blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1988339

EP1988339 - Self-locking safety hinge, particularly for opening and closing a hatch [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.07.2010
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip30.07.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 01.09.2010  [2010/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
G.Z. International S.A.S. di Garbin Orlando & C.
Via A. Forti, 25/M
44027 Migliarino (FE) / IT
[2008/45]
Inventor(s)01 / Garbin, Orlando
Via del Progresso, 4
44027, Migliarino FE / IT
 [2008/45]
Representative(s)Modiano, Micaela Nadia
Modiano & Partners
Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2008/45]Modiano, Micaela Nadia
Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli 16
20123 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date08155101.224.04.2008
[2008/45]
Priority number, dateIT2007BO0031330.04.2007         Original published format: IT BO20070313
[2008/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1988339
Date:05.11.2008
Language:EN
[2008/45]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1988339
Date:05.08.2009
[2009/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.07.2009
ClassificationIPC:F24C15/12, E05D1/00
[2008/45]
CPC:
E05D3/022 (EP); F24C15/12 (EP); E05Y2201/416 (EP);
E05Y2900/308 (EP)
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2010/15]
Former [2008/45]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Selbst-sperrendes Sicherheitsscharnier, insbesondere zum Öffnen und Schliessen einer Klappe[2008/45]
English:Self-locking safety hinge, particularly for opening and closing a hatch[2008/45]
French:Charnière de sécurité à verrouillage automatique, en particulier pour ouvrir et fermer une trappe[2008/45]
Examination procedure06.02.2010Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/35]
30.03.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2010/35]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201003   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP1548217  (G Z INTERNAT DI GARBIN O E C S [IT]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0019] - [0022]; figure - *;
 [A]BE900358  (SUTER N V SA) [A] 1 * page 5, paragraph 3 - page 6, paragraph 1; figure - *;
 [A]US4119240  (DUMAS SARAH J ET AL) [A] * figures 1,2 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.