Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2000930

EP2000930 - Data integrity checking for set-oriented data stores [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.12.2009
Database last updated on 13.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.12.2009Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 20.01.2010  [2010/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Honeywell International Inc.
101 Columbia Road
Morristown, NJ 07960 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/50]For all designated states
Honeywell International Inc.
101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245
Morristown NJ 07960 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Richardson, James P.
607 Goodrich Avenue
St. Paul, MN 55102 / US
02 / Cornhill, Dennis
691 Portland Avenue
St. Paul, MN 55104 / US
 [2008/50]
Representative(s)Buckley, Guy Julian
Patent Outsourcing Limited
1 King Street
Bakewell
Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/50]Buckley, Guy Julian
Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell
Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB
Application number, filing date08157815.506.06.2008
[2008/50]
Priority number, dateUS20070954950P09.08.2007         Original published format: US 954950 P
US2008013050830.05.2008         Original published format: US 130508
[2009/20]
Former [2008/50]US20070954950P09.06.2007
US2008013050830.05.2008
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2000930
Date:10.12.2008
Language:EN
[2008/50]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2000930
Date:11.02.2009
[2009/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/30, G01C21/34
[2008/50]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2009/42]
Former [2008/50]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Prüfung der Datenintegrität für satzorientierte Datenspeicher[2008/50]
English:Data integrity checking for set-oriented data stores[2008/50]
French:Vérification de l'intégrité de données pour magasins de données orientés ensembles[2008/50]
Examination procedure06.06.2008Examination requested  [2008/50]
18.03.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.07.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/03]
01.09.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2010/03]
Documents cited:Search[A]US6694459  (NYMAN NOEL [US]) [A] * abstract *;
 [A]US2007100783  (CIALINI ENZO [CA], et al) [A] * abstract * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0042] *;
 [A]US2005289436  (REDFORD JOHN [GB]) [A] * abstract * * column 4, line 8 - line 16 *;
 [A]US2005283594  (KANO YOSHIKI [US]) [A] * abstract * * paragraph [0022] *