EP2026351 - Electronic part-mounting component and electronic device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 27.01.2017 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 01.03.2017 [2017/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2009/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tatsukami, Ikki c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2009/08] | Representative(s) | Fenlon, Christine Lesley, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/08] | Sunderland, James Harry Haseltine Lake Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 08159001.0 | 25.06.2008 | [2009/08] | Priority number, date | JP20070208616 | 09.08.2007 Original published format: JP 2007208616 | [2009/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2026351 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2026351 | Date: | 29.06.2011 | [2011/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G11B33/08, G11B33/12 | [2009/08] | CPC: |
G11B33/08 (EP,KR,US);
G06F1/1616 (EP,KR,US);
G06F1/00 (KR);
G06F1/1656 (EP,KR,US);
G06F1/1658 (EP,KR,US);
G06F1/1679 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2012/10] |
Former [2009/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Elektronisches Bauteil für Teilemontage und elektronisches Gerät | [2009/08] | English: | Electronic part-mounting component and electronic device | [2009/08] | French: | Composant de montage de pièces électroniques et appareil électronique | [2009/08] | Examination procedure | 23.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/06] | 05.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.01.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 18.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.2015 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/09] | 20.05.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.06.2015 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 24.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/09] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.04.2013 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 30.01.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 30.01.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.02.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2016 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5731952 (OHGAMI KEIZO [JP], et al) [A] 1-15* column 12, lines 30-53; figures 11,15-18 *; | [IY]US6262883 (KIM HAE-SOO [KR]) [I] 1 * column 4, lines 36-55; figures 4-8 * [Y] 2-15; | [I]US6262888 (SIEDOW ROGER A [US], et al) [I] 1 * column 1, line 5 - column 5, line 10; figures 1-5 *; | [IY]US2002097556 (LEE JUI-JU [TW]) [I] 1 * paragraph [0004]; figure 1 * [Y] 2-15 | Examination | JPH1186519 | US2004255313 | by applicant | JPH09293370 | JP2003016770 | JP2003016771 | JP2005038538 |