Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1947590 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1947590



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 389
05.07.2017 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
31.08.2016 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
04.08.2016 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
22.07.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
22.07.2016 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
22.07.2016 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
22.07.2016 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
24.03.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
24.03.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
24.03.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
24.03.2016 Text intended for grant Search / examination 28
07.03.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
01.03.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
19.02.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
19.02.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Search / examination 1
16.02.2016 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 11
16.02.2016 Decision of the Board of Appeal Search / examination 11
12.10.2015 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
12.10.2015 F3042 Dispatch of attendance note about a phone conversation Appeal 1
07.10.2015 F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
07.10.2015 F3039 Attendance note about a phone conversation and continuation sheet Appeal 2
06.10.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
06.10.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
06.10.2015 Claims Appeal 2
06.10.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
06.10.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Appeal 1
21.09.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
21.09.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
21.09.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
21.09.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
21.09.2015 Claims Appeal 2
21.09.2015 Claims Appeal 2
21.09.2015 Claims Appeal 2
21.09.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
21.09.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
12.08.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
11.08.2015 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 5
03.08.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
22.07.2015 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
17.07.2015 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
10.06.2015 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
21.02.2014 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
24.10.2013 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
17.10.2013 Request for change of address - applicant Search / examination 1
06.08.2013 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 1
19.07.2013 Request for change of name - applicant Appeal 4
18.04.2012 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
17.04.2012 Request for correction Search / examination 1
19.03.2012 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
01.02.2012 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
17.11.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
17.11.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
17.11.2011 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 1
19.04.2011 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
28.03.2011 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
14.03.2011 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
02.03.2011 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
28.02.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
28.02.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
28.02.2011 Claims Appeal 2
28.02.2011 Claims Appeal 2
28.02.2011 Claims Appeal 2
28.02.2011 Claims Appeal 2
28.02.2011 Claims Appeal 2
28.02.2011 Claims Appeal 2
28.02.2011 Claims Appeal 2
28.02.2011 Claims Appeal 2
28.02.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
28.02.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
28.02.2011 Statement of grounds Appeal 17
28.02.2011 Statement of grounds Appeal 17
15.02.2011 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
23.12.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
23.12.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
23.12.2010 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
26.10.2010 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
19.10.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
19.10.2010 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
19.10.2010 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
19.10.2010 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 9
19.10.2010 Means of redress Search / examination 2
18.10.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
18.10.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
18.10.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
18.10.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
28.09.2010 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
27.09.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.09.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
27.09.2010 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 1
23.09.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
23.09.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
23.09.2010 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
23.09.2010 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
23.09.2010 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
23.09.2010 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
30.08.2010 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
27.08.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.08.2010 Claims Search / examination 2
27.08.2010 Claims Search / examination 2
27.08.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
27.08.2010 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 11
10.03.2010 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
02.03.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
02.03.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 3
25.02.2010 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
07.09.2009 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
04.09.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
04.09.2009 Claims Search / examination 1
04.09.2009 Claims Search / examination 2
04.09.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
04.09.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 7
27.08.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.08.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
27.08.2009 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
20.08.2009 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
12.08.2009 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
07.08.2009 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
05.08.2009 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
03.08.2009 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
03.08.2009 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
22.04.2009 Annex to a communication Search / examination 6
22.04.2009 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
22.04.2009 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
05.03.2009 Document concerning representation Search / examination 4
27.01.2009 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 5
23.01.2009 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 5
22.12.2008 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
22.12.2008 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
19.12.2008 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
28.07.2008 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
25.06.2008 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
04.06.2008 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
03.06.2008 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
03.06.2008 European search opinion Search / examination 2
03.06.2008 European search report Search / examination 3
16.04.2008 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
14.04.2008 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
14.04.2008 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
14.04.2008 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
13.03.2008 Abstract Search / examination 1
13.03.2008 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
13.03.2008 Claims Search / examination 2
13.03.2008 Description Search / examination 21
13.03.2008 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
13.03.2008 Drawings Search / examination 5
13.03.2008 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
30.06.2004 Priority document Search / examination 26