Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2141288

EP2141288 - Method for delivering large quantities of under water soil to a reclamation area [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.08.2011
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.11.2018Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dredging International Asia Pacific Pte. Ltd.
371 Beach Road
24-08 KeyPoint
Singapore 199597 / SG
For all designated states
Oldendorff Carriers GmbH & Co. KG
Willy-Brandt-Allee 6
23554 Luebeck / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/01]For all designated states
Dredging International Asia Pacific Pte. Ltd.
371 Beach Road 34-08 KeyPoint
Singapore 199597 / SG
For all designated states
Oldendorff Carriers GmbH & Co. KG
Willy-Brandt-Allee 6
23554 Luebeck / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Van Wellen, Erik
Bataviastraat 7/43
2000 Antwerpen / BE
02 / Rosenstock, Mark
Nedderland 11
28355 Bremen / DE
 [2010/01]
Representative(s)Brouwer, Hendrik Rogier , et al
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2014/25]Brouwer, Hendrik Rogier , et al
Arnold & Siedsma
P.O. Box 18558
2502 EN Den Haag / NL
Former [2014/01]Brouwer, Hendrik Rogier , et al
Arnold & Siedsma
Emmasingel 23
5611 AZ Eindhoven / NL
Former [2011/37]Brouwer, Hendrik Rogier
Patentwerk B.V. P.O. Box 1514
5200 BN 's-Hertogenbosch / NL
Former [2010/01]Brouwer, Hendrik Rogier
Patentwerk B.V. P.O. Box 1514
5200 BN 's-Hertogenbosch / NL
Application number, filing date08159701.504.07.2008
[2010/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2141288
Date:06.01.2010
Language:EN
[2010/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2141288
Date:14.09.2011
Language:EN
[2011/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.11.2008
ClassificationInternational:E02F1/00, E02F3/88, E02F5/28
[2010/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/01]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Lieferung großer Mengen von Unterwasserboden in eine Wiedergewinnungszone[2010/01]
English:Method for delivering large quantities of under water soil to a reclamation area[2010/01]
French:Procédé pour la livraison de grandes quantités sol immergé dans une zone de récupération.[2015/48]
Former [2010/01]Procédé pour la livraison de grandes quantités sol immergé dans une zone de récupération.
Examination procedure06.07.2010Examination requested  [2010/33]
10.09.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.01.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.04.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.06.2011Fee for grant paid
27.06.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.09.2010
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  27.12.2011  03.01.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Baggermaatschappij Boskalis B.V.
Rosmolenweg 20
3356LK Papendrecht / NL
Opponent's representative
V.O., et al
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
 02  02.06.2012  24.02.2014  WITHDRAWN
Viking Dredging AS
Postboks 22
4661 Kristiansand / NO
Opponent's representative
Risdal, Jørgen
Håmsø Patentbyrå AS
P.O. Box 171
4301 Sandnes / NO
 [N/P]
Former [2016/30]
Opponent(s)01  27.12.2011  03.01.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Baggermaatschappij Boskalis B.V.
Rosmolenweg 20
3356LK Papendrecht / NL
Opponent's representative
V.O., et al
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
 02  02.06.2012  24.02.2014  WITHDRAWN
Viking Dredging AS
Postboks 22
4661 Kristiansand / NO
Opponent's representative
Risdal, Jørgen
Håmsø Patentbyrå ANS
Vågsgaten 43
4301 Sandnes / NO
Former [2016/09]
Opponent(s)01  27.12.2011  03.01.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Baggermaatschappij Boskalis B.V.
Rosmolenweg 20
3356LK Papendrecht / NL
Opponent's representative
Jansen, Cornelis Marinus
V.O.
Carnegieplein 5
2517 KJ Den Haag / NL
 02  02.06.2012  24.02.2014  WITHDRAWN
Viking Dredging AS
Postboks 22
4661 Kristiansand / NO
Opponent's representative
Risdal, Jørgen
Håmsø Patentbyrå ANS
Vågsgaten 43
4301 Sandnes / NO
Former [2014/14]
Opponent(s)01  27.12.2011  03.01.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Baggermaatschappij Boskalis B.V.
Rosmolenweg 20
3356LK Papendrecht / NL
Opponent's representative
Geurts, Franciscus Antonius
Octrooibureau Vriesendorp & Gaade B.V. Dr. Kuyperstraat 6
2514 BB Den Haag / NL
 02  02.06.2012  24.02.2014  WITHDRAWN
Viking Dredging AS
Postboks 22
4661 Kristiansand / NO
Opponent's representative
Risdal, Jørgen
Håmsø Patentbyrå ANS
Vågsgaten 43
4301 Sandnes / NO
Former [2012/29]
Opponent(s)01  27.12.2011  03.01.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Baggermaatschappij Boskalis B.V.
Rosmolenweg 20
3356LK Papendrecht / NL
Opponent's representative
Geurts, Franciscus Antonius
Octrooibureau Vriesendorp & Gaade B.V. Dr. Kuyperstraat 6
2514 BB Den Haag / NL
 02  02.06.2012   
Viking Dredging AS
Postboks 22
4661 Kristiansand / NO
Opponent's representative
Risdal, Jørgen
Håmsø Patentbyrå ANS
Vågsgaten 43
P.O. Box 171
N-4301 Sandnes / NO
Former [2012/05]
Opponent(s)01  27.12.2011   
Baggermaatschappij Boskalis B.V.
Rosmolenweg 20
3356LK Papendrecht / NL
Opponent's representative
Geurts, Franciscus Antonius
Octrooibureau Vriesendorp & Gaade B.V. Dr. Kuyperstraat 6
2514 BB Den Haag / NL
19.06.2012No. 02: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
27.06.2012No. 02: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
19.07.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
28.01.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
28.01.2015Date of oral proceedings
02.03.2015Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
02.03.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
12.05.2015Reply to a communication from the opposition division
30.09.2015Date of oral proceedings
26.10.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
16.11.2015Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
Appeal following opposition14.01.2016Appeal received No.  T0346/16
24.03.2016Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
01.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU04.07.2008
AT14.09.2011
CY14.09.2011
CZ14.09.2011
DK14.09.2011
EE14.09.2011
FI14.09.2011
HR14.09.2011
LT14.09.2011
LV14.09.2011
MT14.09.2011
PL14.09.2011
RO14.09.2011
SE14.09.2011
SI14.09.2011
SK14.09.2011
BG14.12.2011
NO14.12.2011
GR15.12.2011
ES25.12.2011
IS14.01.2012
PT16.01.2012
GB04.07.2012
IE04.07.2012
CH31.07.2012
LI31.07.2012
LU04.07.2013
TR04.07.2013
[2015/42]
Former [2015/34]HU04.07.2008
AT14.09.2011
CY14.09.2011
CZ14.09.2011
DK14.09.2011
EE14.09.2011
FI14.09.2011
HR14.09.2011
LT14.09.2011
LV14.09.2011
MT14.09.2011
PL14.09.2011
RO14.09.2011
SE14.09.2011
SI14.09.2011
SK14.09.2011
BG14.12.2011
NO14.12.2011
GR15.12.2011
ES25.12.2011
IS14.01.2012
PT16.01.2012
GB04.07.2012
IE04.07.2012
CH31.07.2012
LI31.07.2012
LU04.07.2013
Former [2014/34]HU04.07.2008
AT14.09.2011
CY14.09.2011
CZ14.09.2011
DK14.09.2011
EE14.09.2011
FI14.09.2011
HR14.09.2011
LT14.09.2011
LV14.09.2011
MT14.09.2011
PL14.09.2011
RO14.09.2011
SE14.09.2011
SI14.09.2011
SK14.09.2011
BG14.12.2011
NO14.12.2011
GR15.12.2011
ES25.12.2011
IS14.01.2012
PT16.01.2012
GB04.07.2012
IE04.07.2012
CH31.07.2012
LI31.07.2012
Former [2013/35]AT14.09.2011
CY14.09.2011
CZ14.09.2011
DK14.09.2011
EE14.09.2011
FI14.09.2011
HR14.09.2011
LT14.09.2011
LV14.09.2011
MT14.09.2011
PL14.09.2011
RO14.09.2011
SE14.09.2011
SI14.09.2011
SK14.09.2011
BG14.12.2011
NO14.12.2011
GR15.12.2011
ES25.12.2011
IS14.01.2012
PT16.01.2012
GB04.07.2012
IE04.07.2012
CH31.07.2012
LI31.07.2012
Former [2013/33]AT14.09.2011
CY14.09.2011
CZ14.09.2011
DK14.09.2011
EE14.09.2011
FI14.09.2011
HR14.09.2011
LT14.09.2011
LV14.09.2011
PL14.09.2011
RO14.09.2011
SE14.09.2011
SI14.09.2011
SK14.09.2011
BG14.12.2011
NO14.12.2011
GR15.12.2011
ES25.12.2011
IS14.01.2012
PT16.01.2012
GB04.07.2012
IE04.07.2012
CH31.07.2012
LI31.07.2012
Former [2013/29]AT14.09.2011
CY14.09.2011
CZ14.09.2011
DK14.09.2011
EE14.09.2011
FI14.09.2011
HR14.09.2011
LT14.09.2011
LV14.09.2011
PL14.09.2011
RO14.09.2011
SE14.09.2011
SI14.09.2011
SK14.09.2011
BG14.12.2011
NO14.12.2011
GR15.12.2011
ES25.12.2011
IS14.01.2012
PT16.01.2012
GB04.07.2012
CH31.07.2012
LI31.07.2012
Documents cited:Search[XY]JP2004011184  (KOJIMAGUMI KK) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0024] * [Y] 3,4,6,7;
 [YA]JP2007063934  (KOJIMAGUMI KK) [Y] 3,4,6,7 * figure - * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0037] * [A] 1;
 [XA]JPH06206094  (OHBAYASHI CORP) [X] 1 * paragraph [0010] * * figure 1 * [A] 2,5;
 [XA]US4501446  (GLAESER EBERHARD [DE] ET AL) [X] 1 * abstract * * column 4, line 21 - line 44 * [A] 3;
 [XA]US6497535  (THOMAS DENNIS R [US]) [X] 1 * figures 15,16,20-26 * * column 5, line 17 - line 36 * * column 5, line 46 - column 6, line 3 * * column 12, line 66 - column 13, line 32 * [A] 4,5;
 [X]US5636457  (ERIKSSON LARS L [CA]) [X] 1 * figures 1,1a,4,5 *;
 [X]US6293731  (STUDER RITCHIE G [US]) [X] 1 * figures 1-6 *;
 [X]EP0587256  (UBE INDUSTRIES [JP]) [X] 1 * figure 10 * * column 10, line 25 - line 30 *;
 [A]DE19729737  (BALTICON OSTSEE BAGGERGUT SANI [DE] PACIFIC ENVIRONMENTAL TECHNOLO [US) [A] 1 * column 3, line 58 - column 4, line 1 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]JPH07257951  (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO; PENTA OCEAN CONSTRUCTION) [A] 1 * figure 1 *;
 [A]JPH1018345  (SAEKI KENSETSU KOGYO KK) [A] 1 * abstract *
OppositionJP2004011184
 JPH06206094
 DE10119857
 WO0038975
 JP2001040638
 WO9521303
 NL7413459
 US1690380
 EP1350716
    - MARC VAN DER VELDE, LinkedIn
    - MARC VAN DER VELDE, THE ART OF DREDGING
    - MARC VAN DER VELDE, Witness Statement
    - SERGE DOLK, Witness Statement
    - MR. WIM DEN HERDER, Statement
    - "Porosity", Wikipedia
    - "Soortelijke massa van vast stoffen", Wikipedia
    - Excerpts of Wikipedia
    - "Handymax", Wikipedia lemma regarding
    - GUNTER KUHN, Der maschinelle Wasserbau, Stuttgart, (19970000), pages 61 - 162
    - "VOLKER starts sand-winning operation in North Sea", International Dredging and Port Construction, (19710900), page 19
    - "Economic Considerations for Sand Acquisition and Applied Methods of Winning for the Purpose of the Reclamation of Industrial Sites", International Dredging and Port Construction, (19681200), pages 8 - 13
    - Kamsar Voyager (converted bulk carrier
    - Montvale (bulk carrier
    - Seaway (Trailing Suction Hopper Dredger (''TSHD
    - Trailing Suction Hopper Dredgers (leaflet
    - Trailer Jumbo'' TSHD (dredgers with a hopper over 16000 m3
    - JACOB CORNELIS, & Prins der Nederlanden (TSHD
    - Vasco da Gama (TSHD
    - Dredgers of the world (overview
    - Pearl River (TSHD
    - Odin R (TSHD
    - Prins der Nederlanden (TSHD
    - Orisant (TSHD
    - Charlemagne (TSHD
    - Scelverdinghe (TSHD
    - Sand Falcon (TSHD
    - HUGHES I;, "Effect of the environment on processing and handling materials at sea", (19780821), XP055270488

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1098/rsta.1978.0080
    - HUGHES II;, "Stability of bulk mineral cargoes", (19771000), XP055270487
    - News Articles Sand export ban
    - BC Codes, page 18, XP055270486
    - International Maritime Solid Bulk Cargoes Code, (20090000), XP055270485
    - Fagerberg & Stavang, "determination of critical moisture contents in ore concentrates carried in cargo vessels", (19710000), pages 174 - 191, XP055270484
    - cullinane, "Economies of Scale in Large Container Ships", journal of transport economics and policy, vol. 33, no. 2, pages 185 - 208, XP055270483
    - Maritime Economics
    - News Articles Geomaris
    - BMI, (20040500), XP055270481
    - International Bulk Journal, (20040000), vol. 1, XP055270480
    - Floating transfer systems: simplicity in diversity
    - Wikipedia excerpt Bulk-carrier
    - Excerpt of website ''seabulk.com
    - Excerpt of website ''jenike.com
    - Excerpt of website '' american steamship.com
    - Richtlijn 28