Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2026492

EP2026492 - Radio apparatus, radio communication system, and radio information notification method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.07.2015
Database last updated on 22.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip24.07.2015No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 26.08.2015  [2015/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fujitsu Limited
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
[2009/08]
Inventor(s)01 / YAMASAKI, Miki
c/o Fujitsu Kyushu Network Technologies Limited
2-1, Momochihama 2-chome, Sawaru-ku
Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 814-8588 / JP
02 / OBUCHI, Kazuhisa
c/o Fujitsu Limited
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
03 / SHIMIZU, Hirotoshi
c/o FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
04 / OTONARI, Akihide
c/o Fujitsu Kyushu Network Technologies Limited
2-1, Momochihama 2-chome, Sawaru-ku
Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 814-8588 / JP
05 / SOEJIMA, Yoshinori
c/o Fujitsu Kyushu Network Technologies Limited
2-1, Momochihama 2-chome, Sawaru-ku
Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 814-8588 / JP
06 / OKAMOTO, Shinya
c/o Fujitsu Kyushu Network Technologies Limited
2-1, Momochihama 2-chome, Sawaru-ku
Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 814-8588 / JP
07 / SHINOHARA, Chiaki
c/o Fujitsu Kyushu Network Technologies Limited
2-1, Momochihama 2-chome, Sawaru-ku
Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 814-8588 / JP
 [2014/38]
Former [2009/08]01 / YAMASAKI, Miki
c/o Fujitsu Kyushu Network Technologies Limited, 2
Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 814-8588 / JP
02 / OBUCHI, Kazuhisa
c/o FUJITSU LIMITED, 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Na
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
03 / SHIMIZU, Hirotoshi
c/o FUJITSU LIMITED, 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Na
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
04 / OTONARI, Akihide
c/o Fujitsu Kyushu Network Technologies Limited, 2
Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 814-8588 / JP
05 / SOEJIMA, Yoshinori
c/o Fujitsu Kyushu Network Technologies Limited, 2
Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 814-8588 / JP
06 / OKAMOTO, Shinya
c/o Fujitsu Kyushu Network Technologies Limited, 2
Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 814-8588 / JP
07 / SHINOHARA, Chiaki
c/o Fujitsu Kyushu Network Technologies Limited, 2
Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 814-8588 / JP
Representative(s)Schultes, Stephan , et al
Haseltine Lake LLP
Lincoln House, 5th Floor
300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
[2013/21]
Former [2009/08]Holtby, Christopher Lawrence
Haseltine Lake 5th Floor, Lincoln House 300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
Application number, filing date08157583.904.06.2008
[2009/08]
Priority number, dateJP2007021015810.08.2007         Original published format: JP 2007210158
[2009/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2026492
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/08]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2026492
Date:11.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2026492
Date:17.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04L1/18, H04L1/00
[2013/37]
Former International [2009/08]H04L1/18
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2013/51]
Former [2009/08]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Funkvorrichtung, Funkkommunikationssystem und Benachrichtigungsverfahren für Funkinformation[2009/08]
English:Radio apparatus, radio communication system, and radio information notification method[2009/08]
French:Appareil radio, système de communication de radio, et procédé de notification d'informations radio[2009/08]
Examination procedure06.11.2013Examination requested  [2013/51]
28.11.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.01.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
21.01.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.03.2014Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
17.04.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.04.2014Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
11.08.2014Fee for grant paid
11.08.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.08.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.01.2014
Opposition(s)18.06.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
29.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
04.04.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
04.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
03.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XAI]WO2006052085  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,2,5,6,9,10 * page 7, line 22 - page 13, line 18; figures 4a,4b,5 * [A] 7,8 [I] 3,4;
 [XAI]EP1341318  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,2,4-6,9,10 * page 13, line 41, paragraph 85 - page 15, line 34, paragraph 97; figures 18,19 * [A] 7,8 [I] 3;
 [A]EP1764942  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *
by applicantWO2006052085
 EP1341318
 EP1764942