Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2023321

EP2023321 - Plasma display and driving method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  29.01.2010
Database last updated on 15.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.01.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.03.2010  [2010/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung SDI Co., Ltd.
575 Shin-dong
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
[N/P]
Former [2009/07]For all designated states
Samsung SDI Co., Ltd.
575 Shin-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Kim, Ji-Hoon
Samsung SDI Co., LTD. Legal & IP Team 575, Shin-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
 [2009/07]
Representative(s)Hengelhaupt, Jürgen , et al
Gulde & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB
Wallstrasse 58/59
10179 Berlin / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/07]Hengelhaupt, Jürgen , et al
Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwälte Wallstrasse 58/59
10179 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date08159412.901.07.2008
[2009/07]
Priority number, dateKR2007007957908.08.2007         Original published format: KR 20070079579
[2009/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2023321
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:G09G3/288
[2009/07]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2009/42]
Former [2009/07]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Plasmaanzeige und Verfahren zu ihrer Ansteuerung[2009/07]
English:Plasma display and driving method thereof[2009/07]
French:Écran à plasma et procédé de commande correspondant[2009/07]
Examination procedure01.07.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
12.08.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/09]
17.09.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2010/09]
Documents cited:Search[X]EP1596356  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-5,10-13,15 * the whole document *;
 [X]US2002158822  (ISHIZUKA MITSUHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,10-13 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP1531451  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1-5,10-13,15 * paragraphs [0010] - [0019] - [0037] - [0045] - [0054]; figures 3-5,7 *;
 [X]US2006087480  (KIM TAE-SEONG [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,10,11,13-15 * the whole document *