Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2022890

EP2022890 - Twin wire former for a production machine for fibrous sheets and method of manufacturing a fibrous sheet [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.03.2013
Database last updated on 15.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip22.03.2013Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 24.04.2013  [2013/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Voith Patent GmbH
St. Pöltener Str. 43
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/07]For all designated states
Voith Patent GmbH
Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43
89522 Heidenheim / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Moser, Johann
Lichtensteinstrasse 13
89518 Heidenheim / DE
 [2009/07]
Application number, filing date08158559.819.06.2008
[2009/07]
Priority number, dateDE2007103418023.07.2007         Original published format: DE102007034180
[2009/07]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2022890
Date:11.02.2009
Language:DE
[2009/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.11.2008
ClassificationInternational:D21F1/48, D21F1/54, D21F9/00, // D21F1/02
[2009/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/07]
TitleGerman:Doppelsiebformer für eine Maschine zur Herstellung einer Faserstoffbahn und Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Faserstoffbahn[2009/07]
English:Twin wire former for a production machine for fibrous sheets and method of manufacturing a fibrous sheet[2009/07]
French:Mouleur à tamis double d'une machine destinée à la fabrication d'une bande de fibre et procédé de fabrication d'une bande de fibre[2009/07]
Examination procedure11.08.2009Examination requested  [2009/38]
15.06.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.10.2012Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2013/17]
03.12.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2013/17]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.06.2012
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
30.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201205   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]DE102005038424  (VOITH PATENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,9 * paragraphs [0009] , [0051] * * figure 1 *;
 [A]EP1676951  (VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0046] , [0054] * * figure - *;
 [A]WO0198581  (METSO PAPER INC [FI], et al) [A] 1,9 * page 5, line 30 - page 6, line 19 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]DE29713245U  (VOITH SULZER PAPIERMASCH GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,9 * page 2, line 25 - page 4, line 15 * * page 7, lines 1-11 * * figure 2 *
by applicantDE4002304
 WO2007020112
 DE4005420