Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2027853

EP2027853 - Kinase inhibitors for treating cancers [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.10.2013
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2013Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.11.2013  [2013/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Agennix USA Inc.
101 College Road East
Princeton, NJ 08540 / US
[2010/15]
Former [2009/09]For all designated states
GPC Biotech Inc.
610 Lincoln Street
Waltham, MA 02451 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Caligiuri, Maureen, G
159 Pine Ridge Road
Reading, MA 01867 / US
02 / Kley, Nikolai, A
30 Audubon Road
Wellesley, MA 02481 / US
03 / Murthi, Krishna, K
23 Blueberry Hill Road
Andover, MA 01810 / US
 [2009/09]
Representative(s)Dörries, Hans Ulrich , et al
df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Theatinerstrasse 16
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/09]Dörries, Hans Ulrich , et al
df-mp Fünf Höfe Theatinerstrasse 16
80333 München / DE
Application number, filing date08153670.817.06.2005
[2009/09]
Priority number, dateUS20040580868P18.06.2004         Original published format: US 580868 P
[2009/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2027853
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/09]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2027853
Date:05.01.2011
[2011/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.12.2010
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/00, A61K31/416, A61P35/00, A61P43/00, A61P25/28, A61P25/16, A61P9/10, A61P35/04
[2009/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/09]
TitleGerman:Kinase-Hemmer zur Behandlung von Krebs[2009/09]
English:Kinase inhibitors for treating cancers[2009/09]
French:Inhibiteurs de kinase pour le traitement des cancers[2009/09]
Examination procedure04.07.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.07.2011Examination requested  [2011/32]
07.03.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.06.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.02.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
03.06.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2013/46]
25.06.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2013/46]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP05762859.6  / EP1763345
Divisional application(s)EP10184652.5  / EP2298292
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050762859) is  20.12.2007
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
16.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
29.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
22.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
27.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201309   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]WO03033499  (GPC BIOTECH INC [US], et al) [X] 1-43,47,48,50-62 * pages 8-10; examples E, F, I, L, M, O, P * * page 25, paragraph 3 * * pages 51-53; table 3 * * page 49, paragraph 1 *;
 [IP]WO2004092139  (GPC BIOTECH INC [US], et al) [IP] 1-43,47,48,50-62 * Assay 2; pages 92-93 * * page 116; table A * * page 51, paragraph 3 *;
 [E]WO2005063765  (GPC BIOTECH INC [US], et al) [E] 1-43,47,48,50-62 * page 82; table 3 * * Assay 2; page 67 * * claims 1,5 * * page 50, paragraph 3 *
by applicantWO03013540
 US2004077663
 WO2004024942
 EP0147926
 US5072011
 US5244919
 US5519155
 US6503943
 WO0164696
 US5440056
 US4942184
 US6380405
 WO03101998
 US6100273
 US5587673
 WO0071752
 WO03099210
 WO9920791
 US6114365
 US6107305
 US2003162797
 US2005090471
 US2004266854
 WO03033499
 US2004266853
 WO2004092139
    BROXTERMAN; GEORGOPAPADAKOU, DRUG RESIST UPDAT., (2004), vol. 7, no. 2, pages 79 - 87,
    HARBOUR ET AL., CELL, (1999), vol. 98, pages 859 - 869,
    CARPENTER, CELL, (1984), vol. 37, pages 357 - 358,
    WAGMAN ET AL., CURR PHARM DES., (2004), vol. 10, no. 10, pages 1105 - 37,
    WOLFEL ET AL., SCIENCE, (1995), vol. 269, pages 1281 - 1284,
    YANG-FENG ET AL., CYTOGENET. CELL GENET., (1985), vol. 40, page 784,
    COUSSENS ET AL., SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 230, pages 1132 - 1139,
    SEMBA ET AL., PROC. NAT. ACAD. SCI., (1985), vol. 82, pages 6497 - 6501,
    DI FIORE ET AL., SCIENCE, (1987), vol. 237, pages 178 - 182,
    AKIYAMA, SCIENCE, (1986), vol. 232, pages 1644 - 1646,
    FUKUSHIGE ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (1986), vol. 134, pages 477 - 483,
    VAN DE VIJVER ET AL., NEW ENG. J. MED., (1988), vol. 319, pages 1239 - 1245,
    SLAMON ET AL., SCIENCE, (1989), vol. 244, pages 707 - 712,
    CORBIN ET AL., BLOOD, (2000), vol. 96, page 470A,
    CORBIN ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2002), vol. 277, pages 32214 - 32219,
    SCHINDLER ET AL., SCIENCE, (2000), vol. 289, pages 1938 - 1942,
    J. PHILLIP BOWEN; MICHAEL CORY, "Computer-Assisted Drug Design", ENCYCLOPEDIA OF PHARMACEUTICAL TECHNOLOGY,
    RAYNAUD ET AL., CANCER CHEMOTHER. PHARMACOL., (1996), vol. 38, pages 155 - 162,
    Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, MACK PUBLISHING COMPANY, page 1445,
    MANNING ET AL., "The Protein Kinase Complement of the Human Genome", SCIENCE, (2002), vol. 298, doi:doi:10.1126/science.1075762, pages 1912 - 34, XP002422776

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1075762
    HONG, SCIENCE, (1998), vol. 282, pages 1914 - 1917,
    HUTTON ET AL., NATURE, (1998), vol. 393, pages 702 - 705,
    POORKAJ ET AL., ANN NEUROL, (1998), vol. 43, pages 815 - 825,
    CLARK, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1998), vol. 95, pages 13103 - 13107,
    SCHWAB ET AL., NEUROBIOL AGING, (2000), vol. 21, no. 4, pages 503 - 10,
    WILLIAMSON ET AL., J. NEUROCHEM., (2002), vol. 22, pages 10 - 20,
    SLACK; BERSE, SOCIETY FOR NEUROSCIENCE ABSTRACTS, (1998), vol. 24, no. 1-2, page 208,
    "Conference/Meeting Information: 28th Annual Meeting of the Society for Neuroscience", SOCIETY FOR NEUROSCIENCE, (1998), pages 7 - 12,
    HAGEMEIJER ET AL., HUIN. GENET., (1982), vol. 61, pages 223 - 227,
    MINOKOSHI, NATURE, (2004), vol. 428, no. 6982, pages 569 - 74,
    HOPKINS ET AL., BIOCHEM SOC TRANS., (2003), vol. 31, no. 1, pages 207 - 12,
    SAMBANDAM; LOPASCHUK, PROG. LIPID RES., (2003), vol. 42, no. 3, pages 238 - 56,
    SHEKAN ET AL., J. NATL. CANCER. INST., (1990), vol. 82, pages 1107 - 12,
    PAZDUR ET AL., CANCER TREAT RES., (1993), vol. 19, page 3 5 1,
    BISSERY ET AL., CANCER RES., (1991), vol. 51, page 4845,
    ANNU. REV. MED., (1997), vol. 48, pages 353 - 374,
    MARKMAN ET AL., YALE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGY AND MEDICINE, (1991), vol. 64, page 583,
    MCGUIRE, ANN. INTERN. MED., (1989), vol. 111, page 273,
    HOLMES ET AL., J. NAT. CANCER INST., (1991), vol. 83, page 1797,
    EINZIG, PROC. AM. SOC. CLIN. ONCOL., vol. 20, page 46,
    FORASTIRE ET AL., SEM. ONCOL., (1990), vol. 20, page 56,
    WOO ET AL., NATURE, (1994), vol. 368, page 750,
    "Studies in Organic Chemistry", D. G. 1. KINGSTON ET AL., New Trends in Natural Products Chemistry, ELVESIER, vol. 26, pages 219 - 235,
    CLIN CANCER RES, (1999), vol. 5, pages 3445 - 3453,
    CYTOKINE, (2002), vol. 17, pages 234 - 242,
    CANCER RES, (1996), vol. 56, pages 1303 - 1308,
    ONCOGENE, (1996), vol. 13, pages 1359 - 1365,
    ONCOGENE, (2000), vol. 19, pages 6550 - 6565,
    BIOESSAYS, (2000), vol. 22, pages 673 - 680,
    ONCOGENE, (2001), vol. 20, pages 4995 - 5004,
    JPN J CLIN ONCOL, (1996), vol. 26, pages 1 - 5,
    CANCER CHEMOTHER PHARMACOL, (2000), vol. 46, pages 329 - 337,
    LEUKEMIA, (1997), vol. 11, pages 253 - 257,
    CANCER RES, (1997), vol. 57, pages 1109 - 1115,
    BREAST CANCER RES TREAT, (1997), vol. 42, pages 73 - 81,
    CANCER RES, (1996), vol. 56, pages 3461 - 3467,
    J CELL BIOL, (1986), vol. 102, pages 1522 - 1531,
    PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2000), vol. 97, pages 8658 - 8663,
    CANCER RES, (2001), vol. 61, pages 6540 - 6547,
    SURGERY, vol. 130, pages 143 - 150,
    ANTICANCER DRUGS, (2000), vol. 11, pages 439 - 443,
    CHEMOTHERAPY, (2000), vol. 46, pages 327 - 334,
    INT J CANCER, (1993), vol. 54, pages 302 - 308,
    INT J CANCER, (2001), vol. 93, pages 179 - 184,
    ANTICANCER DRUGS, (1997), vol. 8, pages 189 - 198,
    BR J CANCER, (2000), vol. 83, pages 83 - 88,
    CANCER RES, (2001), vol. 61, pages 4258 - 4265,
    J LEUKOC BIOL, (1996), vol. 59, pages 280 - 286,
    MECH DEV, (1998), vol. 73, pages 117 - 123,
    CANCER RES, (1997), vol. 57, pages 2388 - 2393,
    PIZZOLATO; SALTZ, THE LANCET, (2003), vol. 361, pages 2235 - 42,
    ULUKAN; SWAAN, DRUG, (2002), vol. 62, pages 2039 - 57,
    REED, CANCER, PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICE OF ONCOLOGY, (1993), pages 390 - 4001,
    EASTMAN, CANCER CELLS, (1990), vol. 2, pages 275 - 2802,
    E. K. ROWINSKY; R. C. DONEHOWER, PHARMACOLOGY AND THERAPEUTICS, (1991), vol. 52, pages 35 - 84,
    MINOTTI, A. M.; BARLOW, S. B.; CABRAL, F., J BIOL CHEM, (1991), vol. 266, pages 3987 - 3994,
    HABER, M. ET AL., J BIOL CHEM., (1995), vol. 270, pages 31269 - 75,
    JAFFREZOU, J. P. ET AL., ONCOLOGY RES., (1995), vol. 7, pages 517 - 27,
    KAVALLARIS, M. ET AL., J CLIN. INVEST., (1997), vol. 100, pages 1282 - 93,
    RANGANATHAN, S. ET AL., BIOCHIN7. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1998), vol. 1395, pages 237 - 245,
    JPN J CANCER RES, vol. 85, pages 290 - 297,
    MOL CELL BIOL, (1999), vol. 19, pages 2242 - 2250,
    BIOCHEM PHARMACOL, (2001), vol. 62, pages 1469 - 1480,
    CANCER RES, (1998), vol. 58, pages 4160 - 4167,
    NATURE REV CANCER, (2002), vol. 2, pages 48 - 5 8,
    KONDRATOV ET AL., "2001 and references therein", CANCER RES, (1993), vol. 53, pages 747 - 754,
    J BIOL CHEM, (1995), vol. 270, pages 31269 - 31275,
    LEUKEMIA, (1994), vol. 8, pages 465 - 475,
    BIOCHEMPHARMACOL, (1997), vol. 53, pages 461 - 470,
    LEONARD ET AL., THE ONCOLOGIST, (2003), vol. 8, pages 411 - 424,
    ANTICANCER RES, (2002), vol. 22, pages 2199 - 2203,
    J CLIN INVEST, (1995), vol. 95, pages 2205 - 2214,
    CANCER LETT, (1999), vol. 146, pages 195 - 199,
    NAT GENET, (2001), vol. 27, pages 23 - 29,
    CELL, (1988), vol. 53, pages 519 - 529,
    PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1991), vol. 88, pages 7289 - 7293,
    PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1992), vol. 89, pages 4564 - 4568,
    J CLIN INVEST, (1997), vol. 99, pages 1947 - 1957,
    "The Camptothecins: Unfolding Their Anticancer Potential", ANNALS OF THE NEW YORK ACADEMY OF SCIENCE, vol. 922,
    ONCOGENE, (2003), vol. 22, pages 7296 - 7304,
    CANCER RES, (1995), vol. 55, pages 1339 - 1346,
    KAPOOR ET AL., ONCOLOGY RESEARCH, (1995), vol. 7, pages 83 - 95,
    ONCOL RES, (1995), vol. 7, pages 83 - 95,
    ANN N Y ACAD SCI, (2000), vol. 922, pages 46 - 55,
    ROSS ET AL., J. NATL. CANCER INST., (1999), vol. 91, pages 429 - 433,
    MIYAKE ET AL., CANCER RES., (1999), vol. 59, pages 8 - 13,
    LITMAN ET AL., J. CELL SCI., (2000), vol. 113, no. 11, pages 2011 - 2021,
    DOYLE ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1998), vol. 95, pages 15665 - 15670,
    HAZLEHURST ET AL., CANCER RES., (1999), vol. 59, pages 1021 - 1028,
    NIELSEN ET AL., BIOCHEM. PHARMACOL., (2000), vol. 60, pages 363 - 370,
    BOONSTRA ET AL., BR J CANCER., (20040518),
    SKEKAN ET AL., J. NATL. CANCER. INST., (1990), vol. 82, pages 1107 - 12,
    SHEKAN ET AL., J NATL CANCER INST, (1990), vol. 82, pages 1107 - 112,
    TORRANCE ET AL., NAT. BIOTECH., (2001), vol. 19, pages 940 - 945,
    J BIOL CHEM, (1997), vol. 272, pages 17118 - 17124,
    VICKERS ET AL., MOL ENDOCRINOLOGY, (1989), vol. 3, no. 1, pages 157 - 164,
    ONCOGENE, (2004), vol. 23, pages 474 - 482,
    CLIN CANCER RES, (2003), vol. 9, pages 2778 - 2785,
    LUM ET AL., DRUG RESIST. CLIN. ONC. HEMAT., (1995), vol. 9, pages 319 - 336,
    SCHINKEL ET AL., EUR. J. CANCER, (1995), vol. 31A, pages 1295 - 1298,
    DEININGER ET AL., BLOOD, (2000), vol. 96, pages 3343 - 3356,
    SAWYERS, N. ENGL. J. MED., (1999), vol. 340, pages 1330 - 1340,
    DRUKER ET AL., N. ENGL. J. MED., (2001), vol. 344, pages 1038 - 1042,
    DRUKER ET AL., N. ENGL. J. MED., (2001), vol. 344, pages 1031 - 1037,
    KANTARJIAN ET AL., N. ENGL. J. MED., (2002), vol. 346, pages 645 - 652,
    SAWYERS ET AL., BLOOD, (2002), vol. 99, pages 3530 - 3539,
    GORRE ET AL., SCIENCE, (2001), vol. 293, pages 876 - 880,
    HOCHHAUS ET AL., LEUKEMIA, (2002), vol. 16, pages 2190 - 2196,
    CORBIN ET AL., BLOOD, (2000), vol. 96, page 470,
    HOCHHAUS ET AL., SCIENCE, (2001), vol. 293, page 2163,
    BRANFORD ET AL., BLOOD, (2002), vol. 99, pages 3472 - 3475,
    HOFMANN ET AL., BLOOD, (2002), vol. 99, pages 1860 - 1862,
    ROCHE-LESTIENNE ET AL., BLOOD, (2002), vol. 100, pages 1014 - 1018,
    SHAH ET AL., CANCER CELL, (2002), vol. 2, page 117,
    VON BUBNOFF ET AL., LANCET, (2002), vol. 359, pages 487 - 491,
    GORRE ET AL., SCIENCE, (2001), vol. 293, page 876,
    Remington 's Pharmaceutical Sciences, MACK PUBLISHING COMPANY,
    Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, MACK PUBLISHING COMPANY,
    J. BIOCHEM, (1995), vol. 117, pages 741 - 749,
    J. CELL SCI., (1995), vol. 108, page 2897,
    CANCEI" RESEAICFI, (1997), vol. 57, page 3375,
    PEREGO ET AL., CANCER RESEARCH, (2001), vol. 61, pages 6034 - 6037,
    R.D. BAIRD; S.B. KAYE, "Drug resistance reversal - are we getting closer?", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF CANCER, (2003), vol. 39, doi:doi:10.1016/S0959-8049(03)00619-1, pages 2450 - 61, XP004470568

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0959-8049(03)00619-1
    P. GIANNOKAKOU ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1997), vol. 272, pages 17118 - 125,
    P. GIANNOKAKOU ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (2000), vol. 97, pages 2904 - 2909,
    KELLAND L R., "An update on satraplatin: the first orally available platinum anticancer drug", EXPERT OPIN INVESTIG DRUGS, (2000), vol. 9, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1517/13543784.9.6.1373, pages 1373 - 1382, XP001097881

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1517/13543784.9.6.1373
    KISHI, LEUK. RES., (1985), vol. 9, pages 381 - 390,
    GORRE ET AL., SCIENCE, (2001), vol. 293, pages 876 - 80,
    VON BUBNOFF ET AL., LANCET, (2002), vol. 359, pages 487 - 91,
 US19970005460