Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2204700 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2204700



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 906
13.04.2016 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
10.06.2015 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
15.05.2015 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
15.04.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
15.04.2015 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
15.04.2015 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
15.04.2015 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
05.12.2014 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
05.12.2014 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
05.12.2014 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
05.12.2014 Text intended for grant Search / examination 52
27.11.2014 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
30.09.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
30.09.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 7
30.09.2014 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 31
30.09.2014 Claims Search / examination 4
30.09.2014 Description Search / examination 29
30.09.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
30.09.2014 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 9
21.05.2014 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
21.05.2014 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
07.04.2014 Information about publication, reminder payment of designation fee, response to extended European search report, if applicable Search / examination 2
04.03.2014 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
04.03.2014 European search report Search / examination 2
20.02.2014 Search started Search / examination 1
05.02.2014 Correction to A-publication Search / examination 1
18.12.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
18.12.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
18.12.2013 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
03.12.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
26.11.2013 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 15
19.08.2013 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 52
07.08.2013 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 1
07.08.2013 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 15
07.08.2013 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Appeal 51
05.07.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
05.07.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
05.07.2013 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
05.07.2013 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 13
21.05.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
15.05.2013 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 10
14.05.2013 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
30.11.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
30.11.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
30.11.2012 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
30.11.2012 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
14.09.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
14.09.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
14.09.2012 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
10.02.2012 F3203 Composition of the Board (J) Appeal 1
18.01.2012 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
07.11.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
07.11.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
07.11.2011 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 21
07.11.2011 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 1
07.09.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
07.09.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
07.09.2011 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
11.07.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
07.07.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
07.07.2011 Decision Search / examination 15
16.05.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
16.05.2011 General enquiry Search / examination 1
16.05.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
21.12.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
21.12.2010 General enquiry Search / examination 1
21.12.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
30.07.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
30.07.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
30.07.2010 Request for a decision Search / examination 3
09.06.2010 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
31.05.2010 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 3
16.07.2009 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
14.04.2009 Matter currently under investigation Search / examination 1
13.03.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.03.2009 General enquiry Search / examination 1
13.03.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
02.09.2008 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
22.08.2008 Annex Search / examination 55
22.08.2008 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
22.08.2008 Drawings Search / examination 11
22.08.2008 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 31
22.08.2008 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
22.08.2008 Translation of priority document Search / examination 53
20.08.2008 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
15.08.2008 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
15.08.2008 Annex Search / examination 55
15.08.2008 Drawings Search / examination 11
15.08.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
15.08.2008 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
15.08.2008 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 31
15.08.2008 Translation of priority document Search / examination 53
12.08.2008 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
12.08.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
12.08.2008 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
12.08.2008 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
12.08.2008 Priority document Search / examination 64
02.07.2008 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
02.07.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
02.07.2008 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
01.07.2008 Note on telephone consultation Search / examination 1
30.06.2008 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
30.06.2008 Drawings Search / examination 11
30.06.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
30.06.2008 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
27.06.2008 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
23.06.2008 Invitation to file missing parts of the description/drawings Search / examination 2
20.06.2008 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 27
18.04.2008 Abstract Search / examination 1
18.04.2008 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
18.04.2008 Claims Search / examination 5
18.04.2008 Description Search / examination 38
18.04.2008 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
18.04.2008 Drawings Search / examination 10
18.04.2008 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4