Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2025812

EP2025812 - Construction machine with screed [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2009/08]Scraper device and construction machine
[2016/45]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  07.04.2017
Database last updated on 19.03.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  20.03.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.03.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip25.02.2019New entry: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Wirtgen GmbH
Reinhard-Wirtgen-Strasse 2
53578 Windhagen / DE
[2017/19]
Former [2009/08]For all designated states
Wirtgen GmbH
Reinhatrd-Wirtgen-Strasse 2
53578 Windhagen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Kötting, Heinz
Funkenstr. 22
53577, Neustadt/Wied / DE
02 / Ley, Herbert
Am Ginsterhahn 25
53562, St. Katharinen / DE
03 / Hähn, Günter, Dr.
Kiefernweg 21
53639, Königswinter / DE
 [2017/16]
Former [2009/08]01 / Kötting, Heinz
Funkenstr. 22
53577, Neustadt/Wied / DE
02 / Ley, Herbert
Am Ginsterhahn 25
53562, St. Katharinen / DE
03 / Dr. Hähn, Günter
Kiefernweg 21
53639, Königswinter / DE
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[2017/19]
Former [2010/15]von Kreisler Selting Werner
Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
Former [2009/08]Dallmeyer, Georg
Patentanwälte von Kreisler Selting Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1, Deichmannhaus am Dom
50667 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date08159106.726.06.2008
[2009/08]
Priority number, dateDE2007103867715.08.2007         Original published format: DE102007038677
[2009/08]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2025812
Date:18.02.2009
Language:DE
[2009/08]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2025812
Date:27.10.2010
[2010/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2025812
Date:10.05.2017
Language:DE
[2017/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.09.2010
ClassificationInternational:E01C23/088, E02F3/76
[2010/43]
Former International [2009/08]E01C23/088
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2017/19]
Former [2009/08]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Baumaschine mit Abstreifeinrichtung[2016/45]
English:Construction machine with screed[2016/45]
French:Machine de construction avec poutre lisseuse[2016/45]
Former [2009/08]Abstreifeinrichtung, sowie Baumaschine
Former [2009/08]Scraper device and construction machine
Former [2009/08]Dispositif de raclage, ainsi qu'engin de chantier
Examination procedure27.04.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.04.2011Examination requested  [2011/23]
27.06.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.11.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.06.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.12.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.10.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.02.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
21.02.2017Fee for grant paid
21.02.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.03.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.03.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP17169983.8  / EP3231940
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.06.2014
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  12.02.2018   
CATERPILLAR INC.
100 N.E. Adams Street
Peoria IL 61629-9510 / US
Opponent's representative
Modiano, Micaela Nadia
Modiano & Partners
Thierschstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
 [2018/12]
21.02.2018Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
03.07.2018Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
28.11.2019Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
29.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
02.04.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
21.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
23.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCZ10.05.2017
DK10.05.2017
EE10.05.2017
ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
MT10.05.2017
NL10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
RO10.05.2017
SI10.05.2017
SK10.05.2017
AT26.06.2017
IE26.06.2017
LU26.06.2017
BE30.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
BG10.08.2017
NO10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
[2018/50]
Former [2018/43]CZ10.05.2017
DK10.05.2017
EE10.05.2017
ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
MT10.05.2017
NL10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
RO10.05.2017
SI10.05.2017
SK10.05.2017
IE26.06.2017
LU26.06.2017
BE30.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
BG10.08.2017
NO10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
Former [2018/39]CZ10.05.2017
DK10.05.2017
EE10.05.2017
ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
NL10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
RO10.05.2017
SI10.05.2017
SK10.05.2017
IE26.06.2017
LU26.06.2017
BE30.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
BG10.08.2017
NO10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
Former [2018/23]CZ10.05.2017
DK10.05.2017
EE10.05.2017
ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
NL10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
RO10.05.2017
SI10.05.2017
SK10.05.2017
IE26.06.2017
LU26.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
BG10.08.2017
NO10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
Former [2018/21]CZ10.05.2017
DK10.05.2017
EE10.05.2017
ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
NL10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
RO10.05.2017
SK10.05.2017
LU26.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
BG10.08.2017
NO10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
Former [2018/10]CZ10.05.2017
DK10.05.2017
EE10.05.2017
ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
NL10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
RO10.05.2017
SK10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
NO10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
Former [2018/09]DK10.05.2017
EE10.05.2017
ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
NL10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
NO10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
Former [2017/52]ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
NL10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
NO10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
Former [2017/50]ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
NO10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
Former [2017/49]ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
NO10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
Documents cited:Search[IY]DE3405473  (WIRTGEN REINHARD [DE]) [I] 1-4,6,12,14,15 * page 7, lines 10-30 * * page 8, lines 17-25 * * figures 1-3 * [Y] 7-11,13;
 [A]DE20011942U  (MEILLER FAHRZEUGE [DE]) [A] 1,2,14 * abstract *;
 [Y]EP1408158  (WIRTGEN GMBH [DE]) [Y] 7-11,13 * paragraphs [0019] , [0027] , [0033] - [0039]; figures 4,5 *;
 [A]US4041623  (MILLER DAVID J, et al) [A] 2,6-14 * abstract *
by applicantDE102005058102
 DE3528038
 US5505598
 US5474397
OppositionDE102005058102
 DE3528038
 US5505598
 US5474397
 WO2004081289
    - "SF-102 Cold Planer", Bitelli Technical presentation, (20031000), pages 1 - 364, XP055467777
    - "SF-102/SF 102 C AP Cold Planer", Bitelli Service manual, (20041100), XP055467846
    - "SF 102R / SF 102 CR Planer", Bitelli Operating instruction book, (20041000), pages 1 - 132, XP055467853
    - "SF 102 / SF 102C Deep Cut Cold Planers", Bitelli Machine brochure, (19990000), XP055467857
    - "Caterpillar PM-102 Cold Planer", Caterpillar Operation and Maintenance Manual, (20070700), pages 1 - 154, XP055468707
    - "PM-102 Cold Planer", Caterpillar Systems Operation, (20061100), pages 1 - 118, XP055468712
    - "PM-102 Cold Planer", Caterpillar Technical Presentation, (20060900), pages i-vi, 1 - 204, XP055468717
    - "PM-102 Cold Planer", Caterpillar Product Information - Bid Specifications, (20051000), pages 1 - 8, XP055468722
    - "Caterpillar Announces the PM-102 Cold Planer", Caterpillar® Product Information Salesgram, (20050600), XP055469197
    - "PM-102 Cold Planer", Caterpillar brochure, (20050600), pages 1 - 12, XP055469201
    - Bitelli, "Puma SF-200", Spare parts book, DR-392029410A3
    - Bitelli, "Puma SF-200", Spare parts book, DR-092079409A3
    - Bitelli, "Puma SF 200", Operating instruction manual, DU-092069606A2
    - "SF-200 A.P. Deep Cut", Bitelli Training manual, (19940300), XP055469211
    - "Tigre SF 200 L Cold Planer", Service Manual, DS-098019709GB, (19970900), XP055469515
    - "PUMA SF 200 Deep Cut - Cold Planer for asphalt and concrete", Bitelli Machine brochure, (19890700), XP055469522
    - "PM200 Cold Planer", Operation and Maintenance Manual, (20070300), pages 1 - 200, XP055469529
    - "PM-200 Cold Planer", Parts manual, (20060200), XP055469531
    - "PM-200 Cold Planer", Technical Presentation, (20061100), XP055469652
    - "Caterpillar Announces the PM-200 Cold Planer", Caterpillar® Product Information Salesgram, (20050600), pages 1 - 9, XP055469215
    - "PM-200 Cold Planer", Caterpillar brochure, (20050600), pages 1 - 16, XP055470013
    - "PM-200 Cold Planer", Caterpillar® Product Information - Bid Specifications, (20051000), pages 1 - 8, XP055470023
    - "PM-465 Cold Planer Machine Systems", Disassembly and Assembly, KENR3103-01, (20041000), pages 1 - 104, XP055470035
    - "PM-465 Cold Planer", Operation and Maintenance Manual, (20030600), pages 1 - 150, XP055470056
    - "PM-465 Cold Planer Rotor System", Specifications Systems Operation Testing & Adjusting, (19980200), XP055471597
    - "PM-465 Cold Planer Auxiliary Hydraulic System", Systems and Operation Testing & Adjusting, (19980200), pages 1 - 36, XP055471602
    - "PM-465 Cold Planer", Caterpillar Technical Presentation Meeting Guide 9459, (19981200), XP055471606
    - "PM-465 Cold Planer", Caterpillar Product bulletin, (19971000), XP055472458
    - Anonymous, "PM-465 Cold Planer", Caterpillar brochure, (19990000), page 12pp, XP055476931
    - Anonymous, "PM-465 Cold Planer Update", Caterpillar® Product Information "Bid Specifications", (19990300), pages 1 - 4, XP055476933
    - Anonymous, "Caterpillar Announces PM-465 Cold Planer Update", Caterpillar® Product Information "Salesgram", (19990300), XP055476936
    - Anonymous, "Variable Width Rotor available for Caterpillar® PM-465 Cold Planer", Caterpillar® Product Information "Salesgram", (20000300), XP055476939
    - Anonymous, Caterpillar® Parts Manual PM-565 Cold Planer, (20010900), pages 1 - 1029
    - Anonymous, "PM-565 Cold Planer", Caterpillar ® Operation and Maintenance Manual, (19950100), page 154pp, XP055476947
    - Anonymous, "PM-565 Cold Planer 3TK00040-UP", Caterpillar® Technical Presentation, (19930800), XP055480915
    - Anonymous, "Caterpillar PM-565 Cold Planer", Caterpillar brochure, (19920000), XP055477384
    - Anonymous, "Caterpillar PM-565B Cold Planer", Operation and Maintenance Manual, (20010400), XP055480543
    - Anonymous, "PM-565B Cold Planer 8GS1-Up", Caterpillar Technical Presentation, (19980700), XP055480554
    - Anonymous, "PM-565 & PM-565B Cold Planer Machine Systems", Caterpillar "Disassembly and Assembly" manual, (20041000), XP055480532
    - Anonymous, Caterpillar Parts Manual PM-565B Cold Planer, (20010200), pages 1 - 951
    - "PM-565 & PM-565B Cold Planer Auxiliary Hydraulic Systems", Caterpillar Systems Operation, Testing & Adjusting, (19970500), page 52pp, XP055479967
    - Anonymous, "PM-565B Cold Planer", Caterpillar Machine brochure, (19980700), pages 1 - 8, XP055478227
    - Anonymous, "PM-565B Cold Planer", Caterpillar Machine brochure, (19970800), pages 1 - 8, XP055478231
    - Anonymous, "Caterpillar® Introduces Updates for the PM-565B Cold Planer", Caterpillar® Product Information Salesgram, (20010600), pages 1 - 6, XP055478238
    - Anonymous, "PM-565B Cold Planer", Caterpillar® Product Information Product Bulletin, (20070900), pages 1 - 44, XP055478243
    - Anonymous, "Caterpillar® PM-565B Cold Planer", Caterpillar® Product Information Bid Specifications, (20010600), pages 1 - 4, XP055478264
    - Anonymous, "Caterpillar PM-565B Cold Planer", Caterpillar® Product Information Bid Specifications, (19991000), pages 1 - 2, XP055478268
    - Anonymous, "Macchina Operatrice Semovente Eccezionale -Scarificatrice- Tipo "095"", Bitelli Document, (19990830), XP055479963
    - Anonymous, "Macchina Operatrice Semovente Eccezionale -Scarificatrice- Tipo "095"", Bitelli Document, (19990301), XP055479964