Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1978436

EP1978436 - Rotarily configurable handheld communication device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.10.2014
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip22.10.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BlackBerry Limited
2200 University Avenue East
Waterloo, ON N2K 0A7 / CA
[2013/48]
Former [2013/36]For all designated states
BlackBerry Limited
295 Phillip Street
Waterloo ON N2L 3W8 / CA
Former [2008/41]For all designated states
Research In Motion Limited
295 Phillip Street
Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / Wood, Todd
60 Cardigan Street, Unit 202
Guelph Ontario N1H 3Z6 / CA
02 / Griffin, Jason T.
14 Deer Ridge Crescent
Kitchener Ontario N2P 2L3 / CA
03 / Ladouceur, Norman
14 Gateview Drive
Waterloo, Ontario N2T 1A2 / CA
 [2009/09]
Former [2008/41]01 / Wood, Todd
60 Cardigan Street, Unit 202
Guelph Ontario N1H 3Z6 / CA
02 / Griffin, Jason T.
14 Deer Ridge Crescent
Kitchener Ontario N2P 2L3 / CA
Representative(s)Hanna Moore + Curley
Garryard House
25/26 Earlsfort Terrace
Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE
[N/P]
Former [2008/41]Hibbert, Juliet Jane Grace
Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date08157500.331.05.2007
[2008/41]
Priority number, dateEP2006011479231.05.2006         Original published format: EP 06114792
EP2006011479331.05.2006         Original published format: EP 06114793
EP2006011479831.05.2006         Original published format: EP 06114798
EP2006011479931.05.2006         Original published format: EP 06114799
[2008/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1978436
Date:08.10.2008
Language:EN
[2008/41]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1978436
Date:30.09.2009
[2009/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.08.2009
ClassificationInternational:G06F1/16
[2008/41]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/41]
TitleGerman:Durch Drehen konfigurierbare tragbare Kommunikationsvorrichtung[2008/41]
English:Rotarily configurable handheld communication device[2008/41]
French:Dispositif de communication portable à rotation configurable[2008/41]
Examination procedure11.11.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.02.2010Examination requested  [2010/12]
02.06.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.09.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.02.2019Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.02.2019
12.02.2019Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
11.03.2019Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination23.04.2019Appeal received No.  T2367/19
15.07.2019Statement of grounds filed
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP07252230.3  / EP1862884
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070252230) is  08.04.2008
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
11.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
29.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
10.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
27.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
27.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
27.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
30.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
29.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 12
28.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 13
Documents cited:Search[X]EP1548544  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [XA]JP2003338866  (FUJITSU LTD) [X] 1-4 * the whole document * [A] 5-15;
 [XA]EP1357726  (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-15;
 [XA]WO03050665  (RAST ASSOCIATES LLC [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * the whole document * [A] 11-15;
 [PX]EP1699209  (SHARP KK [JP]) [PX] 1 * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]EP1312999  (NOKIA CORP [FI])
by applicantUS2004165924
 US6219694