Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2022602

EP2022602 - Device for removing chips in machine tools [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.03.2012
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.05.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 13.06.2012  [2012/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SCM Group S.p.A.
Via Emilia 77
47900 Rimini / IT
[2009/07]
Inventor(s)01 / Coltro, Davide
Via G. Marconi 66
36010 Monticello Conte Otto (VI) / IT
02 / Meneghetti, Giovanni
Via Linate 28
36030 Caldonio (VI) / IT
 [2009/07]
Representative(s)Crugnola, Pietro , et al
Luppi Intellectual Property Srl
Viale Corassori, 54
41124 Modena / IT
[N/P]
Former [2010/25]Crugnola, Pietro , et al
Luppi Crugnola & Partners S.r.l. Viale Corassori 54
41124 Modena / IT
Former [2009/07]Crugnola, Pietro
Luppi & Associati S.r.l. Via Camperio, 11
20123 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date08159503.502.07.2008
[2009/07]
Priority number, dateIT2007MO0024525.07.2007         Original published format: IT MO20070245
[2009/07]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2022602
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2022602
Date:27.04.2011
Language:EN
[2011/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.10.2008
ClassificationInternational:B23Q11/00, B02C18/06, A47L9/00
[2010/44]
Former International [2009/07]B23Q11/00, A47L9/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2009/42]
Former [2009/07]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Entfernen von Spänen bei Werkzeugmaschinen[2009/07]
English:Device for removing chips in machine tools[2009/07]
French:Dispositif pour enlever des copeaux dans des machines-outils[2009/07]
Examination procedure27.07.2009Examination requested  [2009/36]
12.08.2009Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
19.08.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.09.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
15.02.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.03.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.09.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.11.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.03.2011Fee for grant paid
16.03.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.01.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT27.04.2011
FR01.08.2011
[2012/24]
Former [2012/22]FR01.08.2011
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0795266  (ADLUS GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1-8,14 * column 3, line 22 - line 30; figures 1,3 *;
 [X]DE19720582  (STIHL MASCHF ANDREAS [DE]) [X] 1-7,14 * column 3, line 14 - line 20; figure 1 *;
 [X]GB861749  (TORNADO A G) [X] 1-7,14 * page 2, line 22 - line 29 *;
 [X]DE2261297  (SCHROEDER MANFRED) [X] 1-7,14 * figure 1 *;
 [X]DE766255  (NEUFANG GUSTAV) [X] 1-7,14 * figure 3 *;
 [X]DE634784  (HALL MFG CO) [X] 1-7,14 * figure 1 *
by applicantEP0795266
 DE766255
 DE634784