Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1961737

EP1961737 - Indan-1,3-carbodinitrile dervatives [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  26.11.2010
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.11.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 29.12.2010  [2010/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pfizer Products Inc.
Eastern Point Road
Groton, CT 06340 / US
[2008/35]
Inventor(s)01 / Guzman, Mark, Christopher
1215 Monterey Avenue
Berkeley, CA 94707 / US
 [2008/35]
Representative(s)Hodge, Emma Jane
Pfizer
European Patent Department
23-25, avenue du Docteur Lannelongue
75668 Paris Cedex 14 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Hodge, Emma Jane
Pfizer Limited European Patent Department Ramsgate Road
Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB
Application number, filing date08155815.707.11.2003
[2008/35]
Priority number, dateUS20020427981P20.11.2002         Original published format: US 427981 P
[2008/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1961737
Date:27.08.2008
Language:EN
[2008/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.07.2008
ClassificationInternational:C07C255/47, C07C51/08, C07C61/29
[2008/35]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/35]
TitleGerman:Indan-1,3-Carbodinitril Derivate[2008/35]
English:Indan-1,3-carbodinitrile dervatives[2008/35]
French:Indan-1,3-carbodinitrile dérivés[2008/35]
Examination procedure14.08.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.02.2009Examination requested  [2009/15]
01.06.2010Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/52]
14.07.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2010/52]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP03758601.3  / EP1565421
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
08.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
08.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
01.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200907   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US3953500  (NOGUCHI SHUNSAKU, et al) [A] 1,2 * scheme on page 2, compounds III-b and VIII; *;
 [A]  - P.H. MAZZOCCHI ET.AL., "SYNTHESIS AND PHARMACOLOGICAL ACTIVITY OF 2,3,4,5-TETRAHYDRO-1,5-METHANO-1H-3-BENZAZEPINES", J. MED. CHEM., (1979), vol. 22, no. 4, pages 455 - 457, XP002272621 [A] 1,2 * Scheme 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00190a020
by applicantUS6410550
 US3953500
 US6410551
    - JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (1979), vol. 22, no. 4, pages 455 - 457
    - MAZZOCCHI, P.H., J. MED. CHEM., (1979), vol. 22, no. 4, page 455