GB 0311794
[2008/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1947590
Date:23.07.2008
Language:EN
[2008/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1947590
Date:31.08.2016
Language:EN
[2016/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.06.2008
ClassificationInternational:G06K9/00, G06F3/033, G06F15/02
[2008/30]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2016/35]
Former [2008/30]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesAL22.12.2008
HR22.12.2008
LT22.12.2008
LV22.12.2008
MK22.12.2008
TitleGerman:Gerät und Verfahren zur Eingabe und Fingerabdruckerkennung auf einer tragbaren elektronischen Vorrichtung[2008/30]
English:Apparatus and method of input and finger print recognition on a handheld electronic device[2008/30]
French:Appareil et procédé d'entrée et reconnaissance d'empreintes digitales sur une dispositif électronique portable[2008/30]
Examination procedure14.04.2008Examination requested  [2008/30]
23.01.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.04.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.09.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.09.2010Date of oral proceedings
18.10.2010Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
19.10.2010Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
24.03.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.07.2016Fee for grant paid
22.07.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.07.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Appeal following examination23.12.2010Appeal received No.  T0649/11
28.02.2011Statement of grounds filed
08.02.2016Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP04252995.8  / EP1480157
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040252995) is  07.02.2007
Opposition(s)01.06.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.04.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
14.04.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
14.04.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
12.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
22.04.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
11.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
29.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
10.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 10
27.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 11
27.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 12
27.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 13
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU21.05.2004
AT31.08.2016
BE31.08.2016
CY31.08.2016
CZ31.08.2016
DK31.08.2016
EE31.08.2016
ES31.08.2016
FI31.08.2016
IT31.08.2016
MC31.08.2016
NL31.08.2016
PL31.08.2016
RO31.08.2016
SE31.08.2016
SI31.08.2016
SK31.08.2016
BG30.11.2016
GR01.12.2016
PT02.01.2017
IE21.05.2017
LU21.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
[2019/46]
Former [2019/31]HU21.05.2004
AT31.08.2016
BE31.08.2016
CZ31.08.2016
DK31.08.2016
EE31.08.2016
ES31.08.2016
FI31.08.2016
IT31.08.2016
MC31.08.2016
NL31.08.2016
PL31.08.2016
RO31.08.2016
SE31.08.2016
SI31.08.2016
SK31.08.2016
BG30.11.2016
GR01.12.2016
PT02.01.2017
IE21.05.2017
LU21.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
Former [2018/23]AT31.08.2016
BE31.08.2016
CZ31.08.2016
DK31.08.2016
EE31.08.2016
ES31.08.2016
FI31.08.2016
IT31.08.2016
MC31.08.2016
NL31.08.2016
PL31.08.2016
RO31.08.2016
SE31.08.2016
SI31.08.2016
SK31.08.2016
BG30.11.2016
GR01.12.2016
PT02.01.2017
IE21.05.2017
LU21.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
Former [2018/17]AT31.08.2016
BE31.08.2016
CZ31.08.2016
DK31.08.2016
EE31.08.2016
ES31.08.2016
FI31.08.2016
IT31.08.2016
MC31.08.2016
NL31.08.2016
PL31.08.2016
RO31.08.2016
SE31.08.2016
SI31.08.2016
SK31.08.2016
BG30.11.2016
GR01.12.2016
PT02.01.2017
LU21.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
Former [2018/13]AT31.08.2016
BE31.08.2016
CZ31.08.2016
DK31.08.2016
EE31.08.2016
ES31.08.2016
FI31.08.2016
IT31.08.2016
MC31.08.2016
NL31.08.2016
PL31.08.2016
RO31.08.2016
SE31.08.2016
SI31.08.2016
SK31.08.2016
BG30.11.2016
GR01.12.2016
PT02.01.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
LU31.05.2017
Former [2018/06]AT31.08.2016
BE31.08.2016
CZ31.08.2016
DK31.08.2016
EE31.08.2016
ES31.08.2016
FI31.08.2016
IT31.08.2016
MC31.08.2016
NL31.08.2016
PL31.08.2016
RO31.08.2016
SE31.08.2016
SI31.08.2016
SK31.08.2016
BG30.11.2016
GR01.12.2016
PT02.01.2017
LU31.05.2017
Former [2017/37]AT31.08.2016
BE31.08.2016
CZ31.08.2016
DK31.08.2016
EE31.08.2016
ES31.08.2016
FI31.08.2016
IT31.08.2016
NL31.08.2016
PL31.08.2016
RO31.08.2016
SE31.08.2016
SI31.08.2016
SK31.08.2016
BG30.11.2016
GR01.12.2016
PT02.01.2017
LU31.05.2017
Former [2017/36]AT31.08.2016
BE31.08.2016
CZ31.08.2016
DK31.08.2016
EE31.08.2016
ES31.08.2016
FI31.08.2016
IT31.08.2016
NL31.08.2016
PL31.08.2016
RO31.08.2016
SE31.08.2016
SK31.08.2016
BG30.11.2016
GR01.12.2016
PT02.01.2017
LU31.05.2017
Former [2017/32]AT31.08.2016
BE31.08.2016
CZ31.08.2016
DK31.08.2016
EE31.08.2016
ES31.08.2016
FI31.08.2016
IT31.08.2016
NL31.08.2016
PL31.08.2016
RO31.08.2016
SE31.08.2016
SK31.08.2016
BG30.11.2016
GR01.12.2016
PT02.01.2017
Former [2017/13]AT31.08.2016
ES31.08.2016
FI31.08.2016
NL31.08.2016
SE31.08.2016
GR01.12.2016
Former [2017/12]AT31.08.2016
ES31.08.2016
FI31.08.2016
SE31.08.2016
GR01.12.2016
Former [2017/10]FI31.08.2016
SE31.08.2016
Documents cited:Search[X]WO0159558  (NITGEN CO., LTD; LEE, DONG-WON; KOH, EUNG-LYEOL; JUNG, SOON-WON; KIM,) [X] 1-8 * abstract * * page 7, line 1 - line 16 * * page 9, line 1 - line 14 * * page 13, line 24 - page 14, line 6 * * page 19, line 14 - page 20, line 5 * * page 21, line 11 - page 22, line 8 * * figures 1-9 *;
 [A]US6219793  (LI YANG ET AL) [A] 1-8 * column 13, line 19 - line 40 * * figure 4 *;
 [A]EP1257111  (SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]US6401551  (KAWAHARA YUKITO ET AL) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]US6360004  (AKIZUKI SATORU) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]JP2001155137  ;
 [A]EP1043698  (SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]US6327376  (HARKIN GERARD F) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2002180585  (KIM JEE-HOON ET AL) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2002163601  (MIN KYOUNG IL ET AL) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010210), vol. 2000, no. 23, & JP2001155137 A 20010608 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-8 * abstract *