EP2014181 - Compositions based on prebiotic and immunogenic ingredients for the prevention and treatment of gastroenteric disorders caused by dysbiosis and/or alterations of the normal intestinal flora [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.03.2010 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.04.2010 [2010/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states S.I.I.T. S.r.l. Servizio Internazionale Imballaggi Termosaldanti Via L. Ariosto, 50/60 20090 Trezzano S/N (Milan) / IT | [2009/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Di Pierro, Francesco Via L. Ariosto, 50/60 20090, TREZZANO SUL NAVIGLIO (MI) / IT | [2009/03] | Representative(s) | Minoja, Fabrizio Bianchetti & Minoja S.r.l. Via Plinio, 63 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/03] | Minoja, Fabrizio Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l. Via Plinio, 63 20129 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 08156900.6 | 26.05.2008 | [2009/03] | Priority number, date | IT2007MI01214 | 15.06.2007 Original published format: IT MI20071214 | [2009/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2014181 | Date: | 14.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2014181 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | [2009/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/308, A61K31/702, A61K31/715, A61K31/733, A61P1/12 | [2009/03] | CPC: |
A61K31/702 (EP);
A23L33/135 (EP);
A23L33/21 (EP);
A61K31/715 (EP);
A61K31/733 (EP);
A61K45/06 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/702, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/715, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/733, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/30, A23V2200/3202 (EP) | Designated contracting states | [2009/43] |
Former [2009/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Zusammensetzung auf der Basis präbiotischer und immunogener Bestandteile zur Vorbeugung und Behandlung von Magendarmerkrankungen infolge von Dysbiose und/oder Störungen der normalen Darmflora | [2009/03] | English: | Compositions based on prebiotic and immunogenic ingredients for the prevention and treatment of gastroenteric disorders caused by dysbiosis and/or alterations of the normal intestinal flora | [2009/03] | French: | Compositions basées sur des ingrédients prébiotiques et immunogéniques pour la prévention et le traitement de troubles gastroentériques provoqués par le dysbiosis et/ou des altérations de la flore intestinale normale | [2009/03] | Examination procedure | 19.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/14] | 24.09.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/14] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2006134409 (JASZBERENYI CSABA JOZSEF [HU], et al) [X] 1,4,7,8 * example 16 *; | [X]US2007082104 (DE BAETS SOPHIE [BE]) [X] 1,4 * page 10, paragraph 113 - page 11, paragraph 114 *; | [Y]WO2005039319 (NUTRICIA NV [NL], et al) [Y] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [Y] - MORO G E ET AL, "Effects of a new mixture of prebiotics on faecal flora and stools in term infants.", ACTA PAEDIATRICA, (200309), vol. 91, no. Supplement 441, ISSN 0803-5253, pages 77 - 79, XP002509281 [Y] 1-8 * the whole document * | [Y] - FANARO SILVIA ET AL, "Galacto-oligosaccharides and long-chain fructo-oligosaccharides as prebiotics in infant formulas: a review.", ACTA PAEDIATRICA (OSLO, NORWAY : 1992). SUPPLEMENT OCT 2005, (200510), vol. 94, no. 449, ISSN 0803-5326, pages 22 - 26, XP002509282 [Y] 1-8 * page 23, column L, paragraph 3 - paragraph 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/08035320510043538 | [Y] - KIM SOOK-HE ET AL, "Supplementation of baby formula with native inulin has a prebiotic effect in formula-fed babies.", ASIA PACIFIC JOURNAL OF CLINICAL NUTRITION 2007, (200703), vol. 16, no. 1, ISSN 0964-7058, pages 172 - 177, XP002509283 [Y] 1-8 * the whole document * | [A] - HSU C-K ET AL, "XYLOOLIGOSACCHARIDES AND FRUCTOOLIGOSACCHARIDES AFFECT THE INTESTINAL MICROBIOTA AND PRECANCEROUS COLONIC LESION DEVELOPMENT IN RATS", JOURNAL OF NUTRITION, WISTAR INSTITUTE OF ANATOMY AND BIOLOGY, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (20040601), vol. 134, no. 6, ISSN 0022-3166, pages 1523 - 1528, XP009040416 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * | by applicant | - Remington's Pharmaceutical Handbook, MACK PUBLISHING CO. |