Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2023332

EP2023332 - Display apparatus and control method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  10.05.2019
Database last updated on 21.08.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  01.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.05.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 12.06.2019  [2019/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR
[2012/38]
Former [2009/07]For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Choi, Young-hun
Naru Maeul Hanwa Ggumegreen Apt. No. 623-2203
Bansong-dong
Hwaseong-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
 [2019/24]
Former [2009/07]01 / Choi, Young-hun
Naru Maeul Hanwa Ggumegreen Apt. No. 623-2203 Bansong-dong Hwaseong-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
Representative(s)Appleyard Lees IP LLP
15 Clare Road
Halifax HX1 2HY / GB
[2019/24]
Former [2012/02]Robinson, Ian Michael
Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road
Halifax HX1 2HY / GB
Former [2010/42]Kohler, Janet Wendy
Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road
Halifax HX1 2HY / GB
Former [2009/07]Robinson, Ian Michael
Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road
Halifax, West Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB
Application number, filing date08153680.729.03.2008
[2009/07]
Priority number, dateKR2007007363523.07.2007         Original published format: KR 20070073635
[2009/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2023332
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/07]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2023332
Date:23.09.2009
[2009/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2023332
Date:12.06.2019
Language:EN
[2019/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.08.2009
ClassificationInternational:G09G5/00
[2009/07]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   NL [2019/24]
Former [2010/21]DE,  GB,  NL 
Former [2009/07]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Anzeigevorrichtung und Verfahren zu ihrer Ansteuerung[2009/07]
English:Display apparatus and control method thereof[2009/07]
French:Appareil d'affichage et son procédé de commande[2009/07]
Examination procedure01.03.2010Examination requested  [2010/14]
23.03.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.03.2010Invitation to provide information on prior art
24.03.2010Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
27.04.2010Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
23.07.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.07.2010Reply to the invitation to provide information on prior art
15.09.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.01.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.02.2013Date of oral proceedings
11.03.2013Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
15.03.2013Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
04.12.2018Date of oral proceedings
02.01.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.01.2019Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
26.04.2019Fee for grant paid
26.04.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
26.04.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Appeal following examination01.05.2013Appeal received No.  T0447/13
15.07.2013Statement of grounds filed
28.09.2017Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2017/39]
10.11.2017Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2017/45]
05.02.2018Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.03.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
21.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
20.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
20.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
18.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
24.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
29.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
30.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
23.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
22.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 12
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2004027515  (ITAKURA NAOKI [JP]) [X] 1-4,8-11 * paragraphs [0057] - [0062]; figures 3,4 * [Y] 5-7,12,13;
 [XY]US2006082569  (NOORBAKHSH ALI [US], et al) [X] 1-4,8-11 * paragraphs [0027] - [0031] - [0037] , [0038] , [0045] - [0047]; figures 1,2,5c,5d,5e * [Y] 5-7,12,13;
 [X]US2003214507  (MAWATARI MASAHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1,8 * paragraphs [0062] - [0097]; figures 3-7 *;
 [Y]WO2006059868  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR], et al) [Y] 5-7,12,13 * pages 7-10; figure 4 *;
 [Y]US2004027357  (MENDELSON JONATHAN D [US], et al) [Y] 5-7,12,13 * paragraphs [0023] - [0025] - [0029] , [0037] - [0041] - [0045] , [0046]; figures 1a,1b,3 *;
 [A]US6618773  (CHANG LUKE L [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0035] - [0045]; figures 2-4 *
 [X]  - DISCLOSED ANONYMOUSLY, "Display switch with dedicated extended display identification data information", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, MASON PUBLICATIONS, HAMPSHIRE, GB, (20060801), vol. 508, no. 89, ISSN 0374-4353, page 1092, XP007136552 [X] 1-8 * the whole document *
ExaminationUS2006036882
 US2004150650