Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2026053

EP2026053 - Transport container and temperature measuring device for a transport container [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.03.2011
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 06.11.2013  [2013/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ebro Electronic GmbH & Co. KG
Peringerstrasse 10
85055 Ingolstadt / DE
[2009/08]
Inventor(s)01 / Klün, Wolfgang
Minzenweg 7
85049 Ingolstadt / DE
 [2009/52]
Former [2009/08]01 / Klün, Wolfgang
Minzenweg 7
85049 Ingolstadt / DE
Representative(s)Schlief, Thomas P.
Canzler & Bergmeier
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 84
85055 Ingolstadt / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/08]Schlief, Thomas P.
Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 84
85055 Ingolstadt / DE
Application number, filing date08153812.631.03.2008
[2009/08]
Priority number, dateDE2007103757809.08.2007         Original published format: DE102007037578
[2009/08]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2026053
Date:18.02.2009
Language:DE
[2009/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2026053
Date:12.05.2010
Language:DE
[2010/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.07.2008
ClassificationInternational:G01J5/02, F25D11/00, F25D29/00
[2009/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/08]
TitleGerman:Transportcontainer sowie Temperaturmessvorrichtung für einen Transportcontainer[2009/08]
English:Transport container and temperature measuring device for a transport container[2009/08]
French:Conteneur de transport et dispositif de mesure de la température pour un conteneur de transport[2009/08]
Examination procedure15.04.2009Examination requested  [2009/22]
13.05.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.10.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.11.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.03.2010Fee for grant paid
23.03.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.02.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCZ12.05.2010
DK12.05.2010
EE12.05.2010
FI12.05.2010
HR12.05.2010
HU12.05.2010
IE12.05.2010
IT12.05.2010
LT12.05.2010
LV12.05.2010
MT12.05.2010
NL12.05.2010
PL12.05.2010
PT12.05.2010
RO12.05.2010
SE12.05.2010
SI12.05.2010
SK12.05.2010
TR12.05.2010
CY09.06.2010
BG12.08.2010
NO12.08.2010
GR13.08.2010
ES23.08.2010
IS12.09.2010
[2013/45]
Former [2013/44]CZ12.05.2010
DK12.05.2010
EE12.05.2010
FI12.05.2010
HR12.05.2010
IE12.05.2010
IT12.05.2010
LT12.05.2010
LV12.05.2010
MT12.05.2010
NL12.05.2010
PL12.05.2010
PT12.05.2010
RO12.05.2010
SE12.05.2010
SI12.05.2010
SK12.05.2010
TR12.05.2010
CY09.06.2010
BG12.08.2010
NO12.08.2010
GR13.08.2010
ES23.08.2010
IS12.09.2010
Former [2013/42]CZ12.05.2010
DK12.05.2010
EE12.05.2010
FI12.05.2010
HR12.05.2010
IE12.05.2010
IT12.05.2010
LT12.05.2010
LV12.05.2010
MT12.05.2010
NL12.05.2010
PL12.05.2010
PT12.05.2010
RO12.05.2010
SE12.05.2010
SI12.05.2010
SK12.05.2010
CY09.06.2010
BG12.08.2010
NO12.08.2010
GR13.08.2010
ES23.08.2010
IS12.09.2010
Former [2013/32]CZ12.05.2010
DK12.05.2010
EE12.05.2010
FI12.05.2010
HR12.05.2010
IE12.05.2010
IT12.05.2010
LT12.05.2010
LV12.05.2010
MT12.05.2010
NL12.05.2010
PL12.05.2010
PT12.05.2010
RO12.05.2010
SE12.05.2010
SI12.05.2010
SK12.05.2010
CY09.06.2010
NO12.08.2010
GR13.08.2010
ES23.08.2010
IS12.09.2010
Former [2012/05]CZ12.05.2010
DK12.05.2010
EE12.05.2010
FI12.05.2010
HR12.05.2010
IE12.05.2010
IT12.05.2010
LT12.05.2010
LV12.05.2010
MT12.05.2010
NL12.05.2010
PL12.05.2010
RO12.05.2010
SE12.05.2010
SI12.05.2010
SK12.05.2010
CY09.06.2010
NO12.08.2010
GR13.08.2010
ES23.08.2010
IS12.09.2010
Former [2011/25]CZ12.05.2010
DK12.05.2010
EE12.05.2010
FI12.05.2010
HR12.05.2010
IE12.05.2010
IT12.05.2010
LT12.05.2010
LV12.05.2010
NL12.05.2010
PL12.05.2010
RO12.05.2010
SE12.05.2010
SI12.05.2010
SK12.05.2010
CY09.06.2010
NO12.08.2010
GR13.08.2010
ES23.08.2010
IS12.09.2010
Former [2010/45]NL12.05.2010
Documents cited:Search[X]US4014178  (KELLS JOHN D) [X] 1-35 * column 2, lines 24-29; figure 2 *;
 [X]US2005058179  (PHIPPS JACK M [US]) [X] 1-35 * paragraph [0039]; figure 1 *;
 [X]US5996357  (PARK HYUN-KEUN [KR]) [X] 1-35 * column 2, lines 1-51; figure 2 *
by applicantUS4014178
 US2005058179
 US5996357