Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1935237

EP1935237 - Apparatus and method for separating and mixing feed for live-stock [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.01.2010
Database last updated on 22.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.01.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.02.2010  [2010/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Trioliet Mullos B.V.
Hinmanweg 19
7575 BE Oldenzaal / NL
[2008/26]
Inventor(s)01 / Liet, Cornelis Hendricus
Denekamperdijk 38
7581 PJ, Losser / NL
02 / Van der Plas, Nicolaas
Sportlaan 50
7576WX, Oldenzaal / NL
 [2008/26]
Representative(s)Zonneveld, Hendrik Jan , et al
De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180
1062 XK Amsterdam / NL
[2008/26]
Application number, filing date08154431.425.04.2006
[2008/26]
Priority number, dateNL2005102907519.05.2005         Original published format: NL 1029075
[2008/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1935237
Date:25.06.2008
Language:EN
[2008/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1935237
Date:25.02.2009
[2009/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:A01K5/00, A01F29/00
[2009/09]
Former International [2008/26]A01K5/00
Designated contracting states[2009/44]
Former [2008/26]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Anlage und Verfahren zum Trennen und Mischen von Viehfutter[2008/27]
English:Apparatus and method for separating and mixing feed for live-stock[2008/26]
French:Appareil et procédé pour séparer et mélanger des produits pour l'alimentation du bétail[2008/27]
Former [2008/26]Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Trennen und Mischen von lebendem Bestand
Former [2008/26]Appareil et procédé pour séparer et mélanger de l'aliment pour bétail
Examination procedure26.08.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/07]
01.10.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2010/07]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP06113032.4  / EP1723846
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.04.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200904   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]US3830438  (GARRISON H, et al) [Y] 1,2,5,17-21 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US4258886  (LUNDAHL EZRA C, et al) [Y] 1,2,5,17-21 * abstract *;
 [A]US5333799  (POSTHUMUS ALBERT [US]) [A] 1,5,12,14,19 * the whole document *;
 [A]NL1022678C  (TRIOLIET MULLOS [NL]) [A] 1,2,19,20 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE19938090  (ZIELKE BERND [DE])
by applicantNL1026841C
 NL1028732C