Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2020534

EP2020534 - Power unit [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.04.2013
Database last updated on 15.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.04.2013No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 08.05.2013  [2013/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Honda Motor Co., Ltd.
1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 107-8556 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2009/06]For all designated states
Honda Motor Co., Ltd.
1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 107-8556 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ishikawa, Hideo c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd.
4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi
Saitama 351-0193 / JP
02 / Kakemizu, Kenichiro c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd.
4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi
Saitama 351-0193 / JP
03 / Watanabe, Satoru c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd.
4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi
Saitama 351-0193 / JP
 [2012/22]
Former [2009/06]01 / Ishikawa, Hideo c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd.
4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi
Saitama 351-0193 / JP
02 / Kakemizu, Kenichiro c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd.
4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi
Saitama 351-0193 / JP
03 / Watanabe, Satoru c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd.
4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi
Saitama 351-0193 / JP
Representative(s)Rupp, Christian
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Sonnenstrasse 33
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/22]Rupp, Christian
Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33
80331 München / DE
Former [2009/06]Rupp, Christian
Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date08155874.408.05.2008
[2009/06]
Priority number, dateJP2007019496226.07.2007         Original published format: JP 2007194962
[2009/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2020534
Date:04.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2020534
Date:30.05.2012
Language:EN
[2012/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.08.2008
ClassificationInternational:F16H9/18, F16H57/04
[2009/06]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   IT [2009/41]
Former [2009/06]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Triebwerk[2009/06]
English:Power unit[2009/06]
French:Bloc d'alimentation[2009/06]
Examination procedure08.05.2008Examination requested  [2009/06]
30.03.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.08.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.08.2009Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
10.09.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
13.12.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.03.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.12.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.04.2012Fee for grant paid
11.04.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.12.2010
Opposition(s)01.03.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
11.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
29.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XD]EP1443246  (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [XD] 1-4 * figures 2,4,5 *;
 [A]EP1223366  (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-3 * page 3, column 4, line 22 - page 30; figure 2 *;
 [A]EP1767759  (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-3 * figures 6,7,10 *;
 [A]US2007023220  (ISHIDA YOUSUKE [JP], et al) [A] 1-3 * figure 9 *;
 [A]ES2273532  (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * figures 3,4 *
by applicantJP2004232805