Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1970438

EP1970438 - Pasteurisation process for microbial cells and microbial oil [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.10.2013
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.06.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DSM IP Assets B.V.
Het Overloon 1
6411 TE Heerlen / NL
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
DSM IP Assets B.V.
Het Overloon 1
6411 TE Heerlen / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Schaap, Albert
Smitshoek 13 A
2993 BG Barendrecht / NL
02 / Verkoeijen, Daniel
Bieremalaan 39
2497 AW Den Haag / NL
 [2008/38]
Representative(s)Hoyng Rokh Monegier LLP
Rembrandt Tower, 31st Floor
Amstelplein 1
1096 HA Amsterdam / NL
[N/P]
Former [2011/11]Elkenbracht, Johan Christiaan , et al
DSM Intellectual Property P.O. Box 130
6100 AC Echt / NL
Former [2008/38]Elkenbracht, Johan Christiaan , et al
DSM Intellectual Property Office Delft PP 600-0240 P.O. Box 1
2600 MA Delft / NL
Application number, filing date08157460.020.06.2003
[2008/38]
Priority number, dateEP2002025426219.06.2002         Original published format: EP 02254262
EP2002025871318.12.2002         Original published format: EP 02258713
[2008/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1970438
Date:17.09.2008
Language:EN
[2008/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.08.2008
ClassificationInternational:C12N1/00, C12N1/12, C12N1/14, C12N1/16, C12N1/20
[2008/38]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/38]
TitleGerman:Pasteurisationsverfahren[2008/38]
English:Pasteurisation process for microbial cells and microbial oil[2008/38]
French:Procédé de pasteurisation[2008/38]
Examination procedure03.06.2008Examination requested  [2008/38]
08.04.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.02.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.10.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.05.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.12.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.08.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
11.10.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.03.2014Observations by third parties
12.05.2016Date of oral proceedings
07.06.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
07.06.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination22.07.2016Appeal received No.  T2455/16
17.10.2016Statement of grounds filed
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP03738077.1  / EP1513922
Divisional application(s)EP10174814.3  / EP2258207
EP10174816.8  / EP2269467
EP10174818.4  / EP2255666
EP10174820.0  / EP2255667
EP16169170.4  / EP3111767
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030738077) is  25.08.2006
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
07.10.2013Request for further processing filed
07.10.2013Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
24.10.2013Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
03.02.2010Request for further processing filed
02.02.2010Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
18.02.2010Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
03.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
03.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
03.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
26.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
25.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
27.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
14.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
10.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 11
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 12
10.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 13
10.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 14
16.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 15
11.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 16
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 17
Documents cited:Search[XD]WO9737032  (GIST BROCADES NV [NL], et al) [XD] 2,4,5,7-10 * page 4, line 2 - page 5, line 35; example 23 * * page 15, lines 6-33 * * page 26, lines 16-18 *;
 [XD]EP0986960  (DSM NV [NL]) [XD] 2,4,5,7 * paragraphs [0055] , [0057] - [0059]; example 6 *;
 [X]US6255505  (BIJL HENDRIK LOUIS [NL], et al) [X] 2,4,5,7-10 * column 9, lines 1-42; claims 1-13 *;
 [X]EP0522470  (IDEMITSU PETROCHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 2,4,5,7-10 * examples 1,2; claim 1 *;
 [X]EP1178103  (DSM NV [NL]) [X] 2,9,10 * page 6, paragraph 57; examples 1,4; claims 1,2,8-10 *;
 [A]  - JAREONKITMONGKOL S ET AL, "PRODUCTION OF DIHOMO-GAMMA-LINOLENIC ACID BY A DELTA5-DESATURASE DEFECTIVE MUTANT OF MORTIERELLA ALPINA 1S-4", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, WASHINGTON,DC, US, (19920701), vol. 58, no. 7, ISSN 0099-2240, pages 2196 - 2200, XP000676362 [A] 1-10 * the whole document *
by applicantWO9737032
 WO0015045
 WO0167886
 WO0210322